Stone Brewing Co., LLC v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Defendant: MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company and Does 1 through 25
Counter Defendant: Stone Brewing Co., LLC
Special Master: Andrew Guilford
Case Number: 3:2018cv00331
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M Adler
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
3 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 623 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/24/2022. Day of Trial 14. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Jury resumes deliberations at 9:00AM. Note #1 from jury at 2:18PM. Note #2 from jury at 4:01PM. Judge ordered lunch to be provided at court expense. Jury Trial continued to 3/25/2022 12:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez for further deliberations.(Court Reporters: Abigail Torres - A.M., Vanessa Evans - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/23/2022. Day of Trial 13. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury retired to deliberate at 3:54PM. Jury Trial continued to 3/24/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez for further deliberations.(Court Reporter: Vanessa Evans). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 621 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Amended MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER Regarding Jury Fees. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/23/2022.(ddf)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 618 RESPONSE re #544 Objection to Special Master's Report and Recommendation filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 617 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 12, Afternoon Session) held on 3/22/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vanessa Evans. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (akr)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 12, Morning Session) held on 3/22/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Abigail R. Torres. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/13/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (akr)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 614 TRIAL BRIEF Re: Improper and Misleading Reference to 37 CFR 2.51 and Request for Instruction to Disregard by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Goo, Valerie) (ddf).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 613 TRIAL BRIEF 12 re: Excluding Improper References to MillerCoors's 2020 Renewal For Keystone by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hampton)(Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 612 TRIAL BRIEF 13 Re: Jury Instructions Not Tethered To Any Evidence by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 611 RESPONSE re #607 Response - Other Objection to Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Proposed Verdict Form filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/22/2022. Day of Trial 12. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/23/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Abigail Torres - A.M., Vanessa Evans - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 610 RESPONSE re #608 Trial Brief Opposition to Defendant's Trial Brief 12 re: Jury Instructions Relating to Priority and Prior Use filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 609 RESPONSE re #581 Trial Brief Opposition Brief Re Limiting Instructions on Social Media Evidence filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 608 TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANT MILLERCOORS TRIAL BRIEF 12 - JURY INSTRUCTIONS RELATING TO PRIORITY AND PRIOR USE by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 607 RESPONSE re #546 Notice (Other) in Opposition to Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miller Coors' Proposed Verdict Form)(Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 605 TRIAL BRIEF MillerCoors Opposition to Plaintiff's Trial Brief 11 by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Molly) (ddf).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 11, Afternoon Session) held on 3/21/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Abigail R. Torres. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (akr)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 11, Morning Session) held on 3/21/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vanessa Evans. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (akr)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/21/2022. Day of Trial 11. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Plaintiffs rest. Defense oral Rule 50 motion for judgment as a matter of law - Submitted. Jury Trial continued to 3/22/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Vanessa Evans - A.M., Abigail Torres - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 602 TRIAL BRIEF 11 re: Objections to New Regressions from Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Expert Mark Hosfield by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 601 RESPONSE re #599 Trial Brief 10 re Exclusion of Defendant's Unproduced Exhibits Disclosed on March 22, 2022 filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Goo, Valerie) (ddf).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 599 TRIAL BRIEF 10 re: Exclusion of Defendant's Unproduced Exhibits Disclosed on March 21, 2022 by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 597 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 10, Afternoon Session) held on 3/18/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/11/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (akr)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 596 RESPONSE re #593 Trial Brief 08 Re: Calculation of Trial Time Following MillerCoors's Baseless Motions to Reargue on Friday Morning filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 595 TRIAL BRIEF 06 Jury Instructions Relating To Priority And Prior Use by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 TRIAL BRIEF 09 re: Proposed Jury Instructions re: 2007 USPTO Application and Keystone Profits by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Jury Instructions 28A and 46A)(Hagey, J.) (ddf).
March 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 593 TRIAL BRIEF 08 re: Calculation of Trial Time Following MillerCoors's Baseless Motions to Reargue on Friday Morning by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Curran, Douglas) (ddf).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/18/2022. Day of Trial 10. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/21/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Amanda LeGore - A.M., Juliet Eichenlaub - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 10, Morning Session) held on 3/18/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2022. (akr)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 9, Afternoon Session) held on 3/17/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2022. (akr)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/17/2022. Day of Trial 9. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/18/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Amanda LeGore - A.M., Juliet Eichenlaub - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 589 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 9, Morning Session) held on 3/17/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2022. (akr)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 588 RESPONSE re #586 Trial Brief in Opposition to Motion On Trial Time Allotment filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 586 TRIAL BRIEF 06 re: Remedies for Delays Caused by Defendant MillerCoors's Ongoing Obstruction by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Email Agreement)(Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 585 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 8, Afternoon Session) held on 3/16/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2022. (akr)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE On Trial Time Used By The Parties by MillerCoors LLC (Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 582 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Trial Brief 05 by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/16/2022. Day of Trial 8. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/17/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.)(Court Reporters: Juliet Eichenlaub - A.M., Amanda LeGore - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 8, Morning Session) held on 3/16/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2022. (akr)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 TRIAL BRIEF 06 RE: Limiting Instructions on Social Media Evidence by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 578 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 7, Afternoon Session) held on 3/15/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2022. (akr)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 576 TRIAL BRIEF 05 RE: Improper Testimony Regarding Legal Advice by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/15/2022. Day of Trial 7. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/16/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Juliet Eichenlaub - A.M., Amanda LeGore - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 7, Morning Session) held on 3/15/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2022. (akr)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 6, Afternoon Session) held on 3/14/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Abigail R. Torres. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2022. (akr)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 572 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Bench Brief on Loss of Valuation Damages [ECF NO. 571] by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/14/2022. Day of Trial 6. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/15/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Juliet Eichenlaub - A.M., Abigail Torres - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 6, Morning Session) held on 3/14/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2022. (akr)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 571 TRIAL BRIEF Bench Brief on Loss of Valuation Damages by Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 5, Afternoon Session) held on 3/11/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2022. (akr)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/11/2022. Day of Trial 5. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/14/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Amanda LeGore - A.M., Juliet Eichenlaub - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr) .
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 5, Morning Session) held on 3/11/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2022. (akr)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 4, Afternoon Session) held on 3/10/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2022. (akr)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/10/2022. Day of Trial 4. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/11/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Amanda LeGore - A.M., Juliet Eichenlaub - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas S. Curran, J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr) .
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 4, Morning Session) held on 3/10/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2022. (akr)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #562 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE of Filing Regarding Submissions of Material to Special Master by MillerCoors LLC (Attachments: #1 Group Exhibit 1, #2 Group Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 562 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lombard, Daniel) (ddf).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 3, Afternoon Session) held on 3/9/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2022. (akr)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/9/2022. Day of Trial 3. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/10/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: A.M. - Amanda LeGore, P.M. - Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas S. Curran, J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr) .
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 3, Morning Session) held on 3/9/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2022. (akr)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 2, Morning Session) held on 3/8/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2022. (akr)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 556 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 2, Afternoon Session) held on 3/8/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2022. (akr)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 555 TRIAL BRIEF Response in Opposition to Stone Brewing's Trial Brief 04 by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/8/2022. Day of Trial 2. The Court excuses juror #8. 8 Trial Jurors Present. Swore witnesses. Exhibits marked/received. Jury Trial continued to 3/9/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporters: Amanda LeGore - A.M., Juliet Eichenlaub - P.M.). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas S. Curran, J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr) . Modified on 3/14/2022 (gxr).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 554 TRIAL BRIEF 04 re: Exchange of Materials Presented to the Jury by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Jury Trial, Day 1) held on 3/7/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2022. (akr)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 551 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Trial Brief 01 re: Testimony of Matthew Reischauer [ECF No. 550] by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas S. Curran, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2)(Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 550 TRIAL BRIEF 01 re: Testimony of Matthew Reischauer by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel R. Lombard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial held on 3/7/2022. Day of Trial 1. Jury impaneled and sworn. Opening statements began. Jury Trial continued to 3/8/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporter/ECR Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas S. Curran, J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushnir). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Daniel R. Lombard, Valerie Meiling Goo). (no document attached) (gxr) .
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 549 TRIAL BRIEF 03 re: Correcting Jury Instruction No. 3 by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Oral Argument) held on 3/4/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2022. (akr)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 547 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Jury Trial set for 3/8/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(no document attached) (gxr)
March 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE Plaintiff's Final [Proposed] Verdict Form by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Final [Proposed] Verdict Form)(Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 545 TRIAL BRIEF Response in Opposition to Stone Brewing's Trial Brief 02 by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 544 OBJECTION by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #531 Notice (Other) . (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 543 RESPONSE re #538 Notice (Other),, Defendant's Objections to Special Master's February 25, 2022 Report & Recommendation filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Lombard, Daniel)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 542 TRIAL BRIEF 02 RE: Selection of Eight Total Jurors, in Accordance with Prior Court Order and Agreement of the Parties by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 541 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/4/2022. All parties appearing telephonically. The Court orders Mr. Gavin Hattersley to appear at trial on Tuesday March 8, 2022 (ECF Nos. 536, 537). Each side will have 33 hours to present their respective cases following opening statements. Jury selection is to commence at 9:30 a.m. on 3/7/2022. The Court orders the parties to provide a joint witness list to the Court before jury selection. (Court Reporter/ECR Amamda LeGore). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas S. Curran, Jeffrey M. Theodore). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan C. Bunge, Valerie Goo, Daniel R. Lombard). (no document attached) (gxr)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER on #534 Defendant's notice of withdrawal of stipulation. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/04/2022.(jpp)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/4/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE of Submission of Correspondence to Special Master by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 537 RESPONSE re #536 Trial Brief filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Lombard, Daniel) (jpp).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 536 TRIAL BRIEF 01 re: Compelling Attendance of Defendant's CEO Gavin Hattersley at Trial by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Curran, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Curran, Douglas) (jpp).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 535 RESPONSE re #534 Notice (Other) filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 534 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Proposed Stipulation by MillerCoors LLC (Goss, Kent) (jpp).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER on #504 Motion to Exclude testimony of Scott Whitley and matters to be determined by the Court or the Jury. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/02/2022. (jpp)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 532 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Jury Trial reset for 3/7/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
February 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 531 NOTICE of Filing of Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Special Master's Report and Recommendation)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 530 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Adams on behalf of MillerCoors LLC (Adams, William)Attorney William B. Adams added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William B. Adams added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:cc) (jpp).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 529 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Final Pretrial Conference) held on 2/8/2022 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2022. (akr)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/8/2022.Denying #513 Motion to Continue Trial Date. The Court orders the parties to disclose their respective witnesses who will be present for the trial no later than February 14, 2022. Section II(6) of the Order Appointing Special Master (ECF No. 499) is modified; objections or proposed modifications to the Special Master's order, report, or recommendations are now due within 7 days of the parties being served (modified from 20 days). Written rulings to follow on all other matters discussed. (Court Reporter/ECR Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, John Tobias Rowe, Jeffrey M. Theodore).(Defendant Attorney Kent B. Goss, Molly A. Jones, Valerie M. Goo, Daniel R. Lombard, Jonathan C. Bunge). (no document attached) (gxr)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER granting #514 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/07/2022. (jpp)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jonathan C. Bunge, re #518 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/7/2022.(rmc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Daniel R. Lombard, re #517 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/7/2022.(rmc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #516 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/07/2022. (jpp)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting #515 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/07/2022. (jpp)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 522 OBJECTION by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #520 Objection Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Verdict Form. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 521 RESPONSE in Opposition re #513 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 520 OBJECTION by MillerCoors LLC re #492 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's General Verdict Form. (Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
February 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 519 REPLY to Response to Motion re #504 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott Whitley and for Adverse Inference Instruction at Trial filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16538816.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bunge, Jonathan) (rmc).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16538814.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lombard, Daniel) (rmc).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 516 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Matthew Worthington by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera Thereto)(Ferrera, Vinita) (jpp).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 515 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Brittany Amadi by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera Thereto)(Ferrera, Vinita) (jpp).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Vinita Ferrera by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera Thereto)(Ferrera, Vinita) (jpp).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION to Continue Trial Date by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE of Submission of Joint Proposed Pretrial Order to Special Master by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Joint Request, Stipulation, and [Proposed] Order to Reset Deadlines and Hearing on Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLCs Motion to Exclude Testimony of Scott Whitley and for Adverse Inference Instruction at Trial (ECF No. 504) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.)(jpp).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 510 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #508 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Goss, Kent) (jmo).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 509 RESPONSE in Opposition re #504 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott Whitley and for Adverse Inference Instruction at Trial filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Twigger, #2 Declaration of Kent B. Goss, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Goss, Kent) (jpp).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Jones, Molly) (jmo).
January 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Submission of Letter to Special Master by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE Regarding Submission of Materials to Special Master by MillerCoors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Molly) (jpp).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott Whitley and for Adverse Inference Instruction at Trial by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE of Submission of Letter to Special Master by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 502 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #501 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hagey, J.) (jmo).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (jmo).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 RESPONSE re #497 Objection filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER appointing Special Master. Andrew Guilford appointed. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/05/2022. (cc: Finance, Clerk of Court) (jpp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 498 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez to the calendar of the Honorable Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates currently set before Magistrate Judge Lopez remain as scheduled before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18cv331-BEN-MDD.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
December 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 OBJECTION by MillerCoors LLC re #493 Trial Brief [Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Objection to Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC's Brief Regarding Trial Issues] (Jones, Molly) (jpp).
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 NOTICE of Request to Refer Certain Disputes to Special Master by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER setting dates for Final Pre-trial Conference and Trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2022 at 10:30am. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 8:30am. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/21/2021.(jpp)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Whether Certain Issues are Jury or Court Determinations, Pursuant to ECF NO. 488 by MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 TRIAL BRIEF re: Matters to be Decided by Jury and by Court by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 492 NOTICE Plaintiff's Amended [Proposed] Verdict Form by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 NOTICE Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Proposed General Verdict From on Legal Claims and Defenses by MillerCoors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE (Letter Request for Clarification re. Resetting Trial Date) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Final Pretrial Conference) held on 11/3/2021 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2022. (akr)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/3/2021. The Court hereby vacates the Jury Trial date of 11/8/2021. Parties were informed the Court intends to appoint Special Master in accordance with FRCP 53 to handle numerous outstanding trial matters. Parties directed to provide list of proposed Special Masters to Court no later than 11/10/21. Regarding the Parties proposed verdict sheets, the Court directed Parties to submit a proposed general verdict form no later than 11/15/21. The Court further directed briefing from the Parties on the matters to be decided by the jury compared with equitable matters to be decided by the Court. Specifically, these briefs are to cover the outstanding issues of (1) waiver, (2) prior trademark registration of accused mark, (3) California Unfair Competition, and (4) determination of MillerCoors revenue and profits. Briefs are due no later than 12/3/21, are not to exceed 20 pages, and there will be no opposition or reply briefs. Regarding MillerCoors Clawback motion, the Court denied the Motion as to proposed Prosecution Exhibits 115, 173, 292, 1093, and 1094. The Court granted the Motion as to proposed Prosecution Exhibits 897, 1100, 2289, and 2386. The Court ordered MillerCoors to make available to Stone for deposition its second rebuttal experts who drafted their supplemental reports regarding damages. Questioning is limited to damages calculations. The Court reserved ruling on MillerCoors witness Scott Whitley. The Court orders MillerCoors to make Mr. Whitley available for deposition by Stone to allow Stone to ask questions about documents that may have been produced in relation to the scope of Mr. Whitleys employment. The Court ordered MillerCoors to submit to Stone no later than 11/15/21 the expected testimony of Sabrina Stavish. Once received, Stone has 30 days to depose Ms. Stavish covering the scope of her expected testimony; the Court will allow obtaining documents related to the deposition of Ms. Stavish. The Court ruled that it would not prevent Neil Nydegger from testifying as a rebuttal witness for MillerCoors. In response, Stone requested MillerCoors attorneys as witnesses. The Court instructed Stone to provide names of desired witnesses and justification for calling them before the Court would make a decision.(Court Reporter/ECR Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas S. Curran, J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Katie Kushner). (Defendant Attorney Kent B. Goss, Valerie M. Goo, Molly A. Jones, Vinita Ferrera). (no document attached) (gxr)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 TRIAL BRIEF Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(f)(9)(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance of Mariam Sarwar by Mariam Sarwar on behalf of MillerCoors LLC (Sarwar, Mariam)Attorney Mariam Sarwar added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft) (jrm).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Order on: (1) Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Special Master; (2) Associated Motions to File Under Seal (ECF Nos. #456 , #458 , #460 , #465 . Stone's Motion for Order to Show Cause Regarding Appointment of a Special Master is denied. The parties' related motions for leave to file are granted. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/27/21. (jmo)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Deadline for F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) Deposition by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting #479 Joint Motion to reset deadlines for document list exchange and depositions. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/22/2021.(jpp) (dlg).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 NOTICE of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Deadlines for Document List Exchange and Depositions by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 OBJECTION by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #474 Proposed Jury Instructions . (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 OBJECTION by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #474 Proposed Jury Instructions [Proposed Verdict Form]. (Hagey, J.) (jpp).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 OBJECTION by MillerCoors LLC re #475 Proposed Jury Instructions [Proposed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC]. (Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Verdict Form)(Hagey, J.) (jpp).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Proposed Verdict Form)(Goo, Valerie) (jpp).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/7/2021 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2021. (akr)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Status Conference held on 7/7/2021. The Court ruled on the record regarding certain discovery disputes and the timelines for submitting new jury instructions and verdict forms. No new Daubert motions will be allowed. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.(Court Reporter/ECR Juliet Eichenlaub). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Josh Weiss, Raymond Gallenberg). (Defendant Attorney Valerie M. Goo, Kent B. Goss, Shelly Watson). (no document attached) (gxr)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/7/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. All parties are hereby ordered to appear in-person.(no document attached) (gxr)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 RESPONSE re #469 Declaration filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 469 DECLARATION re #459 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,, Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,, by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Goss, Kent) (mme).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #458 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Appointment of a Special Master . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 5/10/2021 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 REPLY to Response to Motion re #458 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Appointment of a Special Master filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Hagey, J.) (tcf).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 **Docketed Under Seal at 485 per Order #482 **SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.)(sxa). Modified on 9/28/2021 to seal per Order (jmo).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 **Docketed Under Seal at 484 per Order #482 **SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #460 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie)(sxa). Modified on 9/28/2021 seal per order (jmo).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 DECLARATION re #461 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support of Opposition to Motion for OSC Regarding Appointment of Special Master by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Goo, Valerie) (mme).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 462 DECLARATION re #461 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Kelly Twigger in Support of Opposition to Motion for OSC Regarding Appointment of Special Master by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (mme).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re #458 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Appointment of a Special Master filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie M. Goo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Goo, Valerie) (mme).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (sxa).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER Granting #449 Motion to Substitute Expert Witness. Dr. Robert W. Palmatier is deemed to be Plaintiffs new marketing expert. Dr. Palmatier shall adopt all the expert reports of Dr. David Stewart. If Defendant seeks to depose Dr. Palmatier, the parties shall arrange for that deposition to occur by May 14, 2021, with Plaintiff to bear the costs for the deposition. No later than May 24, 2021, Defendant shall submit a declaration of fees and costs incurred for taking Dr. Palmatier's deposition and for opposing and objecting to this motion. Plaintiff may file a response to that declaration no later than June 1, 2021. The Court will then take the matter under submission. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/5/2021. (mme)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Appointment of a Special Master by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hagey, #2 Exhibits List, #3 Exhibits 1-12 to Hagey Decl., #4 Exhibits 13-24 to Hagey Decl., #5 Exhibits 25-35 to Hagey Decl.)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 **Docketed under seal at 483 per Order #482 **SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #456 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa). Modified on 9/28/2021 to seal per order (jmo).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #449 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Expert Witness . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 3/29/2021 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 REPLY to Response to Motion re #449 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Expert Witness filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore (Reply))(Hagey, J.) (mme).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by Forrest A Hainline, III on behalf of Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hainline, Forrest)Attorney Forrest A Hainline, III added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (mme).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #451 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Burstein, Dylan) (sxa).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Burstein, Dylan) (sxa).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 RESPONSE in Opposition re #449 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Expert Witness filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan S Burstein In Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Burstein, Dylan) (mme).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Expert Witness by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER Granting #446 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Christopher T Casamassima terminated for Defendant MillerCoors LLC. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/4/2021. (mme)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 447 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher T. Casamassima by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE of Appearance of Dylan S. Burstein by Dylan S Burstein on behalf of MillerCoors LLC (Burstein, Dylan)Attorney Dylan S Burstein added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft) (mme).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: The Court hereby vacates the Status Conference hearing date of 1/13/2021.(no document attached) (gxr)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER on: (1) Motions in Limine; (2) Motions for Leave to File Reply; (3) Motions to Seal [ECF. Nos. #379 , #383 , #424 , #428 , #431 , #433 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/7/2021. (anh)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Douglas Curran, re #438 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/6/2021.(rmc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-15159066.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Curran, Douglas) (rmc).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 REPLY to Response to Motion re #431 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Offer Of Proof RE. Withheld Evidence / MIL # 5 filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER Granting #430 Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Strike Confidential Material from Public Record. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/14/2020. (mme)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 RESPONSE in Opposition re #431 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Offer Of Proof RE. Withheld Evidence / MIL # 5 filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 443 per Order #440 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #433 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ferrera, Vinita) (anh). Modified on 1/7/2021 (anh).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (anh).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 1/13/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Offer Of Proof RE. Withheld Evidence / MIL # 5 by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike Document [Confidential Material from Public Docket] by MillerCoors LLC. (Jones, Molly) (jpp).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 **Docketed under seal at 442 per Order #440 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #428 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ferrera, Vinita) (anh). Modified on 1/7/2021 (anh).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (anh).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 DECLARATION re #426 Response - Other Declaration of Kelly Twigger in Support of Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Opposition to Offer of Proof by Stone Brewing Co. by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Ferrera, Vinita) (tcf).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 RESPONSE re #423 Notice (Other) of Offer of Proof re Withheld Evidence/MIL #5 by Stone Brewing Co. filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Twigger)(Ferrera, Vinita) (tcf). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/14/2020, per order #436) (mme).
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 **Docketed under seal at 441 per Order[ #440 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #424 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (anh). Modified on 1/7/2021 (anh).
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE of Offer of Proof re Withheld Evidence/MIL #5 by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re 410 Status Conference,,,,, Set Hearings,,,, (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER Granting Motions for Leave to File Certain Declarations and Exhibits Under Seal and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/29/2020. (anh)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 10/21/2020 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2021. (akr)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER Granting Motions for Leve to File Certain Declarations and Exhibits Under Seal [ECF Nos. #366 #370 #373 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/22/2020. (anh)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Status Conference held on 10/21/2020. The Parties are ordered to prepare a list of witnesses they intend to call at trial, the substance of their testimony, and any documents that will support their testimony on or before December 7, 2020. Counsel are directed to meet and confer in-person before filing their witness lists to resolve any disputes. As discussed during todays Status Conference, Plaintiff may file an Offer of Proof to its Motion in Limine of no more than FIVE (5) pages no later than November 20, 2020. Defendant may file a response of no more than FIVE pages no later than December 4, 2020. Each Party may attach a maximum of FIVE pages of exhibits and attachments to their filing. Status Conference continued to 12/16/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. All parties are ordered to appear in-person on 12/16/2020.(Court Reporter/ECR Amamda LeGore). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffre M. Theodore). (Defendant Attorney Kent B. Gross, Valerie M. Goo). (no document attached) (gxr)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER on Objections to Reports and Recommendations [ECF Nos. #295 , #296 ]. The Court orders Defendant MillerCoors to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $57,614.00, the legal fees and costs associated with Plaintiff's filing of its motion for sanctions. Defendant MillerCoors shall pay the fee award within thirty days. The remaining requests for relief are denied. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/14/2020. (tcf)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER on Objection to Discovery Order [ECF No. #367 ]. Plaintiff Stone Brewing Company's Objection (ECF No. #367 ) to Magistrate Judge Lopez's Order (ECF No. #351 ) is overruled. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/16/2020. (tcf)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 10/14/2020 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melinda S. Setterman. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2021. (akr)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/14/2020. All parties appearing telephonically. Status Conference continued to 10/21/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. All parties are ordered to appearing in-person.(Court Reporter/ECR Melinda Setterman). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey M. Theodore, Bran Schumer). (Defendant Attorney Valerie Goo, Kent Goss). (no document attached) (gxr)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MillerCoors LLC identifying Corporate Parent Molson Coors Beverage for MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (tcf).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 REPLY - Other re #401 Ex Parte MOTION to Set Deadlines and for Related Relief filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (sxa).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. All parties are to connect telephonically using the following information: (866)434-5269; ACCESS CODE: 5877929. All parties will mute their telephones until their case number is called. (no document attached) (gxr)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 RESPONSE in Opposition re #401 Ex Parte MOTION to Set Deadlines and for Related Relief filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie M. Goo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Goo, Valerie) (mme).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Ex Parte MOTION to Set Deadlines and for Related Relief by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MINUTE ORDER issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: The Court hereby vacates the Jury Trial date set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. The Court will issue a new order setting a date for a further Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial date.(no document attached) (gxr)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Proposed Voir Dire by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE of Joint Request for Clarification re Final Pretrial Conference by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 REPLY to Response to Motion re #383 In Limine MOTION to Exclude (Nos. 1-6) filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Hagey, J.)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 *Docketed under seal at 422 per Order #416 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #395 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa). Modified on 10/30/2020 (anh).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 **Docketed under seal at 421 per Order #416 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #392 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (sxa). Modified on 10/30/2020 (anh).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 REPLY to Response to Motion re #379 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Nos. 1-9 (Combined) filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Goo, Valerie)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (sxa).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 RESPONSE in Opposition re #379 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Nos. 1-9 (Combined) filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 *8Docketed under seal at 420 per Order #416 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #389 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa). Modified on 10/30/2020 (anh).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (sxa).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 *Docketed under seal at 419 per Order #416 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #386 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Goss, Kent) (sxa). Modified on 10/30/2020 (anh).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 RESPONSE in Opposition re #383 In Limine MOTION to Exclude (Nos. 1-6) filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Goss, Kent) (mme).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goss, Kent) (sxa).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #381 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hagey, J.)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Sealed Document by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #382 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Hagey, J.)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 In Limine MOTION to Exclude (Nos. 1-6) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 **Docketed under seal at 418 per Order #416 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #381 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2020 (anh).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 **Docketed under seal doc. no. 417 per Order #416 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #378 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2020 (anh).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Nos. 1-9 (Combined) by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Goo, Valerie) (mme).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (aef).
June 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER re #376 Amended Pretrial Deadlines. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020. Both Parties shall file motions in limine, if any, no later than June 22, 2020. Oppositions shall be filed by July 6, 2020, subject to the same page limits. Replies shall be filed no later than July 13, 2020 and shall be limited to twelve (12) total pages for all motions in limine combined. Motions in limine filed on June 22, 2020 shall be calendared for hearing at the July 27, 2020 further Pre-Trial Conference. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/21/2020. (mme)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Joint MOTION To Set Pretrial Deadlines And [Proposed] Order by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) *QC Mailer sent - proposed orders should not be attached* (mme).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 REPLY - Other re #367 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #363 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 **Docketed under seal at doc no. 414 per Order #411 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #373 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.)(aef). Modified on 10/23/2020 (anh).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.)(aef).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 413 Order #411 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #370 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (aef). Modified on 10/23/2020 (anh).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re #367 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #363 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Goo, Valerie) (mme).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (aef).
May 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 DECLARATION re #367 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #363 Order on Motion for Discovery of J. Noah Hagey by Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
May 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 412 per Order #411 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #366 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef). Modified on 10/23/2020 (anh).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #363 Order on Motion for Discovery . (Hagey, J.) (mme).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER Granting #353 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Documents filed in Support of Motion Re Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/17/2020. (aef)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER Denying #351 Plaintiff's Motion Re Discovery Dispute Pursuant to ECF No. #348 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/17/2020. (sxa) (rmc).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER Denying #358 Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Reply Re Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 3/31/2020. (mme)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 **DOCKETED IN ERROR** CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is: The Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.The Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Brief is DENIED as moot.(mme) Modified on 4/1/2020 to reflect judgment in error (mme).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part #175 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Denying #170 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and (3) Denying as Moot #271 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Summary Judgment Briefs or, In the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/27/2020. (mme)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RESPONSE re #358 Notice (Other) filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (mme).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE of Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLCs Request For Leave To File Reply by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #351 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to ECF No. 348 (Hagey, J.) (mme). Modified on 3/31/2020 (mme).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez Rejecting re #356 Reply to Response to Motion, from Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Pursuant to the Courts March 10, 2020 Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Discovery Dispute, [n]o replies shall be filed unless otherwise ordered by the Court. ECF No. 348 at 2.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties (mme)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 **STRICKEN PER ECF ORDER #357** to Response to Motion re #351 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to ECF No. 348 filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme). (Main Document 356 replaced on 3/27/2020) (mme). Modified on 3/27/2020 to reflect document stricken (mme).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition re #351 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to ECF No. 348 filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List to Declaration of Vinita Ferrera and Exhibits 1 and 2)(Goo, Valerie) (mme).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #353 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #350 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #349 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Theodore, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to ECF No. 348 by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #3 Exhibit 1-15 to Declaration of J. Noah Hagey)(Hagey, J.) (mme). Modified on 4/17/2020 to un-term the motion, termed by mistake (dlg).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #349 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/18/2020 QC email sent re incorrect s/signature (aef).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Discovery Dispute. Plaintiff must file its motion on or before 3/17/2020. Defendant's opposition must be filed on or before 3/24/2020. No replies shall be filed unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 3/10/2020. (tcf)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 2/24/2020 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2020. (akr)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Denying #338 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs motion, but ORDERS the following :Defendant shall produce the full 2017, 2018, and 2019 MCDC and FDM videos on or before March 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 3/4/2020. (mme)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER Granting #344 Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs request and accepts the reply filed concurrently with the request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 3/2/2020. (mme)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE Of Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLCs Request For Leave To File Reply by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #338 MOTION to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions (Hagey, J.) (mme).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RESPONSE in Opposition re #338 MOTION to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions, #218 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany Amadi in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Kent Goss in Support of Defendant Millercoors' Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Certification, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE of Withdrawal by MillerCoors LLC re #341 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 **WITHDRAWN PER ECF #342**RESPONSE in Opposition re #338 MOTION to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions, #218 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations filed by MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany Amadi in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Kent Goss in Support Defendant Millercoors' Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(Ferrera, Vinita) (mme). Modified on 2/28/2020 to reflect document withdrawn (mme).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER:(1) Denying #153 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Michael Kallenberger ; (2) Denying #157 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Purported Damages Expert Mark J. Hosfield ; (3) Denying #159 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Carrie L. Distler; (4) Denying #162 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Heidi Harris ; (5) Denying #164 MOTION to Exclude David W. Stewart; (6) Denying #168 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Either Hal Poret or Jeffery A. Stec. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/24/2020. (mme)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/2020. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 7/27/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. All proposed voir-dire questions are to be filed no later than 8/25/2020.(Court Reporter/ECR Amamda LeGore). (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey Michael Theodore). (Defendant Attorney Brittany Blueitt Amadi, Valerie M. Goo, Molly A. Jones). (no document attached) (gxr)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION to Compel Discovery Certification and Renewed Motion for Sanctions by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MINUTE ORDER issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: DENYING #335 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference (Unopposed) by MillerCoors LLC. (no document attached) (gxr)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff must file its motion to compel by February 24, 2020 and it shall be no longer than five pages. Defendants opposition must be filed by February 27, 2020 and it shall be no longer than five pages. No replies shall be filed unless requested by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 2/20/2020.(mme)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference (Unopposed) by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Jones, Molly) *QC Mailer sent re proposed orders should not be attached* (mme).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 RESPONSE re #332 Notice (Other) re Pre-Trial Conference filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant jointly contacted chambers regarding a discovery dispute pursuant to the Court's February 11, 2020 order. ECF No. 329. Based on the parties' representations, the Court ORDERS a follow-up telephonic, attorneys-only discovery dispute conference call on February 19, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. PST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 2/14/20.(fk1)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE Regarding Final Pretrial Conference by MillerCoors LLC (Jones, Molly) (mme).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: On February 13, 2020, counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant jointly contacted chambers regarding the Court's February 11, 2020 order. Based on the parties' representations, the Court finds it appropriate to AMEND the order such that if lead counsel are unable to resolve the issues raised in Plaintiff's ex parte application and motion to compel in the telephonic meet and confer, lead counsel for the parties shall meet in-person or via videoconference by 2:00 p.m. PST on February 14, 2020. All other requirements and deadlines remain as previously set. See ECF No. 329. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 2/13/20.(fk1)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/24/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER Denying #328 Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co. LLC's Ex Parte Application for Briefing Schedule on Motion to Compel and for Sanctions; ORDER Directing The Parties to Meet and Confer in Person. The Parties are hereby advised that failure to adhere to this Courts Order mayresult in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 2/11/2020. (mme)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE of Ex Parte Application for Briefing Schedule on Motion to Compel and for Sanctions by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #326 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 RESPONSE to Motion re #308 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal and Order on Motions to Seal [ECF No. 285] filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Tobias Rowe)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER Granting #323 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Lodge Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order. The deadline for the parties to lodge their Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is continued from January 6, 2020, to February 11, 2020. No further extensions will be granted without just cause. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/3/2020. (mme)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadline to Lodge Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Theodore, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/2/2020 to reflect as motion (mme).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/18/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Status Conference re settlement held on 12/4/2019. (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey Michael Theodore). (Defendant Attorney Valerie Meiling Goo, Kent Brian Goss). (Josh Weiss, Ray Gallenberg).(no document attached) (fk1)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 REPLY - Other re #295 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #284 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #318 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Attorneys-only telphonic Status Conference set for 12/4/2019 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/2/2019.(mme)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 RESPONSE re #297 Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (sjm).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #314 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hagey, J.) (aef).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 RESPONSE re #295 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #284 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (sjm).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #311 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Goo, Valerie) (aef).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie) (aef).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by MillerCoors LLC re #305 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by MillerCoors LLC . (Ferrera, Vinita)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #308 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (dlg).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (dlg).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #304 The Stipulated Joint Motion to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Extend the Deadline to Lodge the Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order. The parties shall have until January 6, 2020, to lodge their Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order with Judge Benitezs Chambers; and the Final Pretrial Conference, currently scheduled for December 16, 2019, shall be CONTINUED to Monday, January 13, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/22/2019. (mme)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE re #304 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to Lodge Proposed PreTrial Conference Order and Unopposed Motion to Continue Final PreTrial Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 **WITHDRAWN PER ECF #310**MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) QC email, missing sealed lodged proposed document (dlg). Modified on 12/4/2019 (mme).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to Lodge Proposed PreTrial Conference Order and Unopposed Motion to Continue Final PreTrial Conference; [Proposed] Order by MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (mme).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 REPLY to Response to Motion re #271 MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER denying #286 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/18/2019. (mme)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #271 MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 11/25/2019 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 12/16/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Objection to Report and Recommendation re #284 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Goo, Valerie) (mme).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Defendant MillerCoors LLC'S Objection to Report and Recommendation 283 Modified on 11/18/2019 to add text (mme).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC, re #284 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC . (Hagey, J.) (mme).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #293 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hagey, J.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #291 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Goo, Valerie)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Goo, Valerie)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 RESPONSE in Opposition re #271 MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45)(Ferrera, Vinita)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #288 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 DECLARATION re #284 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC of J. Noah Hagey by Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Request for Telephonic Status Conference by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.) Modified on 11/6/2019 to change request to motion (mme).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #151 , #154 , #155 , #160 , #165 , #166 , #190 , #200 , #203 , #207 , #226 , #227 , #230 , #239 , #241 Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/5/2019. (aef)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for order granting in part and denying in part re: #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 10/31/2019.(mme)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Granting #259 , #267 , #273 Motions to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 10/30/2019. (aef)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 REPLY to Response to Motion re #272 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Stones Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 RESPONSE in Opposition re #272 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Stones Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 REPLY to Response to Motion re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey (Reply), #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Hagey, J.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/30/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #273 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
October 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Stones Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants Summary Judgment Briefs or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit Exhibits List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2), #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #269 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hagey, J.) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/30/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #267 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ferrera, Vinita) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by MillerCoors LLC re #263 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by MillerCoors LLC . (Ferrera, Vinita)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re #261 MOTION for Sanctions filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 (Part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit 4 (Part 2 of 2), #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Declaration of Kelly Twigger in Support, #36 Exhibit A, #37 Exhibit B, #38 Exhibit C, #39 Exhibit D, #40 Exhibit E, #41 Declaration of Mairead Dolan in Support, #42 Exhibit F, #43 Exhibit G, #44 Declaration of Jeff Long in Support)(Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/30/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #263 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECR #266 *** - MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2019 to withdraw document (aef).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #261 MOTION for Sanctions Appendix of Additional Authority. (Hagey, J.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION for Sanctions by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2 to Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1) to Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2) to Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #5 Exhibit 4 through 15 to Declaration of J. Noah Hagey)(Hagey, J.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/30/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #259 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef). Modified on 10/30/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule: Plaintiff must file its motion on or before 5:00 p.m. PST on October 11,2019. Defendants opposition must be filed on or before 5:00 p.m. PST on October 17, 2019. Plaintiffs reply, if any, must be filed on or before 12:00 p.m. PST on October 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 10/8/2019.(mme) (jao).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez:A telephonic Status Conference was held on 10/8/2019 to discuss the status of the parties' settlement negotiations. The case did not settle. No order to issue. (no document attached) (asm)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. On October 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., Plaintiff's counsel shall call the chambers of Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez with at least one party representative on the line. On October 8, 2019 at 10:30 a.m., Defendant's counsel shall call the chambers of Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez with at least one party representative on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 10/3/2019. (tcf) (jao).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 10/2/2019. The case did not settle. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney J. Noah Hagey, Jeffrey Michael Theodore). (Defendant Attorney Vinita Ferrera, Valerie Meiling Goo, Kent Brian Goss). (Josh Weiss, Ray Gallenberg, Chris Bellair, Dale Johnson, Frank Vacenti).(no document attached) (fk1)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly A. Jones on behalf of MillerCoors LLC (Jones, Molly)Attorney Molly A. Jones added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Telephonic Status Conference held with Defendant's counsel on September 30, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. regarding the upcoming Mandatory Settlement Conference (Defendant's Attorneys Vinita Ferrera and Kent Brian Goss)(no document attached) (bbc)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Telephonic Status Conference held with Plaintiff's counsel on September 30, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. regarding the upcoming Mandatory Settlement Conference (Plaintiff's Attorneys J. Noah Hagey and Jeffrey Michael Theodore)(no document attached) (bbc)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER finding as moot #177 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. On August 23, 2019, Plaintiff Stone Brewing filed a Motion to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations which was rejected by this Court on discrepancy. See ECF No. 180. The Motion to Compel for Sanctions for Discovery Violations was stricken for the reasons set forth in this Court's Order at ECF No. 180. Accordingly, the Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed in connection with that motion [ECF No. 177] is deemed MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on September 23, 2019. (no document attached) (asm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Re: #218 Stone Brewing Company LLC's Motion To Compel and For Sanctions for Discovery Violations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 09/17/2019. (mme)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez:Motions Submitted: #159 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Carrie L. Distler,, #166 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #162 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Heidi Harris re #161 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #168 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Either Hal Poret or Jeffery A. Stec re #167 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #164 MOTION to Exclude David W. Stewart,, #170 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #153 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Michael Kallenberger re #152 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #157 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Purported Damages Expert Mark J. Hosfield re #156 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 9/16/2019 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #239 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Purported Damages Expert Mark J. Hosfield re #156 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #241 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey)(aef).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting #216 , #219 , #222 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 9/9/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 REPLY to Response to Motion re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Casamassima in Support, #2 Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit 45, #4 Exhibit 46, #5 Exhibit 47, #6 Exhibit 48, #7 Exhibit 49, #8 Exhibit 50, #9 Exhibit 51, #10 Exhibit 52, #11 Exhibit 53, #12 Exhibit 54)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #226 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re #164 MOTION to Exclude David W. Stewart, filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #226 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #159 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Carrie L. Distler, filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany Amadi in Support, #2 Exhibit 15)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #226 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Heidi Harris re #161 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #230 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 RESPONSE in Support re #153 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Michael Kallenberger re #152 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #227 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE in Support re #168 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Either Hal Poret or Jeffery A. Stec re #167 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE in Support re #218 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (mme).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/9/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #222 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 RESPONSE in Opposition re #218 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Declaration of Mairead Dolan in Support, #22 Exhibit A)(Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
September 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/9/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #219 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ferrera, Vinita) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/9/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #216 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Theodore, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule: Plaintiff must file its motion to compel by September 5, 2019 and it shall be no longer than fifteen pages. Defendants opposition must be filed by September 6, 2019 and it shall be no longer than fifteen pages. Plaintiffs reply, if any, must be filed by September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. PST and it shall be no longer than five pages. Upon completion of the briefing, the Court will take the matter under submission pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1) and no personal appearances will be required, unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 09/05/2019.(mme)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 REDACTED ORDER Denying #145 Plaintiff Stone Brewing's Request for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's July 2, 2019 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 09/04/2019. (mme)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Granting #182 Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; ORDER Granting #187 Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co.'s LLC's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 9/4/2019. (aef)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE in Opposition re #164 MOTION to Exclude David W. Stewart, filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore, #2 Declaration of David W. Stewart, Ph.D.)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #207 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Declaration of Dominic Engels)(Hagey, J.) (mme).
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #203 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #159 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Carrie L. Distler, filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Kallenberger in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration of Jeffery A. Stec in Support, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Declaration of Hal Poret in Support, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Declaration of Mark J. Hosfield in Support, #11 Exhibit 1, #12 Exhibit 2, #13 Declaration of Christopher T. Casamassima in Support, #14 Exhibit 1, #15 Exhibit 2, #16 Exhibit 3, #17 Exhibit 4, #18 Exhibit 5, #19 Exhibit 6, #20 Exhibit 7, #21 Exhibit 8, #22 Exhibit 9, #23 Exhibit 10, #24 Exhibit 11, #25 Exhibit 12, #26 Exhibit 13, #27 Exhibit 14, #28 Exhibit 15, #29 Exhibit 16, #30 Exhibit 17, #31 Exhibit 18, #32 Exhibit 19, #33 Exhibit 20, #34 Exhibit 21, #35 Exhibit 22, #36 Exhibit 23, #37 Exhibit 24, #38 Exhibit 25, #39 Exhibit 26, #40 Exhibit 27, #41 Exhibit 28, #42 Exhibit 29, #43 Exhibit 30, #44 Exhibit 31, #45 Exhibit 32, #46 Exhibit 33, #47 Exhibit 34, #48 Exhibit 35, #49 Exhibit 36, #50 Exhibit 37, #51 Exhibit 38, #52 Exhibit 39, #53 Exhibit 40, #54 Exhibit 41, #55 Exhibit 42, #56 Exhibit 43)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #200 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)(aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Purported Damages Expert Mark J. Hosfield re #156 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark J. Hosfield in Support, #2 Declaration of Brittany Blueitt Amadi in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Michael Kallenberger re #152 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Kallenberger In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera in Support, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C, #16 Exhibit D, #17 Exhibit E, #18 Exhibit F, #19 Exhibit G, #20 Exhibit H, #21 Exhibit I, #22 Exhibit J, #23 Exhibit K, #24 Exhibit L)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Heidi Harris re #161 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Worthington in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #168 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Either Hal Poret or Jeffery A. Stec re #167 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Casamassima, Christopher) (mme).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPLY - Other re #184 Declaration filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/4/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #187 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef). Modified on 9/4/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 AMENDED ORDER Requiring Reply by Plaintiff re #185 Order. Reply to be filed on or before August 30, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. PST, without publicly disclosing the proposed sealed material. The reply shall be no more than five pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 08/28/2019.(mme)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Requiring Reply by Plaintiff re #184 Defendant's Declaration. Reply to be filed on or before August 30, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. PST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/28/2019.(sjt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 DECLARATION re #181 Order,, by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ferrera, Vinita) (mme).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/4/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita)(aef). Modified on 9/4/2019 to add filed date of lodgment (aef).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ferrera, Vinita) (aef).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Requiring Declaration and Evidence in Support of MillerCoors LLC's Opposition to Stone Brewing's Request for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's July 2, 2019 Order. Defendant is ORDERED to submit a declaration withevidentiary support of its argument that Mekanism employees were acting as the functional equivalent of MillerCoors employees on or before August 28, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. P.S.T. The Court will not consider any additional briefing on this issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 08/26/2019.(mme)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez Rejecting re #179 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations, from Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Motion does not comply with Judge Lopez's Civil Chambers Rule V(B) which requires the following: "If the parties meet and confer and fail to resolve their dispute through the meet and confer process, then counsel forall parties are required to determine a mutually agreeable time to conduct a conference call with Chambers...After the conference call, the law clerk assigned to the case will speak with Judge Lopez and the Court willissue an appropriate order." Based on the moving party's failure to comply with this requirement, the Motion isnot appropriately before the Court. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 08/26/2019.(mme)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 **DOCUMENT STRIKEN PER ECF #180** MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Discovery Violations by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (mme). (Main Document 179 replaced on 8/26/2019) (mme).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #177 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)(aef).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Granting Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel [Doc. No. #143 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/15/2019. (anh)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Declaration of Dominic Engels, #3 Declaration of David W. Stewart, Ph.D., #4 Declaration of Kendrick Vera, #5 Declaration of Ryan Moore, #6 Declaration of Deborah Jaeggi, #7 Declaration of Carrie Distler, #8 Declaration of Brandon Hernndez, #9 Request for Judicial Notice)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECLARATION re #170 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Christopher T. Casamassima) by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71)(Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #166 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #166 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Heidi Harris, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #166 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Either Hal Poret or Jeffery A. Stec re #167 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #165 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to Exclude David W. Stewart, by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Heidi Harris re #161 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #160 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Carrie L. Distler, by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Brittany Amadi, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Purported Damages Expert Mark J. Hosfield re #156 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #155 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Michael Kallenberger re #152 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #151 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (dlg).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Bram Schumer on behalf of Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Schumer, Bram)Attorney Bram Schumer added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Bram Schumer added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (anh).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Reconsideration re #137 Order filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Ferrera, Vinita) (anh).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Meiling Goo on behalf of MillerCoors LLC (Goo, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Meiling Goo added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Brian Goss on behalf of MillerCoors LLC (Goss, Kent)Attorney Kent Brian Goss added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #145 MOTION for Reconsideration. Opposition due by 8/9/2019. No replies shall be filed unless directed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/2/2019.(jrm) (jao).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Reconsideration re #137 Order by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Theodore, Jeffrey)(aef)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brittany Blueitt Amadi, re #140 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/29/2019.(mdc)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Michael Theodore added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:cd) (dlg).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #141 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC . (Hagey, J.) (dlg).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 142 *** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Theodore)(Hagey, J.) QC Mailer sent re incorrect CM/ECF account (jrm). Modified on 7/22/2019 (dlg).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12733150 - See #139 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Amadi, Brittany) Modified text on 7/18/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12733150.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Amadi, Brittany) 7/18/2019 - Sent QC e-mail re missing signature. (mdc)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference: Mandatory Settlement Conference reset for 10/2/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/15/2019.(jrm) (jao).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE: Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/2/2019.(anh)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER (1) denying #127 Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC's Motion for Reconsideration and (2) Denying #132 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response in Opposition to Motion and for Sanctions. The Court still finds it appropriate to order Plaintiff to designate and produce an additional 30(b)(6) witness for deposition on the four topics on or before June 27, 2019. Defendant is limited to no more than two (2) hours of additional 30(b)(6) testimony on all four of the topics at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/25/2019. (jrm) (jao).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #132 MOTION to Strike #131 Response in Opposition to Motion, and for Sanctions re MillerCoors LLC's Violation of Court Order filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Ferrera, Vinita) (anh).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting In Part Stone Brewing Com., LLC's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Exert Report Deadlines [ECF. No. #128 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/24/2019. (anh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order [Corrected Opposition to Stone Brewing's Request for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's June 11, 2109 Order] filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Ferrera, Vinita) (anh).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Strike #131 Response in Opposition to Motion, and for Sanctions re MillerCoors LLC's Violation of Court Order by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order [Opposition to Stone Brewing's Request for Partial Reconsideration of The Court's June 11, 2019 Order] filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Worthington, Matthew) (anh).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Expert Report Deadlines filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vinita Ferrera, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Ferrera, Vinita) (anh).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/20/2019.(anh)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Expert Report Deadlines by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Re: Discovery [ECF Nos. #124 , #125 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/11/2019.(anh)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant MillerCoors LLC re #123 Order Setting Briefing Schedule . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Robberson)(Ferrera, Vinita) (anh).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #123 Order Setting Briefing Schedule . (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for June 5, 2019 Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/5/2019.(anh)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Defendant's Motion to Compel [ECF Nos. #114 , #115 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 5/20/2019. (anh)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant MillerCoors LLC re #114 MOTION to Compel [Letter Brief re Privilege Pursuant to Dkt. 112] (Supplemental Letter Brief In Support Of Letter Brief On Improper Privilege Claw Backs). (Worthington, Matthew) (anh).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Discovery Deadlines (ECF Nos. #113 , #116 , #117 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 5/13/2019. (tcf)(jrd)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion re #114 MOTION to Compel [Letter Brief re Privilege Pursuant to Dkt. 112] filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (tcf).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION to Compel (Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute re: MillerCoors Improper Deposition Instructions and Interrogatory Responses) filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Ferrera, Vinita) (tcf).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #113 MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Compel (Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute re: MillerCoors Improper Deposition Instructions and Interrogatory Responses) by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Compel [Letter Brief re Privilege Pursuant to Dkt. 112] by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Worthington, Matthew) (anh).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 5/6/2019.(anh)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE: Defendant's Motion to Compel [ECF No. #98 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 5/6/2019. (anh)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [ECF No. #88 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/24/2019. (anh)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Stone Brewing Co., LLC.(Theodore, Jeffrey) (tcf).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 MOTION to Compel filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Worthington, Matthew) (tcf).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(Casamassima, Christopher) (tcf).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #98 MOTION to Compel filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying Plaintiff Stone Brewing Co., LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part Joint Motion to Continue Discovery [ECF No. #104 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/16/2019. (anh)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion for Order Granting in Part Joint Motion to Continue Discovery by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Theodore)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting #96 Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Motion for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/12/2019. (aef)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION to Compel filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (aef).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting #93 Defendant MillerCoors LLC's Motion for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/12/2019. (aef)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Compel by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Worthington, Matthew) (anh).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/12/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #96 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Worthington, Matthew) (aef). Modified on 4/15/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Worthington, Matthew) (aef).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting In Part Joint Motion to Continue Discovery [ECF. No. #91 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/9/2019. (anh)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/12/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #93 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #88 MOTION to Compel Defendant MillerCoors Llc's Opposition To Plaintiff Stone Brewing's Motion To Compel filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint MOTION for Order Extending Deadlines in Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings [ECF No. 72] by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THIRD DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Defendant must file its motion on or before April 11, 2019. Plaintiffs opposition must be filed on or before April 18, 2019. Defendants reply, if any, must be filed on or before April 22, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/5/2019.(jms)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses [ECF. No. #81 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/4/2019. (anh)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Compel by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Theodore, Jeffrey)anh). (anh).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Second Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 4/2/2019.(anh)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Matthew John Worthington (Re: ECF No. #84 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/27/2019.(jrd)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER (1) Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and (2) Denying Amended Motions to Dismiss Counterclaims [Doc. No. #28 , #30 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/26/2019. (anh)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12322370.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Worthington ISO Petition to Appear PHV, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Casamassima ISO Petition to Appear PHV)(Worthington, Matthew) (mdc)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 3/1/2019.(anh)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #78 Notice of Appearance (Theodore, Jeffrey) (anh).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Theodore on behalf of Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Theodore, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Michael Theodore added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (anh).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel [Doc. No. #76 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/22/2019. (anh)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Natalie Hanlon Leh] by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Casamassima)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 18-cv-00331-BEN-LL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/29/2018.(anh)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Standard Litigation [ECF No. #73 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 10/18/2018. (anh)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Order Re Discovery of ESI)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/12/2018.(anh)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2018. (Plaintiff Attorneys Noah Hagey, Rebecca Horton). (Defendant Attorneys Natalie Hanlon Leh, Christopher Casamassima). Counsel are directed to meet and confer regarding the issues raised in ECF Nos. 69 and 70, in accordance with Judge Adler's Chambers Rules and the guidance provided by the Court during the Case Management Conference. Court to issue scheduling order. (no document attached) (cdc)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE re #69 Supplemental Document to the Joint Discovery Plan filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (anh).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by MillerCoors LLC re #57 Joint Discovery Plan . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Allison Trzop, re #64 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/31/2018.(dsn)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Matthew J. Worthington, re #65 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/31/2018.(dsn)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims, #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 9/4/2018 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11610093.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Worthington, Matthew) (mdc)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11609456.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Trzop, Allison) (mdc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Support re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Expert Report of David W. Stewart, Ph.D (Supplemental), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration and Expert Report of David W. Stewart, Ph.D (Supplemental))(Hagey, J.) (anh).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims, #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing reset for 9/4/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #51 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Certain Declarations and Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/10/2018. (aef)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 continued to 9/12/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Counsel shall use the same call-in information previously provided. (no document attached) (cdc)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Continue August 7, 2018 Case Management Conference by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (acc).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Hagey, J.)(acc).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Hal Poret and Exhibits) by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by MillerCoors LLC re #48 Declaration filed by MillerCoors LLC . (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 8/1/2018.(acc)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (acc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/8/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #51 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (rmc). Modified on 8/10/2018- to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (rmc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by MillerCoors LLC re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Casamassima)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Christopher T. Casamassima) by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7A-7D, #3 Exhibit 7E-7I, #4 Exhibit 8-14, #5 Exhibit 15-22)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #55 ***DECLARATION re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Hal Poret and Exhibits) by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) Modified on 8/2/2018 (acc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Michael Kallenberger and Exhibits) by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Ashley Selman) by Defendant MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3-7, #4 Exhibit 8-19)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule re #28 Motion to Dismiss and #30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 7/30/2018. Replies due by 8/14/2018. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/27/2018. (acc)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie)(acc).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MillerCoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing and Related Briefing for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (anh).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by MillerCoors LLC. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Following Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/20/2018.(anh)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2018. (Plaintiff Attorneys J. Noah Hagey, J. Tobias Rowe, Rebecca Horton). (Defendant Attorneys Natalie Hanlon Leh, Christopher Casamassima). Court to issue written order. (no document attached) (cdc)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Joint #33 Motion to Continue. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss hearing is continued from June 18, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. to August 13, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/15/18. (dlg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #29 On Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Enlargement of Page Limit and to Accept Memorandum. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/13/2018. (anh)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #31 Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 (Corrected) to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 18 (Corrected) to Declaration of Steve Wagner, #3 Exhibit 31 (Corrected) to Declaration of Steve Wagner, #4 Exhibit 32 (Corrected) to Declaration of Steve Wagner)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Case Management Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/4/2018.(anh)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/4/2018. (Plaintiff Attorney Noah Hagey). (Defendant Attorneys Natalie Hanlon Leh, Christopher Casamassima). Court to issue written order. (no document attached) (cdc)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Continue Briefing Schedule And Set Coordinated Hearing by MillerCoors LLC. (Casamassima, Christopher) (anh).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Declaration and Expert Report of David Stewart, Ph.D in Support of Motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Appendix 1-3)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Declaration of Steve Wagner in Support of Motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1-18, #3 Exhibit 19, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 19, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 20-43)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #4 Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9)(Hagey, J.) (anh).
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Errata by Stone Brewing Co., LLC re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims (Hagey, J.)(anh).
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Request for Judicial Notice)(Hagey, J.) (anh). Modified on 6/15/2018 to term motion per dj chambers, amended motion filed (dlg).
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims. Stones' response to MillerCoors Counterclaims due on or before May 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/7/2018. (anh)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Hagey, J.) (anh).
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Joint Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Molson Coors Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/15/2018. (anh)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/4/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/16/2018.(anh)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Molson Coors Without Prejudice by MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne DeMarco)(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (rmc).
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Stone Brewing Co., LLC by MillerCoors LLC.(Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer MillerCoors LLC answer due 4/10/2018; Molson Coors Brewing Company answer due 4/10/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/5/2018. (anh)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Second Joint Stipulated Motion To Extend Time For Defendants To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint) by MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Hanlon Leh, Natalie) (anh).
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Natalie M. Hanlon Leh (Re: Doc. No. #13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/24/2018.(jrd)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Vinita Ferrera (Re: Doc. No. #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vicea). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/24/2018.(jrd)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company (Casamassima, Christopher) (anh). (jao).
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11025787.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hanlon Leh, Natalie)(jrd)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11025641.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ferrera, Vinita)(jrd)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer MillerCoors LLC answer due 4/4/2018; Molson Coors Brewing Company answer due 4/4/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/8/2018. (anh)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) by MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casamassima, Christopher) QC Mailer Sent Re: Proposed Order(anh).
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Casamassima on behalf of MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company (Casamassima, Christopher)Attorney Christopher T Casamassima added to party MillerCoors LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T Casamassima added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft) (anh).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Horton on behalf of Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Horton, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Horton added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (anh).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Tobias Rowe on behalf of Stone Brewing Co., LLC (Rowe, John)Attorney John Tobias Rowe added to party Stone Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (anh).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stone Brewing Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stone Brewing Holdings, LLC for Stone Brewing Co., LLC.. (Hagey, J.) (anh). (jao).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. Molson Coors Brewing Company served. (Hagey, J.) (anh).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. MillerCoors LLC served. (Hagey, J.) (anh).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *2168093* cc:USPTO (tcf) (jao).
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 25, MillerCoors LLC, Molson Coors Brewing Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10908033.), filed by Stone Brewing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-331-BEN-JMA. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Hagey, J.)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone Brewing Co., LLC v. Molson Coors Brewing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MillerCoors LLC
Represented By: Brittany Blueitt Amadi
Represented By: Christopher T Casamassima
Represented By: Dylan S Burstein
Represented By: Matthew John Worthington
Represented By: Natalie M. Hanlon Leh
Represented By: Vinita Ferrera
Represented By: Kent Brian Goss
Represented By: Mariam Sarwar
Represented By: Molly A. Jones
Represented By: Valerie Meiling Goo
Represented By: Daniel R. Lombard
Represented By: Jonathan C. Bunge
Represented By: William B. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molson Coors Brewing Company
Represented By: Vinita Ferrera
Represented By: Christopher T Casamassima
Represented By: Natalie M. Hanlon Leh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stone Brewing Co., LLC
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: John Tobias Rowe
Represented By: Rebecca Horton
Represented By: Douglas S. Curran
Represented By: Bram Schumer
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Andrew Guilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?