Ms. L. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al Featured Case

The American Civil Liberties Union filed a lawsuit on behalf of woman from the Democratic Republic of Congo who came to the United States seeking asylum with her 7-year-old daughter, only to be forcibly removed from each other and detained in distant facilities once they arrived. The lawsuit claims that the government's treatment of the woman and her daughter violates the Due Process Clause of the US Constitution. On March 9, the ACLU amended its complaint, broadening it to a class action alleging a widespread practice of forcibly separating asylum-seeking parents and young children

Petitioner: Ms. L. and Ms. C.
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Thomas Homan, Greg Archambeault, Joseph Greene, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Kevin K. McAleenan, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Alex Azar, Scott Lloyd, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Adrian P. Macias and Francis M. Jackson
Amicus: Michael Wishnie, et al., amici curiae and Children's Rights., Inc., et al., amici curiae
Case Number: 3:2018cv00428
Filed: February 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 08:1158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER Following Status Conference. A status conference was held on July 12, 2019. The Dora Plaintiffs' request to withdraw their pending motion at Docket No. 342 is granted. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on August 14, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on August 16, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/15/2019.(aef)
July 15, 2019 Filing 434 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 7/12/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (akr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 433 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2019. 342 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement for Class Members Who Have Not Submitted Executed Waiver Forms filed by Dora, Alma, - Withdrawn by Dora plaintiffs. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan, Sirine Shebaya (tel) for Dora plaintiffs).(Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart (tel), Sarah Fabian (tel)).(Commander Jonathan White HHS (tel), Steven Herzog (tel) from Steering Committee, Zachary Best (tel) for plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM, Catherine Weiss (tel), Linda Dakin-Grimm). (no document attached) (jak)
July 11, 2019 Filing 432 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 5, 2019 Filing 431 REPLY to Response to Motion re 418 MOTION to Allow Parents Deported Without Their Children to Travel to the United States filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee)(aef).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER Granting 419 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/1/2019. (aef)
June 28, 2019 Filing 428 RESPONSE in Opposition re 418 MOTION to Allow Parents Deported Without Their Children to Travel to the United States filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER Granting 426 Joint Motion for Extension of Time For Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint as to Greg Archambeault; Alex Azar; L. Francis Cissna; Pete Flores; Joseph Greene; Thomas Homan; Francis M. Jackson ; Scott Lloyd; Adrian P. Macias; Hector A. Mancha Jr.; Kevin K. McAleenan; Kirstjen Nielsen; Office of Refugee Resettlement; Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; U.S. Customs and Border Protection; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services; U.S. Department of Homeland Security; and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.Answer by Respondent-Defendant's due 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 06/28/2019. (mme)
June 28, 2019 Filing 426 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 250 Amended Complaint,, by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
June 10, 2019 Filing 425 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 6/7/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (akr)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on June 7, 2019. On or before June 14, 2019, Defendants shall deliver to Plaintiffs' counsel the first packet of information concerning children of the expanded Ms. L. class members. On Plaintiffs' motion to allow parents deported without their children to travel to the United States, Defendants shall file their opposition on or before June 28, 2019, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before July 5, 2019. The motion will be heard on July 12, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on July 11, 2019. A further status conference shall be held in conjunction with the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion on July 12, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/7/2019.(aef)
June 7, 2019 Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 6/7/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. Motion Hearing/Status Conference set for 7/12/2019 1:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo. Wilson Barmeyer for Dora plaintiffs). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (Zachary Best for MMM (18cv1832) plaintiffs. Cdr Jonathan White HHS. Jean-Michel Voltaire of HHS. Dawn Helland of ICE. ICE counsel: Julie Laughlin, Hilary Rainone. Chief Jay Visconti of CBP. CBP counsel: Caroline Jackson. Steven Herzog from the Steering Committee. Catherine Weiss for objectors.).(no document attached) (jak)
June 6, 2019 Filing 422 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
June 6, 2019 Filing 421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 419 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 420 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
June 6, 2019 Filing 420 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 419 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Gelernt, Lee) (rmc).
June 6, 2019 Filing 419 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (rmc).
June 6, 2019 Filing 418 MOTION to Allow Parents Deported Without Their Children to Travel to the United States by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Allow Parents Deported Without Their Children to Travel to the United States, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER of USCA as to 206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Appellants' unopposed motion to continue the stay of appellate proceedings is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until July 29, 2019. On or before July 29, 2019, appellants may file a status report and motion for further relief. Failure to file a status report and motion will terminate the stay of appellate proceedings and the briefing schedule will be reset. (akr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 416 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Hearing) held on 5/17/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2019. (akr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on May 17, 2019. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on June 6, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on June 7, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/17/2019.(aef)
May 17, 2019 Filing 414 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 5/17/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. The next hearing will be on 6/7/2019 at 1:00 PM. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian, Jean-Michel Voltaire HHS OGC). (Cdr Jonathan White, Steven Herzog from Steering Committee. Zachary Best for plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM).(no document attached) (jak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 413 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
May 8, 2019 Filing 412 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 5/8/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on May 8, 2019. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on June 6, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on June 7, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/8/2019.(aef)
May 8, 2019 Filing 410 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 5/8/2019. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo. For Dora plaintiffs - Wilson Barmeyer). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian). (Steven Herzog for Steering Committee. For plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM - Zachary Best).(no document attached) (jak)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER Granting 408 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time for Respondents-Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent-Defendants' Answer to Petitioner-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint shall be due Friday, June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/8/2019. (aef)
May 7, 2019 Filing 408 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
May 7, 2019 Filing 407 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
April 29, 2019 Filing 406 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 4/25/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (akr)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER Following Status Conference. A status conference was held on April 25, 2019. As indicated during the conference, the Court orders that the Plan be completed in six months, or by October 25, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on May 17, 2019, at 1:00 p.m., with a Joint Status Report to be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on May 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/25/2019.(aef)
April 25, 2019 Filing 404 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing Hearing held on 4/25/2019. Commander Jonathan White HHS, called, sworn, testified. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo, Stephen Kang). (Defendant Attorneys Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian. Brian Stimson HHS OGC, Jean-Michel Voltaire HHS OGC). (Steven Herzog for the Steering Committee, Cmdr Jonathan White HHS, Jay Visconti CBP).(no document attached) (jak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 403 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
April 25, 2019 Filing 402 STATUS REPORT Re Proposed Identification Plan by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER Resetting Status Conference. The status conference currently scheduled for April 24, 2019, is continued to April 25, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/19/2019. (tcf)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 5:00 p.m. on April 23, 2019. A further status conference on these issues shall be held on April 24, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. On the previously defined class and the M.M.M. case, the next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on May 7, 2019. A further status conference on the previously defined class and the M.M.M. case shall be held on May 8, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/17/2019. (tcf)(jrd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 399 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 4/16/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 398 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 4/16/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Further Status Conference set for 4/24/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo. For Dora plaintiffs: Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Steering Committee: Steven Herzog. For objectors: Catherine Weiss. For 18cv1832 MMM plaintiffs: Zachary Best).(no document attached) (jak)
April 15, 2019 Filing 397 REPLY - Other re 394 Notice (Other), Re Proposed Identification Plan filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
April 12, 2019 Filing 396 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah)(aef).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER of USCA as to 206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Appellants' unopposed motion to continue the stay of appellate proceedings is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until May 28, 2019. On or before May 28, 2019, appellants may file a status report and motion for further relief. Failure to file a status report and motion will terminate the stay of appellate proceedings and the briefing schedule will be reset. (akr)
April 5, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE PROPOSED EXPANDED MS. L CLASS IDENTIFICATION PLAN SUMMARY by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration J. White, # 3 Declaration B. Graubard)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER Granting 389 Joint Motion to Amend July 8, 2018 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/28/2019. (aef)
March 28, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Hearing) held on 3/28/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on March 28, 2019. Defendants shall submit their proposal on the next steps for the new class members on or before 3:00 p.m. on April 5, 2019. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on April 12, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on April 16, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/28/2019.(aef)
March 28, 2019 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 3/28/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt. For Dora plaintiffs - Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer, Emily Bork). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (for 18cv1832 MMM plaintiffs, Zachary Best. For Steering Committee, Steven Herzog. For objectors, Catherine Weiss).(no document attached) (jak)
March 27, 2019 Filing 389 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Alma, Dora. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barmeyer, Wilson) Modified on 3/28/2019 QC email re proposed orders should not be attached (aef).
March 27, 2019 Filing 388 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. PST on March 27, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on March 28, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. PST. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/8/2019.(sjt)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting 335 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Class Definition. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/8/2019. (sjt)
March 8, 2019 Filing 385 PRO HAC APPROVED: Emily A. Bork appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (jrd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 384 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12279719.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Bork, Emily)(jrd)
March 7, 2019 Filing 383 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 3/7/2019. All counsel appeared telephonically.(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Dora plaintiffs: Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Zachary Best for plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM, Steven Herzog with the Steering Committee, Catherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
March 6, 2019 Filing 382 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting 155 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Declarations. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting 64 Motion to File Declarations Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting 47 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting 36 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Declaration of Mc. C. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting 33 Motion to File Complaint Using Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to File Documents Declaration of Elizabeth Lopez Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER Granting 199 Motion to File Restricted Declaration; and Granting 201 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER Granting 152 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Overlength Reply Brief. Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' Motion to File Overlength Reply Brief, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/5/2019. (aef)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER Granting 365 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Third Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent-Defendants Answer to Petitioner-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint shall be due Monday, April 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/1/2019. (aef)
March 1, 2019 Filing 365 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 250 Amended Complaint,, by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
February 25, 2019 Filing 364 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 2/21/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. The next Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. PST on March 6, 2019. A further status conference shall be held on March 7, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. PST. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/22/2019.(aef)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Conference Agreement for Class Members who have not submitted executed waiver forms. It is hereby ordered on or before February 28, 2019, defense counsel shall provide to ClassCounsel the list of persons subject to removal. Counsel shall meet and confer on the best way to cull that list down to persons with expedited removal orders. Defense counsel shall advise Immigration and Customs Enforcementthat class members subject to the settlement agreement in this case may not beremoved without first providing them with notice of the settlement and an opportunity to decide whether they wish to take advantage of the settlement procedures or waive those procedures. Counsel shall provide the Court with an update on these issues in the next Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/22/2019.(aef)
February 21, 2019 Filing 361 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 2/21/2019 re 335 MOTION to Clarify Scope of the Ms. L Class filed by Ms. C., Ms. L., 342 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement for Class Members Who Have Not Submitted Executed Waiver Forms filed by Dora, Alma. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang, Anan Balakrishnan(teleph), Dora plaintiffs: Sirine Shebaya(teleph), Wilson Barmeyer(teleph).). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Steven Herzog(teleph) for steering committee, Catherine Weiss(teleph) for objectors, Linda Dakin-Grimm for disputed class member. Zachary Best(teleph) for plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM).(no document attached) (jak)
February 20, 2019 Filing 360 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
February 15, 2019 Filing 359 REPLY - Other re 347 Response - Other, filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
February 14, 2019 Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Saei on behalf of Alma, Dora (Saei, Joseph)Attorney Joseph Saei added to party Alma(pty:pet), Attorney Joseph Saei added to party Dora(pty:pet) (aef).
February 13, 2019 Filing 357 REPLY to Response to Motion re 335 MOTION to Clarify Scope of the Ms. L Class filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Child Advocates)(Gelernt, Lee)(ag).
February 13, 2019 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re 342 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement for Class Members Who Have Not Submitted Executed Waiver Forms filed by Alma, Dora. (Barmeyer, Wilson) (ag).
February 11, 2019 Filing 355 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 2/8/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. PST on February 20, 2019. A further status conference shall be held in conjunction with the hearing on the pending motions on February 21, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/11/2019.(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER on Further Clarifications to Settlement Agreement of November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019.(aef)
February 8, 2019 Filing 352 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 2/8/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. Further Status Conference confirmed for 2/21/2019 at 3:00 PM. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (for Dora Plaintiffs: Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer. For objectors: Catherine Weiss. For Steering Committee: Steven Herzog. For plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM Zachary Best).(no document attached) (jak)
February 6, 2019 Filing 351 RESPONSE in Opposition re 335 MOTION to Clarify Scope of the Ms. L Class filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Fabian, Sarah)(aef).
February 6, 2019 Filing 350 RESPONSE in Opposition re 342 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement for Class Members Who Have Not Submitted Executed Waiver Forms filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
February 6, 2019 Filing 349 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
February 4, 2019 Filing 348 Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2019 is vacated and reset for 2/21/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.(no document attached) (jak)
February 1, 2019 Filing 347 RESPONSE re 345 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1),,, filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration J. White, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
February 1, 2019 Filing 346 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Alma, Dora (Smith, Johnathan) (aef).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER Lifting Stay and Setting Dates. On Plaintiffs' motion to clarify the scope of the class, Defendants shall file their responsive brief on or before February 6, 2019, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief on or before February 13, 2019. Plaintiffs' motion to enforce the settlement agreement, (ECF No. 342), Defendants shall file their responsive brief on or before February 6, 2019, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief on or before February 13, 2019. The motions referred to in Paragraphs 3 and 4 above shall be heard on February 22, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiffs motion to require a response to the Inspector General's January 17, 2019 Report is granted. Defendants shall file a response to that Report on or before February 1, 2019. Counsel shall file further status reports on or before 12:00 noon on February 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/25/2019. (aef)
January 25, 2019 Filing 344 MOTION to Require Response to Inspector General Report by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Supplement Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER of USCA as to 206 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit. Respondents' unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted. Respondents shall file a motion for further relief within 7 days of the restoration of funding. (akr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 342 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement for Class Members Who Have Not Submitted Executed Waiver Forms by Alma, Dora. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit In support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Barmeyer, Wilson) (aef).
January 3, 2019 Filing 341 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing: 1/4/2019 Status Conference vacated. (no document attached) (jak)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting 339 Motion to Stay of Case Deadlines until further order of this Court. Defendants will notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/27/2018. (sjm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 339 MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines Due To Lapse in Appropriations by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah)(sjm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 338 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 12/14/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2019.. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference: Status Hearing set for 1/4/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2018.(anh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 336 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 12/14/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Status Conference set for 1/4/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Nicole Murley). (Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer for Dora plaintiffs, Zachary Best for 18cv1832 MMM plaintiffs. Steven Herzog for Steering Committee. Katherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
December 14, 2018 Filing 335 MOTION to Clarify Scope of the Ms. L Class by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Clarify Scope of the Ms. L Class)(Gelernt, Lee) (anh).
December 12, 2018 Filing 334 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
December 5, 2018 Filing 333 STATUS REPORT by Lesbi Martinez-Martinez, Egla Arely Velasquez Molina. (McNerney, Martin) (aef).
December 4, 2018 Filing 332 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 11/30/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on November 30, 2018. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their opening brief on or before December 14, 2018. Defendants shall file their responsive brief on or before December 28, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief on or before January 4, 2019. Counsel shall file further status reports on or before December 12, 2018. A further status conference shall be held on December 14, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2018.(aef)
November 30, 2018 Filing 330 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing held on 11/30/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. (Status Conference set for 12/14/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan, Sirine Shebaya). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (Jennifer Levy for Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC, Zachary Best, Justin Bernick for Plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS MMM, Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Joshua Tull for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
November 29, 2018 Filing 329 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
November 29, 2018 Filing 328 STATUS REPORT of Objectors by Lesbi Martinez-Martinez, Egla Arely Velasquez Molina. (McNerney, Martin) (aef).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER of USCA as to 206 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit. Appellants' unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until January 8, 2019. On or before January 8, 2019, appellants may file a status report and motion for further relief. Failure to file a status report and motion will terminate the stay of appellate proceedings and the briefing schedule will be reset. (akr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER. (ECF 325 ) It is ORDERED that Defendants agree to pay for costs to provide notice to non-detained class members for an amount up to $16,500.00, and ORDERED, that Plaintiffs will provide Defendants with a detailed accounting of all costs. If Defendants believe that Plaintiffs are improvidently using the money provided by Defendants, Defendants reserve the right to raise such concerns and any related disputes to the Court for resolution, and further, ORDERED, that if Plaintiffs determine that they need more than $16,500.00 to provide notice to non-detained class members, Plaintiffs will notify Defendants and will provide a detailed estimate of the additional amount requested, and the parties will meet and confer regarding the request and, if the parties reach agreement, present to the Court a joint proposed order to authorize the payment of further notice-related costs. Should the parties fail to resolve the matter, the parties will present the dispute to the Court for resolution. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/27/2018. (aef)
November 27, 2018 Filing 325 Joint MOTION Approval of Stipulation for Notice Costs for Class Action Settlement by Alma, Dora. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barmeyer, Wilson) Modified on 11/27/2018-QC mailer sent re proposed order (aef).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER Granting 323 Joint Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent-Defendants Answer to Petitioner-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint shall be due Monday, January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/26/2018. (aef)
November 21, 2018 Filing 323 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 250 Amended Complaint,, by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
November 15, 2018 Filing 322 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Final Approval Hearing) held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER Certifying the Settlement Classes and Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (ECF 315 ) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/15/2018. (aef)
November 15, 2018 Filing 320 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Approval Hearing held on 11/15/2018. Court to file order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt and Anan Balakrishnan (telephonically), Stephen Kang; for Dora plaintiffs Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer, Aaron Olson). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Jennifer Levy (telephonically)for plaintiffs in 18cv1626 NTC, Zachary Best and Justin Bernick for plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM). (Other counsel: Martin McNerney, Ashley Neglia, Catherine Weiss, Emily Nicklin (telephonically). (no document attached) (jak)
November 15, 2018 Filing 319 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Objections to Settlement Agreement by Lesbi Martinez-Martinez (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McNerney, Martin) (aef).
November 14, 2018 Filing 318 RESPONSE re 282 Objection, 292 Objection, 294 Objection, 289 Objection, 306 Objection - Joint Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement filed by Alma, Dora. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Withdrawal of Objection, # 2 Exhibit Copy of Objection)(Barmeyer, Wilson) (aef).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on November 9, 2018. Counsel in both this case and the New York cases shall file further status reports on or before 3:00 p.m. on November 29, 2018. A further status conference shall be held on November 30, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/13/2018.(aef)
November 9, 2018 Filing 316 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 11/9/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
November 9, 2018 Filing 315 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Alma, Dora. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, # 2 Exhibit In support, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Barmeyer, Wilson) (aef).
November 9, 2018 Filing 314 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 11/9/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Further Status Hearing set for 11/30/2018 1:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang, Anan Balakrishnan. For Dora Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer, Aaron Olson). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Steve Herzog, Steering Committee). (Jennifer Levy for plaintiffs in 18cv1626 NTC, Zachary Best, Justin Bernick for Plaintiffs in 18cv1832 MMM).(no document attached) (jak)
November 8, 2018 Filing 313 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Egla Arely Velasquez Molina re 289 Objection to the October 9, 2018 Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Romano, Julia) (aef).
November 8, 2018 Filing 312 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Lesbi Martinez-Martinez re 282 Objection to October 9, 2018 Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Romano, Julia) (aef).
November 8, 2018 Filing 311 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Requesting Response. In anticipation of the hearing on final approval of the settlement in these cases, the Court requests written responses from the parties to the objections. The parties' responses shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/8/2018.(aef)
November 7, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE Re Settlement Agreement by Brad Joselino Monterroso Azurdia. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. (aef)
November 7, 2018 Filing 308 NOTICE Re Settlement Agreement by Iris Viviana Azurdia Estrada. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. (aef)
November 7, 2018 Filing 307 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Notice regarding settlement agreement, from Objector Iris Viviana Azurdia Estrada. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: OTHER: Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/7/2018.(aef)
November 6, 2018 Filing 306 OBJECTION of Proposed Settlement by Christine Bateup. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. (aef)
November 6, 2018 Filing 305 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Objection of proposed settlement, from Objector Christine Bateup. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Date noticed for hearing not in compliance with rules/documents are not timely. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/6/2018.(aef)
November 6, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE Re Settlement Agreement by Leyder Moises Hernandez Gonzalez. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/2/2018. (aef)
November 6, 2018 Filing 303 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Notice re Settlement Agreement, from Objector Leyder Moises Hernandez Gonzalez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.3: Document illegible or submitted on thermal facsimile paper. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/6/2018.(aef)
November 6, 2018 Filing 302 NOTICE Re Settlement Agreement by Emma Elizabeth Gonzalez Barrientos. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/2/2018. (aef)
November 6, 2018 Filing 301 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Notice re Settlement Agreement, from Objector Emma Elizabeth Gonzalez Barrientos. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.3: Document illegible or submitted on thermal facsimile paper. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/6/2018.(aef)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Martin M. McNerney, re 297 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/6/2018. (mdc)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Christina Briesacher, re 296 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/5/2018. (mdc)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Emily Nicklin, re 295 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/5/2018. (mdc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 297 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11869155.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McNerney, Martin) (mdc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 296 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11865023.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Briesacher, Christina) (mdc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 295 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11865007.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nicklin, Emily) (mdc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 294 OBJECTION by M. D-L to the October 5, 2018 Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Neglia, Ashley)(aef).
November 2, 2018 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of M. D-L (Neglia, Ashley)Attorney Ashley Elizabeth Neglia added to party M. D-L(pty:obj) (aef).
November 2, 2018 Filing 292 OBJECTION by Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York to the Proposed Settlement of October 5, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony Enriquez, # 2 Declaration Alexandra Rizio, # 3 Declaration Kaavya Viswanathan, # 4 Proof of Service Cert of Service)(Weiss, Catherine) (aef).
October 25, 2018 Filing 291 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Granting 288 Joint Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent-Defendants answer to Petitioner-Plaintiffs' third amended complaint shall be due Friday, November 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/23/2018. (aef)
October 23, 2018 Filing 289 OBJECTION to the October 5, 2018 Settlement Agreement by Egla Arely Velasquez Molina. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(aef)
October 22, 2018 Filing 288 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 250 Amended Complaint,, by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER on 265 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Require Implementation of Settlement Agreement. The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion to require implementation of the parties' settlement agreement. Specifically, the Court orders Defendants to begin the asylum process provided for in the agreement to those class members that are in detention and have executed an election form. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/18/2018. (aef)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on October 16, 2018. Counsel in both this case and the New York cases shall file further status reports on or before October 25, 2018, and on or before 3:00 p.m. on November 8, 2018. A further status conference shall be held on November 9, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/16/2018.(aef)
October 16, 2018 Filing 285 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 10/16/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
October 16, 2018 Filing 284 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 10/16/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Further Status Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 1:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Anand Balakrishnan, (Dora) Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Jennifer Levy and Beth Kraus for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS N.T.C., Zachary Best and Justin Bernick for plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS M.M.M.).(no document attached) (jak)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Catherine Weiss (Re: Doc. No. 262 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/15/2018.(jrd)
October 15, 2018 Filing 282 OBJECTION to the October 5, 2018 Settlement Agreement by Lesbi Martinez-Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(aef)
October 15, 2018 Filing 281 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
October 15, 2018 Filing 280 RESPONSE in Opposition re 265 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Implementation of Settlement Agreement filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
October 15, 2018 Filing 279 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
October 15, 2018 Filing 278 PRO HAC APPROVED re 276 : Carol T. McClarnon appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 277 PRO HAC APPROVED re 275 : Sophia Leticia Gregg appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 276 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11787179.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McClarnon, Carol) (mdc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 275 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11785922.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gregg, Sophia) 10/15/2018 - Confirmed by phone that Atty Gregg is requesting appearance for parties Dora and Alma only. (mdc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 274 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11772796 - See 262 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Weiss, Catherine) Modified text on 10/15/2018 to include filing info info. (mdc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 273 PRO HAC APPROVED re 272 : Johnathan James Smith appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 272 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11772990 - See 263 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Smith, Johnathan) Modified text on 10/12/2018 to include filing fee info. (mdc)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Requesting Response. (Re ECF 265 ) The Court is in receipt of the emergency motion to require implementation of the settlement agreement filed by Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases. Defendants shall file a response to the motion on or before October 15, 2018. Unless otherwise. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/11/2018.(aef)
October 11, 2018 Filing 270 PRO HAC APPROVED re 267 : John H. Fleming appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 269 PRO HAC APPROVED re 264 : Sirine Shebaya appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 268 PRO HAC APPROVED re 261 : Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 267 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11767464 - See 254 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fleming, John) Modified text on 10/12/2018 to include filing fee info. (mdc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Rose Glynn on behalf of Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York (Glynn, Katie) (aef).
October 10, 2018 Filing 265 Emergency MOTION for Order Requiring Implementation of Settlement Agreement by Alma, Dora. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barmeyer, Wilson) (aef).
October 10, 2018 Filing 264 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11768538 - See 258 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Shebaya, Sirine) (mdc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 263 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11772990.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Smith, Johnathan) 10/11/2018 - Missing a signature. (mdc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 262 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11772796.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Weiss, Catherine) 10/11/2018 - Atty to refile. (mdc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 261 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11771442.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) (mdc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 260 PRO HAC APPROVED re 253 : Wilson G. Barmeyer appearing for Petitioners Alma, Dora. (no document attached) (Local counsel Aaron M. Olsen confirmed that the pro hac vice request was intended only for these two parties.) (mdc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 259 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 10/9/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 258 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11768538.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Shebaya, Sirine) 10/10/2018 - Missing a signature. (mdc) 10/11/2018 - Refiled as 264 . (mdc)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on October 9, 2018. Counsel in both this case and the New York cases shall file a further status report on or before October 15, 2018. A further status conference shall be held on October 16, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/9/2018.(aef)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Granting 247 Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement; Preliminarily Certifying the Settlement Classes; and Approving Class Notice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/9/2018. (aef)
October 9, 2018 Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 10/9/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Amended complaint to be filed. The Court will enter the order granting preliminary approval following entry of the amended complaint. (Further Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw, Final Approval Hearing set for 11/15/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Jennifer Levy for Plaintiffs in 18cv1626 N.T.C., Zachary Best and Justin Bernick for Plaintiffs in 18cv1832 M.M.M., Caroline Heller for Plaintiffs in 18cv1769 R.G.H., Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer and Carol McClarnos for Plaintiffs in Dora case.).(no document attached) (jak)
October 9, 2018 Filing 254 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11767464.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fleming, John) 10/10/2018 - Missing a signature. (mdc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 253 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11767213.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barmeyer, Wilson) (mdc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance of Alreen Haeggquist by Aaron M. Olsen on behalf of Alma, Dora (Olsen, Aaron) Modified on 10/9/2018-QC mailer sent re wrong s/ (aef).
October 9, 2018 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Olsen on behalf of Alma, Dora (Olsen, Aaron)Attorney Aaron M. Olsen added to party Alma(pty:pet), Attorney Aaron M. Olsen added to party Dora(pty:pet) (aef).
October 9, 2018 Filing 250 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed by Alma, Ms. L., Dora, Ms. C. (aef)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Granting 244 Joint Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint and to File Under Pseudonym. Plaintiffs are hereby granted leave to file a Third Amended Complaint in the form attached to the Motion. The Third Amended Complaint shall be filed under pseudonym, and Exhibit C to the parties' Joint Motion shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/9/2018. (aef)
October 5, 2018 Filing 247 MOTION for Settlement , Preliminary Certification of Settlement Classes, and Approval of Class Notice by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Proposed Class Notice)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 246 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/9/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee) (dlg). Modified on 10/9/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (dlg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 244 MOTION to Amend/Correct 85 Amended Complaint, by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Gelernt, Lee)(aef).
September 27, 2018 Filing 243 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on September 21, 2018. A further status conference shall be held on October 9, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/25/2018.(aef)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Granting 232 Joint Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent-Defendants answer to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint shall be due Wednesday, October 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/21/2108. (aef)
September 21, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 9/21/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
September 21, 2018 Filing 239 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 9/21/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Anand Balakrishnan, Stephen Kang). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC: Jennifer Levy, for Plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS MMM: Justin Bernick, for Plaintiffs in 18cv1769-DMS RGH: Rex Chen, Caroline Heller, Jack McBride, for Plaintiffs in Dora case: Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer).(no document attached) (jak)
September 20, 2018 Filing 238 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (anh).
September 20, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Antonio Galindo on behalf of Ms. C., Ms. L. (Galindo, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Antonio Galindo added to party Ms. C.(pty:pet), Attorney Daniel Antonio Galindo added to party Ms. L.(pty:pet) (anh).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER on Reunification of Ms. Q and Mr. C. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/19/2018.(aef)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on September 14, 2018. Counsel shall file a further status report on or before September 20, 2018. A further status conference shall be held on September 21, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/19/2018.(aef)
September 18, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 9/14/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
September 17, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE of Supplemental Declaration by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 221 Supplemental Briefing (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Carey)(Gelernt, Lee) (sjm).
September 14, 2018 Filing 232 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 9/14/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Further Status Conference set for 9/21/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.) Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC: Jennifer Levy. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS MMM - Zachary Best, Justin Bernick. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1769-DMS RGH - Rex Chen, Adam Siegler, Jack McBride, Caroline Heller, Guillermo Stampur. For Plaintiffs in Dora - Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer.)(no document attached) (jak)
September 14, 2018 Filing 230 Exhibit List by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Murley, Nicole) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Exhibits by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 223 Supplemental Briefing,, (Murley, Nicole) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Filing 228 NOTICE re: Rule 23(e) Requirements by Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York re 220 Notice (Other),, (Glynn, Katie)Attorney Katie Rose Glynn added to party Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York(pty:ip) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 227 DECLARATION re 222 Status Report,, Declaration of Jonathan White by Respondents Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 226 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 225 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 225 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 224 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 224 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 223 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Respondents Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Regarding Criminal History Excusions of Ms Q and Mr C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Ms Q, # 2 Exhibit B-Mr C)(Fabian, Sarah)(jsp)(jrd) (aef). Modified on 9/17/2018 Exhibits A and B withdrawn per ECF 229 (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 222 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Filing 221 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Petitioners Ms. C., Ms. L. Regarding Reunification of Two Parents. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
September 12, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE LODGING AGREEMENT FOR COURT'S APPROVAL by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
September 10, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Scholars of Habeas Corpus and Constitutional Law re 121 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux). (Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER of USCA as to 206 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit. Appellants' unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until November 9, 2018. On or before November 9, 2018, appellants may file a status report and motion for further relief. Failure to file a status report and motion will terminate the stay of appellate proceedings and the briefing schedule will be reset. (akr)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A status conference was held on 9/7/2018. Counsel shall file a further status report on or before 9/13/2018. A further Status Conference is set for 9/14/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/2018.(aef)
September 7, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 9/7/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 215 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing held on 9/7/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (Jennifer Levy for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS, Zachary Best and Justin Bernick for plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS).(no document attached) (jak)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Providing Dial-In Information for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/6/2018.(aef)
September 6, 2018 Filing 213 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 31, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/31/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 31, 2018 Filing 211 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/31/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Further Status Conference set for 9/7/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC - Jennifer Levy. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS MMM - Justin Bernick, T. Weymouth).(no document attached) (lrf)
August 30, 2018 Filing 210 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 27, 2018 Filing 209 USCA Case Number 18-56151 for 206 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, L. Francis Cissna, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Hector A. Mancha Jr., U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Joseph Greene, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Pete Flores, Greg Archambeault, Kirstjen Nielsen, Scott Lloyd, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Thomas Homan, Alex Azar, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Kevin K. McAleenan, Adrian P. Macias, Francis M. Jackson. (akr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 208 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/24/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Following Status Conference. A further Joint Status Report on the reunification efforts in Ms. L. and N.T.C. shall be filed by 3:00 p.m. on August 30, 2018. A further telephonic status conference shall be held on August 31, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/24/2018.(aef)
August 24, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 83 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Classwide Preliminary Injunction, by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Fee Waived. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Fabian, Sarah). (Modified on 8/24/2018: Edited docket text re linked Order.) (akr).
August 24, 2018 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/24/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Further Status Conference set for 8/31/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC - Jennifer Levy, Harrison (Buzz) Frahn. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS MMM - Zachary Best, Justin Bernick).(no document attached) (jak)
August 23, 2018 Filing 204 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 20, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 198 MOTION to Lift Stay of Removal (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Granting 198 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay of Removal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/20/2018. (aef)
August 20, 2018 Filing 201 MOTION to Strike Document 198 MOTION to Lift Stay of Removal by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
August 20, 2018 Filing 200 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 199 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Gelernt, Lee) (dlg).
August 20, 2018 Filing 199 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (dlg).
August 20, 2018 Filing 198 MOTION to Lift Stay of Removal by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/17/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Following Status Conference. A telephonic status conference was held on August 17, 2018. A Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3:00 p.m. on August 23, 2018. A further telephonic status conference shall be held on August 24, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/17/2018.(aef)
August 17, 2018 Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/17/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. Status Conference set for 8/24/2018 1:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart, August Flentje). (Justin Bernick and Zachary Best, plaintiffs' counsel in 18cv1832-DMS).(no document attached) (jak) Modified on 8/17/2018 (jak).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Denying 110 Motion to Stay as Moot. In light of the order granting the plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order in M.M.M. v. Sessions, Case No. 18cv1832 DMS (MDD), ECF No. 55, the Court denies as moot Plaintiffs' motion to stay. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/16/2018. (aef)
August 16, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE Re Karnes by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting 105 Joint Motion Regarding Scope of the Court's Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/16/2018. (aef)
August 16, 2018 Filing 191 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 16, 2018 Filing 190 NOTICE Regarding Plan for Reunifying Removed Parents by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 189 Notice (Other),, (Gelernt, Lee)(aef).
August 16, 2018 Filing 189 NOTICE Revised Reunification Plan by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reunification Plan)(Fabian, Sarah)(aef).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Following Status Conference. Pursuant to the status conference held on August 10, 2018, the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before 3:00 p.m. on August 16, 2018. A further telephonic status conference shall be held on August 17, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/15/2018.(aef)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting 186 Joint Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent-Defendants answer to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint shall be due Thursday, September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/15/2018. (aef)
August 14, 2018 Filing 186 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 85 Amended Complaint,, by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole)(aef).
August 13, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/10/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 10, 2018 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/10/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. (Further Status Conference set for 8/17/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Zachary Best and Justin Bernick for plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS (M.M.M.), Charles Reiter, Jennifer Levy and Gregory Coipeland for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS (N.T.C.)).(no document attached) (jak)
August 9, 2018 Filing 183 STATUS REPORT Attachment - Reunification Plan by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 9, 2018 Filing 182 Joint Status Report filed as - AMENDED DOCUMENT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Amendment to 181 Status Report, Joint Report. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 9, 2018 Filing 181 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
August 8, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Motion Hearing) held on 8/8/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 8, 2018 Filing 179 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2018 re 110 MOTION to Stay Removal and Emergency TRO Pending Ruling on the Stay Motion MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ms. C., Ms. L. All counsel appearing telephonically. The stay will remain in place pending further order of the Court. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (Zachary Best and Justin Bernick for plaintiffs in 18cv1832-DMS (M.M.M.), Jennifer Levy and Charles Reiter for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS (N.T.C.)).(no document attached) (jak) Modified on 8/8/2018 to reflect telephonic appearances(jak).
August 7, 2018 Filing 178 Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: (Time Change Only). Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2018 is reset to be heard at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.(no document attached) (jak)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Setting Hearing. The motion for a temporary restraining that is pending in M.M.M. shall be heard on August 8, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/6/2018.(aef)
August 3, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/3/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2018. (akr)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER following Status Conference. Further Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/10/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/03/2018.(jpp)
August 3, 2018 Filing 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/3/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Charles Reiter). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, August Flentje, Sarah Fabian). (Jennifer Levy for plaintiffs in related case).(no document attached) (jak)
August 2, 2018 Filing 173 STATUS REPORT Supplement by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (jpp).
August 2, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 171 Status Report,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Gelernt, Lee) (jpp).
August 2, 2018 Filing 171 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (jpp).
August 1, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 7/30/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2018. (akr)
July 30, 2018 Filing 169 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Respondents Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 168 Supplemental Document . (Fabian, Sarah) (jpp).
July 30, 2018 Filing 168 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. . (Gelernt, Lee) (jpp).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER following status conference. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/30/2018.(jpp)
July 30, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of case(s) 18-1759 (D.D.C.) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M.M.M. Complaint, # 2 Exhibit M.M.M. TRO/PI Motion, # 3 Exhibit M.M.M. TRO/PI Memo of Law, # 4 Exhibit M.M.M. Proposed Order)(Flentje, August). Modified on 7/30/2018 to reflect, no proposed PLO prepared. (jpp).
July 30, 2018 Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/30/2018, re process of locating in-country and removed parents. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian, August Flentje). (no document attached) (jak)
July 30, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/27/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. (akr)
July 28, 2018 Filing 163 NOTICE Regarding Motion for Stay of Removal by Ms. C., Ms. L. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laila Arand, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Manning)(Gelernt, Lee) (jpp).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Following Status Conference. A status conference was held on July 27, 2018. The parties shall submit a further status report on or before 3:00 p.m. on August 2, 2018. A further telephonic status conference shall be held on August 3, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/27/2018.(sjt)
July 27, 2018 Filing 161 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/27/2018. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang, Bardis Vakili). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian (telephonically), Scott Stewart). (no document attached) (jak)
July 27, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 26, 2018 Filing 159 STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Following Status Conference. A status conference was held on July 24, 2018. On or before July 25, 2018, at noon, Defendants shall provide to Plaintiffs (1) a list of all Class Members that have been removed and (2) a list of all Class Members that have been released to the interior. On or before July 25, 2018, at noon, Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief on the motion to stay. The Court will hear argument on the motion at the July 27, 2018 status conference. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/25/2018.(aef)
July 25, 2018 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 155 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 156 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 25, 2018 Filing 156 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 155 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 25, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 25, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/24/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2018. (akr)
July 25, 2018 Filing 153 REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Stay Removal and Emergency TRO Pending Ruling on the Stay Motion MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 25, 2018 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 24, 2018 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing held on 7/24/2018 re related case that will be transferred from New York. Parties to meet and confer. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Judith Goldiner, SarahGillman, Beth Kraus, Gregory Copeland, Harrison (Buzz) Frahn). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (no document attached) (jak)
July 24, 2018 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing held on 7/24/2018. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Spencer Amdur, Bardis Vakili). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (no document attached) (jak)
July 24, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of case(s) 18-1626 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SDNY Habeas Petition, # 2 Exhibit NTC TRO, # 3 Exhibit NTC Transfer Order)(Flentje, August) Modified on 7/25/2018-Low number order not prepared (aef).
July 24, 2018 Filing 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Stay Removal and Emergency TRO Pending Ruling on the Stay Motion MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David Jennings, # 2 Exhibit Notice and Election Form)(Flentje, August) (aef).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 143 Consent Motion for Extension of Response Deadline re 110 MOTION for Stay of Removal. Defendant response due by 9am PST on 7/24/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/23/2018. (acc)
July 23, 2018 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah)(acc).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Re: Status Conference. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/23/2018.(acc)
July 23, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/20/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2018. (akr)
July 22, 2018 Filing 143 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 110 MOTION to Stay Removal and Emergency TRO Pending Ruling on the Stay Motion MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fabian, Sarah) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 128 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Levy. (Kronenberg, Chet) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 129 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Judith Goldiner. (Kronenberg, Chet) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 130 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Copeland. (Kronenberg, Chet) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 127 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Rieser-Murphy. (Kronenberg, Chet) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 131 Notice of Appearance filed by Ms. C., Ms. L. . (Reiter, Charles) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 125 Notice of Appearance filed by Ms. C., Ms. L. . (Kronenberg, Chet) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 126 Notice of Appearance filed by Ms. C., Ms. L. . (Frahn, Harrison)(acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/20/2018. Future deadlines and hearings confirmed. Status Conference previously set for 7/24/2018 will be heard at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt (telephonically), Stephen Kang, Spencer Amdur). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, August Flentje). (no document attached) (jak)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Noah Levine, re 119 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/19/2018. (mdc)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jamie S. Dycus, re 120 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/19/2018. (mdc)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux, re 121 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/19/2018. (mdc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 131 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 138 ***NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Reiter on behalf of Ms. C., Ms. L. (Reiter, Charles)Attorney Charles D. Reiter added to party Ms. C.(pty:pet), Attorney Charles D. Reiter added to party Ms. L.(pty:pet) (acc). Modified on 7/23/2018 (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 130 *** WITHDRAWN PER 140 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11466944.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Copeland, Gregory) (mdc) Modified text on 7/23/2018 re withdrawn status. (mdc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 129 *** WITHDRAWN PER 141 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11466925.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Goldiner, Judith) (mdc) Modified text on 7/23/2018 re withdrawn status. (mdc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 128 *** WITHDRAWN PER 142 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11466899.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Levy, Jennifer) (mdc) Modified text on 7/23/2018 re withdrawn status. (mdc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 127 *** WITHDRAWN PER 139 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11466679.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rieser-Murphy, Elizabeth) (mdc) Modified text on 7/23/2018 re withdrawn status. (mdc)
July 19, 2018 Filing 126 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 136 ***NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of Ms. C., Ms. L. (Frahn, Harrison)Attorney Harrison J. Frahn, IV added to party Ms. C.(pty:pet), Attorney Harrison J. Frahn, IV added to party Ms. L.(pty:pet) (jdt). Modified on 7/23/2018 (acc).
July 19, 2018 Filing 125 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 137 ***NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kronenberg on behalf of Ms. C., Ms. L. (Kronenberg, Chet)Attorney Chet A Kronenberg added to party Ms. C.(pty:pet), Attorney Chet A Kronenberg added to party Ms. L.(pty:pet) (jdt). Modified on 7/23/2018 (acc).
July 19, 2018 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT Joint filing by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (jdt).
July 19, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by August Edward Flentje on behalf of Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Flentje, August)Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Greg Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Alex Azar(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Fred Figueroa(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Pete Flores(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Joseph Greene(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Thomas Homan(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Francis M. Jackson(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Scott Lloyd(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Adrian P. Macias(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Hector A. Mancha Jr.(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney August Edward Flentje added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res) (jdt).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Respondent-Defendants answer to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint shall be due 8/16/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/18/2018. (jdt)
July 18, 2018 Filing 121 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11455571.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Cepeda Derieux, Adriel)(jrd)
July 18, 2018 Filing 120 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11455537.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Dycus, Jamie)(jrd)
July 18, 2018 Filing 119 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11455523.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Levine, Noah)(jrd)
July 17, 2018 Filing 118 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole). QC Mail - Proposed order attached (jdt).
July 16, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/16/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (akr)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER (1) Granting 110 Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency TRO pending Ruling on Motion to Stay and (2) Amending July 13, 2018 Order Following Status Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiffs' motion for an emergency TRO pending a ruling on their motion to stay is granted. Defendants shall file their opposition brief on or before July 23, 2018, at 9:00 a.m., Pacific Time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/16/2018. (aef)
July 16, 2018 Filing 115 Status Hearing Witness List. (jak)
July 16, 2018 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/16/2018. Motion (110) to Stay Removal and Emergency TRO - Stay is Granted. Defense to respond to Motion for TRO by 7/23/2018 9:00 AM. The motion will be heard at the Status Conference set for 7/24/2018 4:00 PM. Witness, Cmdr Jonathan White C/S/T. Court to issue order.(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Spencer Amdur). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart, Brian Stimson). (no document attached) (jak)
July 16, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 7/13/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (akr)
July 16, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/13/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018. (akr)
July 16, 2018 Filing 111 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Christopher T Casamassima on behalf of SCHOLARS OF HABEAS CORPUS AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of Removal and Emergency TRO Pending Ruling on the Stay Motion)(Casamassima, Christopher) (aef).
July 16, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION to Stay Removal and Emergency TRO Pending Ruling on the Stay Motion by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 7/16/2018 (aef).
July 15, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah)Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Fred Figueroa(pty:res) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Following Status Conference signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 07/13/2018. A further Status Conference will be held on July 16, 2018 at 9:30 a.m.(jpm)
July 13, 2018 Filing 107 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Murley, Nicole) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/13/2018. Further Status Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Bardis Vakili, Spencer Amdur). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian). (no document attached) (jak)
July 13, 2018 Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Order on Compliance by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murley, Nicole)Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Fred Figueroa(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Francis M. Jackson(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Adrian P. Macias(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Hector A. Mancha Jr.(pty:res) Modified on 7/16/2018 QC mailer sent re proposed orders should not be attached. (aef).
July 12, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE Joint Status Report by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 10, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/10/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (akr)
July 10, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/9/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (akr)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Following Status Conference. A follow-up status conference was held on July 10, 2018. Counsel shall submit a further joint status report to the Court on or before 3:00 p.m. on July 12, 2018. A further Status Conference shall be held at 1:00 p.m. on July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/10/2018.(aef)
July 10, 2018 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing held on 7/10/2018. (Further Status Conference set for 7/13/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Bardis Vakili, Anand Balakrishnan, Stephen Kang). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (no document attached) (jak)
July 10, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE Joint Notice Re Compliance by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 9, 2018 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Michelle Brane and Jennifer Podkul by Petitioners Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 9, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE Joint Notice of Parties re Notice to Class Members by Ms. C., Ms. L. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Government's Version, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Version)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 9, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE Joint Notice of Parties Re Process for Release by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Following Status Conference. A Status Conference is set for 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/9/2018.(aef)
July 9, 2018 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/9/2018. (Further Status Conference set for 7/10/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian). (no document attached) (jak)
July 9, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 7/6/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (akr)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PROTECTIVE ORDER. (ECF 90 ) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/8/2018. (aef)
July 8, 2018 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Further Status Conference. A Status Conference is set for 7/9/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/6/2018.(aef)
July 6, 2018 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/6/2018. Status Conference set for 7/9/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Bardis Vakili, Anand Balakrishnan). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (no document attached) (jak)
July 6, 2018 Filing 88 DECLARATION re 86 Notice (Other),, ICE Declaration by Respondents Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Stewart, Scott)Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Greg Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Alex Azar(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Fred Figueroa(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Pete Flores(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Joseph Greene(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Thomas Homan(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Francis M. Jackson(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Scott Lloyd(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Adrian P. Macias(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Hector A. Mancha Jr.(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res) (aef).
July 5, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE Regarding Compliance by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (jpp).
July 3, 2018 Filing 85 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed by Ms. L., Ms. C. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
July 2, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Dial-In Information. For purposes of the telephonic status conference scheduled for 7/6/2018 at 12:00 p.m., the Court has set up a dial in number for counsel and any members of the news media that wish to attend. (jdt)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 48 Plaintiffs' Motion for Classwide Preliminary Injunction. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion for classwide preliminary injunction. A status conference will be held on July 6, 2018, at 12:00 noon. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/26/2018. (aef)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting In Part 42 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is granted in part as to Plaintiffs' substantive due process claim. Plaintiffs are appointed as Class Representatives, and Counsel from the ACLU Immigrants' Rights Project and the ACLU of San Diego and Imperial Counties are appointed as counsel for this Class pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/26/2018. (aef)
June 26, 2018 Filing 81 REPLY - Other re 79 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
June 26, 2018 Filing 80 DECLARATION re 79 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Respondents Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
June 26, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Classwide Relief Supplemental Brief filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
June 25, 2018 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Petitioners Ms. C., Ms. L. re 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Classwide Relief and Additional Evidence. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
June 25, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 6/22/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2018. (akr)
June 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Amending Briefing Schedule. In light of the urgent nature of the motions currently pending before the Court, the Court finds good cause to advance the deadline for Defendants' supplemental brief. Accordingly, Defendants shall file their supplemental brief on or before June 26, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/24/2018.(aef)
June 22, 2018 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/22/2018. Plaintiff to file additional briefing by 6/25/2018. Defense to file response by 6/27/2018 4:30pm PST. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Vakili Bardis). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Samuel Bettwy). (no document attached) (jak)
June 21, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Dial-In Information. For purposes of the telephonic status conference scheduled for June 22, 2018, at 12:00 p.m., the Court has set up a dial in number for counsel and any members of the news media that wish to attend. This number is for counsel and media only, 877-873-8018. (aef)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Setting Status Conference. In light of the Executive Order issued today, June 20, 2018, entitled "Affording Congress an Opportunity to Address Family Separation," a telephonic status conference shall be held on June 22, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for Defendants shall organize and initiate the call to the Court. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/20/2018.(aef)
June 8, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Kang on behalf of Ms. C., Ms. L. (Kang, Stephen)Attorney Stephen B. Kang added to party Ms. C.(pty:pet), Attorney Stephen B. Kang added to party Ms. L.(pty:pet) (aef).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to dismiss. Specifically, the Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims under the APA and the Asylum Statute, and denies Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' due process claim. Although Plaintiffs did not request leave to amend in the event any portion of Defendants' motion was granted, the Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a Second Amended Complaint that cures the pleading deficiencies set out above. If Plaintiffs wish to do so, they shall file their Second Amended Complaint on or before July 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/6/2018. (aef)
May 9, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 5/4/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2018. (akr)
May 4, 2018 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2018 re 42 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ms. C., Ms. L., 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Classwide Relief filed by Ms. C., Ms. L. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Anana Balakrishnan, Lee Gelernt, Bardis Vakili). (Defendant Attorney Sara Fabian, Nicole Murley). (no document attached) (jak)
May 2, 2018 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ms. L., Ms. C.. Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
May 2, 2018 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ms. L.. Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served. (Gelernt, Lee)(aef).
April 27, 2018 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 64 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 65 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
April 27, 2018 Filing 65 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 64 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee)(aef).
April 27, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
April 27, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Classwide Relief filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
April 27, 2018 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee)(aef).
April 27, 2018 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Motion to File Amended Complaint Using Pseudonym. It is ORDERED that the Petitioners-Plaintiffs are granted leave to file the Amended Complaint using only the Petitioner-Plaintiff's initial. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/24/2018.(aef)
April 20, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Murley, Nicole)(aef).
April 20, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
April 20, 2018 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Classwide Relief filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
April 6, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Venue, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Fabian, Sarah)Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Francis M. Jackson(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Adrian P. Macias(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Hector A. Mancha Jr.(pty:res) (aef).
March 27, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole N. Murley on behalf of Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Murley, Nicole)Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Greg Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Alex Azar(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Pete Flores(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Joseph Greene(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Thomas Homan(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Scott Lloyd(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Nicole N. Murley added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res) (aef).
March 23, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Fabian on behalf of Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Fabian, Sarah)Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Greg Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Alex Azar(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Pete Flores(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Joseph Greene(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Thomas Homan(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Scott Lloyd(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res) (jpp).
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 17 , 23 Motions for Leave to File Amicus Briefs. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/22/2018. (aef)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER (1) Granting 51 Joint Motion to Reset Hearing Date and Set Briefing Schedule and (2) Denying as Moot 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Vacating Hearing Date Thereon. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/22/2018. (aef)
March 21, 2018 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Hearing (reset hearing date & set briefing schedule) by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
March 19, 2018 Filing 50 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 47 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jjg).
March 19, 2018 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
March 19, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Classwide Relief by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Classwide Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 16, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Bettwy, Samuel) QC mailer sent re missing proposed document (jjg).
March 16, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ortiz, # 2 Declaration Banzon, # 3 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
March 16, 2018 Filing 45 NON Opposition re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Brief by Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Habeas Corpus Petition and Complaint for Declaratory Injunctive Relief filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Francis M. Jackson, Scott Lloyd, Adrian P. Macias, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
March 12, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of DNA Results by Alex Azar, Scott Lloyd, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re 31 Order on Motion to Expedite, (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel)Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Alex Azar(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Scott Lloyd(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:res), Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:res) (aef).
March 12, 2018 Filing 43 Summons Issued re 32 Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (aef)
March 9, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Certify Class by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Rejecting re 35 Motion to Certify Class , from Petitioners Ms. C., Ms. L. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civil Local Rule 7.1.b. Counsel must obtain a hearing date from chambers prior to filing motions. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/9/2018.(aef)
March 9, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 36 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 37 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 35 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. C., Ms. L. re 33 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 34 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Filing 37 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 36 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee). (jah).
March 9, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee). (jah).
March 9, 2018 Filing 35 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF 41 *** - MOTION to Certify Class by Ms. C., Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits)(Gelernt, Lee) (Main Document 35 replaced on 3/9/2018) (aef). Modified on 3/9/2018 to strike document; motion termed (aef).
March 9, 2018 Filing 34 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 33 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee). (jah).
March 9, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee). (jah).
March 9, 2018 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief with Class Action Allegations against Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Hector A. Mancha Jr., Adrian P. Macias, Francis M. Jackson, filed by Ms. L., Ms. C..New Summons Requested. (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (1) Granting in part and Denying in part 14 Motion to Expedite and (2) Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motions for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Respondents-Defendants shall provide the results of the DNA testing to Petitioner-Plaintiff's counsel and the Court on or before March 14, 2018. Respondents-Defendants shall file their responses to the motions for preliminary injunction and to file amicus briefs on or before March 16, 2018. Petitioner-Plaintiff and Amici shall file their reply briefs on or before March 23, 2018. Absent a finding by theCourt that oral argument is unnecessary pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), the motions will be heard on March 29, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/8/2018. (aef)
March 8, 2018 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/8/2018. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Lee Gelernt, Bardis Vakili). (Defendant Attorney Samuel Bettwy, Nicole Murley). (no document attached) (jak)
March 7, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer E. W. Amdur on behalf of Ms. L. (Amdur, Spencer)Attorney Spencer E. W. Amdur added to party Ms. L.(pty:pet) (aef).
March 7, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Schedule filed by Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
March 6, 2018 Filing 27 Unredacted Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Ms. L. re 1 Petition. (jah)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Petitioner's 3 Motion to File Complaint Using Pseudonym. The Petitioner is granted leave to file the Complaint using only the Petitioner's initial. An unredacted copy of the Complaint will be received as a restricted document, only available to the parties in this litigation. The parties will not disclose the unredacted Complaint or Petitioner's true name to anyone other than parties to the litigation. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/6/2018. (jah)
March 5, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. L. re 24 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Documents (Vakili, Bardis) (aef).
March 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Documents by Ms. L. re 13 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Vakili, Bardis) (aef).
March 4, 2018 Filing 23 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Michael Shipley on behalf of Michael Wishnie, et al., amici curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Brief of Scholars of Immigration Law and Constitutional Law as Amici Curiae in Support of Ms. L.'s Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Proof of Service)(Shipley, Michael) (aef).
March 3, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. L. re 21 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 3, 2018 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Corrected Exhibits)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. L. re 15 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. L. re 14 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Schedule and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. L. re 13 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction (Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Brief by Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Habeas Corpus Petition and Complaint for Declaratory Injunctive Relief by Children's Rights, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Linh Nguyen, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit J to Declaration, # 13 Exhibit K to Declaration, # 14 Exhibit L to Declaration, # 15 Exhibit M to Declaration, # 16 Proof of Service)(Wynn, Summer)Attorney Summer J Wynn added to party Children's Rights, Inc.(pty:ip) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Filing 16 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 15 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gelernt, Lee). (jah).
March 2, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gelernt, Lee). (jah).
March 2, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Schedule by Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Ms. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declarations)(Gelernt, Lee) (aef).
February 28, 2018 Filing 12 PRO HAC APPROVED: Anand Venkata Balakrishnan appearing for Petitioner Ms. L. (no document attached) (jrd)
February 28, 2018 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10964160.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Balakrishnan, Anand)(jrd)
February 28, 2018 Filing 10 PRO HAC APPROVED: Lee Gelernt appearing for Petitioner Ms. L. (no document attached) (jrd)
February 28, 2018 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gelernt, Lee)
February 28, 2018 Filing 8 PRO HAC APPROVED: Judy Rabinovitz appearing for Petitioner Ms. L. (no document attached) (ajs)
February 28, 2018 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10963954.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rabinovitz, Judy)(jrd)
February 27, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ms. L. re 3 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 4 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Vakili, Bardis) (aef).
February 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ms. L.. Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served. (Vakili, Bardis) (aef).
February 27, 2018 Filing 4 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 3 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Vakili, Bardis). (jah).
February 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to File Complaint Using Pseudonym (Vakili, Bardis). Modified on 2/28/2018 - No Proof of Service. QC Email sent to file Proof of Service (jah). Modified on 3/7/2018 - Corrected motion event (jah).
February 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)(jrd)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Greg Archambeault, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Fred Figueroa, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10950244.), filed by Ms. L. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-428-DMS-MDD. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Vakili, Bardis)(tcf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ms. L. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms. L.
Represented By: Spencer E. W. Amdur
Represented By: Anand Venkata Balakrishnan
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms. C.
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Archambeault
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Greene
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pete Flores
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex Azar
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: U S Attorney CV(Designation Assistant United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hector A. Mancha Jr.
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adrian P. Macias
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francis M. Jackson
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Michael Wishnie, et al., amici curiae
Represented By: Michael Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Children's Rights., Inc., et al., amici curiae
Represented By: Summer J Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?