Santos v. Office Depot, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Santos
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. and DOES 1 - 100
Case Number: 3:2018cv00506
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/3/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
April 23, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. The amended complaint is dismissed without leave to amend. Santos' renewed IFP motion 8 is denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the docket. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (sjt).
April 20, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Striking 7 Proposed Amended Complaint, and Directing Clerk to Refile Amended Complaint Without Exhibits. The Clerk is directed to strike the filed complaint (Docket no. 7 ) and refile it without Exhibit 3. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/20/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2018: # 1 Stricken Document, # 2 Stricken Document) (jdt).
March 13, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and Order Dismissing Complaint. The motion to proceed IFP is denied without prejudice. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Santos may reopen this case by either paying the filing fee or filing a renewed IFP motion. She must also file an amended complaint. She must do these things by 4/4/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?