Apple Inc. v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Apple Inc
Defendant: Non-Party MDL Plaintiffs and Qualcomm Incorporated
Respondent: Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC and Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Compal Electronics Inc., Hon Hai Percision Industry Co., Ltd., FIH Mobile LTD., Wistron Corporation and Pegatron Corporation
In Re: Qualcomm Litigation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00803
Filed: April 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The parties have filed a joint motion to continue the hearing (ECF No. #33 ) scheduled for June 13, 2018 regarding the motion to compel (ECF No. #1 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) The motion hearing set for June 13, 2018 is vacated. 2) The motion to compel (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice. 3) The parties may file a joint motion to determine the remaining disputes regarding the three (3) deposition topics and related production no later than July 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 06/13/2018.(no document attached) (atk) Modified on 6/13/2018 to correct docket text; NEF regenerated (dls).
June 12, 2018 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing of June 13, 2018 by Apple Inc. (Gelberg, Aleksandr) (rmc). Modified on 6/13/2018 to term motion per ECF Order No. 34 (dls).
June 11, 2018 Filing 32 PRO HAC APPROVED: Lauren A. Degnan appearing for Plaintiff Apple Inc (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (dsn)
June 11, 2018 Filing 31 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11314118.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Degnan, Lauren) (dsn)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Mark Anthony McCarty, re #23 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/7/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (dsn).
June 7, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandr Gelberg on behalf of Apple Inc (Gelberg, Aleksandr)Attorney Aleksandr Gelberg added to party Apple Inc(pty:pla) (rmc).
June 7, 2018 Filing 28 PRO HAC APPROVED: Mark Anthony McCarty appearing for Respondent Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC (Re. ECF No. #23 ). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (no document attached) (dsn)
June 7, 2018 Filing 27 PRO HAC APPROVED: Daniel Robert Gopenko appearing for Plaintiff Apple Inc (Re. ECF No. #25 ). (no document attached)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (dsn)
June 7, 2018 Filing 26 PRO HAC APPROVED: Christopher Owen Green appearing for Plaintiff Apple Inc (Re. ECF No. [24). (no document attached) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (dsn).
June 7, 2018 Filing 25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11303629). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gopenko, Daniel) (dsn)
June 7, 2018 Filing 24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11303208.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Green, Christopher) (dsn)
June 7, 2018 Filing 23 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11302760.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McCarty, Mark) (ajs).
June 6, 2018 Filing 22 PRO HAC APPROVED: Benjamin C. Elacqua appearing for Plaintiff Apple Inc (no document attached) (dsn)
June 6, 2018 Filing 21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11301716.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Elacqua, Benjamin) (dsn).
June 6, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth M Sproul on behalf of Apple Inc (Sproul, Seth)Attorney Seth M Sproul added to party Apple Inc(pty:pla) (dlg).
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #1 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/30/2018.(amm)
May 29, 2018 Filing 18 Exhibit 8 by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10)(aef)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying #2 , 16 - Apple's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to its Motion to Compel Nokia's Compliance with Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum. As a result of NSN's Notice at ECF No. #7 , the motion to seal is denied and Exhibits 8 and 10 are to be publicly filed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/29/2018. (no document attached) (dls)
April 26, 2018 Filing 15 Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Western Texas. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (dlg)
April 26, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-mc-00302. Original file received electronically
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Transfer Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Apple Inc.s Motion to Compel Nokias Compliance with Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Ad Testifandum (Dkt. No. 1) and all other pending motions filed in this case are HEREBY TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the SouthernDistrict of California, San Diego Division. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Movant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #5 MOTION to Transfer Apple's Motion to Compel.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Ryan W. Koppelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy and Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 9 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brady Randall Cox for Ryan W. Koppelman by on behalf of Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. (Cox, Brady) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brady Randall Cox for Ryan W. Koppelman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10693881) (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, re #2 Sealed Motion filed filed by Movant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Movant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ltr from McCarty to Kazi, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case by Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Ltr from McCarty to Kazi, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brady Randall Cox for Ryan W. Koppelman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10693881) by on behalf of Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. (Cox, Brady) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Apple Inc and all filings related thereto. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 2 Sealed Motion filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Order) (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel (Filing Fee $47.00 Receipt #100032848) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Order, #10 Receipt)(cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 4/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Compal Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Hon Hai Percision Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: FIH Mobile LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Wistron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Pegatron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non-Party MDL Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Marc B. Collier
Represented By: Richard S. Zembek
Represented By: Talbot R. Hansum
Represented By: Eric B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc
Represented By: Juanita Rose Brooks
Represented By: Betty H. Chen
Represented By: John P. Brinkmann
Represented By: Daniel Robert Gopenko
Represented By: Betty Hong Chen
Represented By: Benjamin C. Elacqua
Represented By: Lauren A. Degnan
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: John Philip Brinkmann
Represented By: Juanita R Brooks
Represented By: Christopher Owen Green
Represented By: Aleksandr Gelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Represented By: Ryan W. Koppelman
Represented By: Mark Anthony McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Corporation
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Represented By: Ryan W. Koppelman
Represented By: Mark Anthony McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Qualcomm Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?