Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. v. Bumble Bee Foods LLC et al
Plaintiff: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Defendant: Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Thai Union Group PCL, Lion Capital LLP, Christopher D. Lischewski, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, Big Catch Cayman LP, Starkist Company, Del Monte Corporation, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd and Tri-Union Seafoods LLC doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01014
Filed: May 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Filing 6 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from District of Kansas. (no document attached) (rmc)
May 22, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:18-cv-02212. Original file received electronically (rmc)
May 22, 2018 Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of California (MDL 2670). ***Terminating Case. (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/22/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Stueve, Patrick) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/22/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/02/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/22/2018.]
April 30, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/22/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4468144.), filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stueve, Patrick) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/22/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. v. Bumble Bee Foods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Capital (Americas), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thai Union Group PCL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Capital LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Lischewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Catch Cayman LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starkist Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bumble Bee Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Stephen N. Six
Represented By: Patrick J. Stueve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?