Camp v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Carey Camp, Gerald L. Koenig, Gatubhai Mistry and Sandesh Jadhav
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated, Steven M. Mollenkopf, George S. Davis, Donald J. Rosenberg, Paul E. Jacobs and Thomas W. Horton
Petitioner: Anh Luu, Daljit Singh, Nancy Nga Nguyen and Bradley Leach
Case Number: 3:2018cv01208
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Gatubhai Mistry. (Brooks, Luke) (acc).
May 29, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Support by Gatubhai Mistry re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents and Exhibits A-B)(Nirmul, Sharan) (acc).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #59 Joint Motion for Later Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing continued to 9/19/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/28/2019. (acc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE re #58 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Authority by Daljit Singh's filed by Gatubhai Mistry. (Nirmul, Sharan) (acc).
May 24, 2019 Filing 59 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Thomas W. Horton, Paul E. Jacobs, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated, Donald J. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji) (acc).
May 22, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Daljit Singh re #43 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosen, Laurence) (tcf).
May 10, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Thomas W. Horton, Paul E. Jacobs, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated, Donald J. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Peter M. Adams, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Request for Judicial Notice)(Fukumura, Koji) (acc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gerald L. Koenig, Gatubhai Mistry, as to Thomas W. Horton, Paul E. Jacobs, Donald J. Rosenberg. (Kaplan, Stacey) (acc).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting #54 Joint Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/7/2019. (acc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Thomas W. Horton, Paul E. Jacobs, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated, Donald J. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fukumura, Koji)Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Thomas W. Horton(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Paul E. Jacobs(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Donald J. Rosenberg(pty:dft) (acc).
March 21, 2019 Filing 53 Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ag)
March 19, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Stewart on behalf of Gatubhai Mistry (Stewart, Christopher)Attorney Christopher D Stewart added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:pla) (acc).
March 19, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Orion Brooks on behalf of Gatubhai Mistry (Brooks, Luke)Attorney Luke Orion Brooks added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:pla) (acc).
March 18, 2019 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand with Exhibits A-B against Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated, Paul E. Jacobs, Donald J. Rosenberg, Thomas W. Horton, filed by Gatubhai Mistry, Gerald L. Koenig.New Summons Requested. (Nirmul, Sharan) (ag).
March 1, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by Daljit Singh. (Rosen, Laurence) (acc).
February 22, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by Gatubhai Mistry. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Myers, Danielle) (acc).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sharan Nirmul, re #44 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/12/2019. (mdc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard A. Russo, Jr. (Re: Doc. No. #42 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/11/2019.(jrd)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #43 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases: Responses due by 2/22/2019; Replies due by 3/1/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. The Court will schedule a motion hearing if it deems necessary.(no document attached) (sc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 44 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12181263.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nirmul, Sharan) (mdc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 43 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, by Daljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Rosen, Laurence) (acc).
February 8, 2019 Filing 42 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12180205.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Russo, Richard) (mdc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ethan J. Barlieb, re #40 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/6/2019. (mdc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 40 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12171153.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Barlieb, Ethan) (mdc)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Joint Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing of and Responding to Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/5/2019. (acc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Order Setting Schedule for Filing of and Responding to Consolidated Complaint by Gatubhai Mistry. (Kaplan, Stacey) (acc).
February 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Lyn Paquette on behalf of Gatubhai Mistry (Paquette, Jenny)Attorney Jenny Lyn Paquette added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:pla) (acc).
February 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Marie Kaplan on behalf of Gatubhai Mistry (Kaplan, Stacey)Attorney Stacey Marie Kaplan added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:pla) (acc).
January 30, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 11/1/2018 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeannette N. Hill. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2019. (akr)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #16 Consolidation; Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Appointing Lead Counsel. The Court GRANTS Mistry's motions for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel. (Doc. No. 16.) The Court DENIES both Singh's and Leech's competing motions. A Master File is established for this proceeding. The Master File will be Case No. 3:18-cv-01208-AJB-BLM. The Clerk will file all pleadings in the Master File and note such filings on the Master Docket. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/22/2019. (acc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1208-AJB-MSB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/15/2018.(acc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 32 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia:Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2018j. Submitting [14-1] MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff; Granting [14-2] MOTION to Consolidate Cases; Granting [15-1] MOTION to Consolidate Cases; Submitting [15-2] Motion to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff; Granting [16-1] MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; Submitting [16-2] Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Court will issue order. . (Plaintiff Attorney Phillip Kim).(Defendant Attorney Bobby Hennsler, Ryan Thomas Degnan, Danielle Meyers). (no document attached) (ymm)
October 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Motions Hearing is continued to 11/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (no document attached) (sc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 30 PRO HAC APPROVED re #29 : Ryan Thomas Degnan appearing for Movant Gatubhai Mistry. (no document attached) (mdc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 29 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11767604.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Degnan, Ryan) (mdc)
October 8, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Suzanne Myers on behalf of Gatubhai Mistry (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Myers, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Suzanne Myers added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:mov) (acc).
October 8, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R Henssler, Jr on behalf of Gatubhai Mistry (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Henssler, Robert)Attorney Robert R Henssler, Jr added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:mov) (acc).
August 29, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Gatubhai Mistry. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCormick, Tricia) (acc).
August 29, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Daljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Rosen, Laurence) (acc).
August 22, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Gatubhai Mistry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tricia L. McCormick in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to McCormick Opp. Decl., #3 Exhibit B to McCormick Opp. Decl., #4 Exhibit C to McCormick Opp. Decl., #5 Exhibit D to McCormick Opp. Decl., #6 Exhibit E to McCormick Opp. Decl., #7 Exhibit F to McCormick Opp. Decl., #8 Exhibit G to McCormick Opp. Decl., #9 Exhibit H to McCormick Opp. Decl., #10 Proof of Service)(McCormick, Tricia) (acc).
August 22, 2018 Filing 23 NON Opposition re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Bradley Leach. (McCall, Adam) (acc).
August 22, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Daljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rosen, Laurence) (acc).
August 22, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE Of Withdrawal Of Motion Of Qualcomm Investor Group For Consolidation, Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel by Anh Luu, Nancy Nga Nguyen re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer)(acc).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Phillip Kim, re #19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/17/2018. (mdc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11572758.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kim, Phillip) (dsn).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Responses due by 8/22/2018; Replies due by 8/29/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing set for 10/18/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 17 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #21 ***MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nancy Nga Nguyen, Anh Luu. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Press Release, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Pafiti, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Nancy Nga Nguyen (pty:mov), Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Anh Luu (pty:mov) (acc). Modified on 8/22/2018 (acc).
August 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gatubhai Mistry. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Tricia L. McCormick in Support, #3 Exhibit A to McCormick Decl., #4 Exhibit B to McCormick Decl., #5 Exhibit C to McCormick Decl., #6 Exhibit D to McCormick Decl., #7 Exhibit E to McCormick Decl., #8 Proof of Service)(McCormick, Tricia)Attorney Tricia L McCormick added to party Gatubhai Mistry(pty:mov) (acc).
August 7, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Daljit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Rosen, Laurence)Attorney Laurence M. Rosen added to party Daljit Singh(pty:mov)(acc).
August 7, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Bradley Leach. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Adam C. McCall, #3 Exhibit 1 - Certification, #4 Exhibit 2 - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume, #7 Proof of Service)(McCall, Adam)Attorney Adam C. McCall added to party Bradley Leach(pty:mov) (acc).
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Parties' Joint Motion to Continue Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and to Set and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/31/2018. (acc)
July 11, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Adams, Peter) (acc).
June 29, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Peter)(acc).
June 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Strauss on behalf of George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Strauss, Steven)Attorney Steven M Strauss added to party George S. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Strauss added to party Steven M. Mollenkopf(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Strauss added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) (acc).
June 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Koji F Fukumura on behalf of George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji)Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party George S. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Steven M. Mollenkopf(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) (acc).
June 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M Adams on behalf of George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Peter)Attorney Peter M Adams added to party George S. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Adams added to party Steven M. Mollenkopf(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Adams added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft)(acc).
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carey Camp. George S. Davis served. (Burkholz, Spencer) (acc).
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carey Camp. Steven M. Mollenkopf served. (Burkholz, Spencer) (acc).
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carey Camp. Qualcomm Incorporated served. (Burkholz, Spencer) (acc).
June 11, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carey Camp re #3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest (Burkholz, Spencer) (anh).
June 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Carey Camp . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Burkholz, Spencer) QC Mailer Sent re: Missing Certificate of Service(anh).
June 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
June 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11309981.), filed by Carey Camp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1208-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Burkholz, Spencer)(lrc) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Represented By: Steven M Strauss
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Mollenkopf
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Represented By: Steven M Strauss
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Davis
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Represented By: Steven M Strauss
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Jacobs
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Horton
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Camp
Represented By: Spencer Alan Burkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Koenig
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gatubhai Mistry
Represented By: Ethan Barlieb
Represented By: Robert R Henssler, Jr
Represented By: Jenny Lyn Paquette
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Degnan
Represented By: Christopher D. Stewart
Represented By: Tricia L McCormick
Represented By: Stacey Marie Kaplan
Represented By: Luke Orion Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandesh Jadhav
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anh Luu
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daljit Singh
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nancy Nga Nguyen
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bradley Leach
Represented By: Adam C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?