Rinaldi et al v. BP West Coast Products LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Lee, Joshua Ebright and David Rinaldi
Defendant: Alon USA Energy, Inc., Does 1-25, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Equilon Enterprises LLC, ConocoPhillips, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., BP West Coast Products LLC and Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01377
Filed: June 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1715
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1377 DMS (AGS).(no document attached) (jcj)
January 24, 2020 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1377 GPC (AGS).(no document attached) (jcj)
January 24, 2020 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge M. James Lorenz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1377-LAB-AGS.(no document attached) (jmr) (rmc).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Katherine M. McCray. Katherine M. McCray is withdrawn as Exxon's counsel of record in this action. Frederick W. Kosmo, Hubert Kim and Robin A. Wofford remain Exxon's counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/31/2019. (Attorney Katherine Marie McCray terminated)(lrf)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Alexander R. Safyan. Alexander R. Safyan is withdrawn as Valero's counsel of record in this action. Gerald E. Hawxhurst remains Valero's counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/31/2019. (Attorney Alexander Robert Safyan terminated)(lrf)
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl L. O'Connor on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(O'Connor, Cheryl)Attorney Cheryl L. O'Connor added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft)(sjt).
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Patrick Enson on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Enson, Eric)Attorney Eric Patrick Enson added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft)(sjt).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Carl W. Hittinger (Re: Doc. No. #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2018.(jrd)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Tyson Y. Herrold (Re: Doc. No. #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2018.(jrd)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffry William Duffy (Re: Doc. No. #7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2018.(jrd)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Consolidating Related Actions and Setting Initial Case Schedule. The parties agree that cases no. 18cv1374 and 18cv1377 should be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). Accordingly, the Joint Motion #34 is granted. Cases Consolidated, 18cv1374-L-AGS; All future docketing will be done in the lead case. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/26/2018. (lrf)
July 25, 2018 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Initial Case Schedule by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Aguilar, George)Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Joshua Ebright(pty:pla), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Paul Lee(pty:pla), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party David Rinaldi(pty:pla)(sjt).
July 25, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi re #30 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Aguilar, George) (sjt).
July 18, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Mittelstaedt on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mittelstaedt, Robert)Attorney Robert A. Mittelstaedt added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 18, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David Craig Kiernan on behalf of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kiernan, David)Attorney David Craig Kiernan added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Actions should not be Consolidated. Response due by 7/25/2018. Reply due by 8/2/2018. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/18/2018.(sjt)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:15-cv-01749-L-AGS. The new case number is 18-cv-1377-L-AGS.. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/10/2018.(anh)
July 17, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Equilon Enterprises LLC (D/B/A Shell Oil Products US). Identifying Other Affiliate SOPC Holdings East LLC, Other Affiliate SOPC Holdings West LLC, Other Affiliate TMR Company for Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Roger, Kent) (anh).(jao).
July 17, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance Kent M. Roger by Kent Michael Roger on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Roger, Kent)Attorney Kent Michael Roger added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
July 17, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance Colin C. West by Colin Charles West on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(West, Colin)Attorney Colin Charles West added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
July 17, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance of Brian M. Hom by Brian Ming Hom on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hom, Brian)Attorney Brian Ming Hom added to party Equilon Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
July 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McGimsey, Diane) Adding Attorney Diane McGimsey. Identifying BP Products North America Inc. and BP p.l.c as corporate parents (anh). (jao).
July 16, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PARTIES WITH FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shields, Rasha)Attorney Rasha Gerges Shields added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:dft) Identifying Andeavor as corporate parent (anh). (jao).
July 16, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Murtagh on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Murtagh, Michael)Attorney Michael P. Murtagh added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
July 16, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Andrew Sacks on behalf of BP West Coast Products LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sacks, Robert)Attorney Robert Andrew Sacks added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
July 13, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Foltyn-Smith on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Foltyn-Smith, Kyle)Attorney Kyle Foltyn-Smith added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (anh).
July 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Alon USA Energy, Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate Delek US Holdings, Inc. for Alon USA Energy, Inc.. (Matthias, Michael) (anh). (jao).
July 13, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie McCray on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McCray, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Marie McCray added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
July 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick William Kosmo, Jr on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kosmo, Frederick)Attorney Frederick William Kosmo, Jr added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
July 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Hubert Kim on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Hubert)Attorney Hubert Kim added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time Alon USA Energy, Inc. answer due 8/13/2018; BP West Coast Products LLC answer due 8/13/2018; Chevron U.S.A. Inc. answer due 8/13/2018; ConocoPhillips answer due 8/13/2018; Equilon Enterprises LLC answer due 8/13/2018; Exxon Mobil Corporation answer due 8/13/2018; Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC answer due 8/13/2018; Valero Marketing and Supply Company answer due 8/13/2018. Response due 8/13/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/13/2018. (anh)
July 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Valero Marketing and Supply Company . Identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald) (anh). (jao).
July 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Safyan on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Safyan, Alexander)Attorney Alexander Robert Safyan added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (anh).
July 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald E. Hawxhurst on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hawxhurst, Gerald)Attorney Gerald E. Hawxhurst added to party Valero Marketing and Supply Company(pty:dft) (anh).
July 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin) (anh). (jao).
July 12, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin)Attorney Robin Assaf Wofford added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
July 12, 2018 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11436663.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Herrold, Tyson) (dsn)
July 12, 2018 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Herrold, Tyson)[QC re payment] (dsn)
July 12, 2018 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11436440.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Duffy, Jeffry) (dsn)
July 12, 2018 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11436386.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hittinger, Carl) (dsn)
July 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Matthias on behalf of Alon USA Energy, Inc. (Matthias, Michael)Attorney Michael R Matthias added to party Alon USA Energy, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
July 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Joshua Ebright, Paul Lee, David Rinaldi of case(s) 3:15-cv-01749-L-AGS; 3:18-cv-01374-BEN-BLM . (Aguilar, George) LNO Prepared (anh).
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt recuses from this case and is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further Magistrate Judge proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1377-BEN(AGS).(no document attached) (jsp)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alon USA Energy, Inc., BP West Coast Products LLC, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips, Does 1-25, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11358162.), filed by Joshua Ebright, David Rinaldi, Paul Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1377-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Robbins, Brian)(lrc) (sjt). LNO PRepared(anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinaldi et al v. BP West Coast Products LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon USA Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Carl W Hittinger
Represented By: Tyson Herrold
Represented By: Jeffry William Duffy
Represented By: Michael R Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Rasha Gerges Shields
Represented By: Robert A. Mittelstaedt
Represented By: Cheryl L. O'Connor
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Eric Patrick Enson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Frederick William Kosmo, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Marie McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Colin Charles West
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Brian Ming Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Represented By: Michael P. Murtagh
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Alexander Robert Safyan
Represented By: Gerald E. Hawxhurst
Represented By: Kyle Foltyn-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lee
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: George C Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ebright
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: George C Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rinaldi
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: George C Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?