Jadhav v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sandesh Jadhav
Defendant: Steven M. Mollenkopf, George S. Davis and Qualcomm Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv01457
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
3 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of J. Alexander Hood, II (Re: Doc. No. #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/19/2018.(jrd)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeremy A. Lieberman (Re: Doc. No. #3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/19/2018.(jrd)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez, Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-01208-AJB-BLM. The new case number is 18cv1457-AJB-BLM.. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/29/2018.(anh)
June 29, 2018 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11391102.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hood, J. Alexander) (mdc)
June 29, 2018 Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11391093.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lieberman, Jeremy) (mdc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against George S. Davis, Steven M. Mollenkopf, Qualcomm Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11374631.), filed by Sandesh Jadhav. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01457-BEN-MDD. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Pafiti, Jennifer)(jrm) LNO Prepared. (anh).(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jadhav v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandesh Jadhav
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Mollenkopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?