Transport Workers Union, Local 591 v. Mawhinney
Petitioner: Transport Workers Union, Local 591
Respondent: Robert Steven Mawhinney
Case Number: 3:2018cv01620
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #1 Transport Workers Union, Local 591's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award and Motion for Relief, filed by Robert Steven Mawhinney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Exhibit A - Z, #4 Proof of Service)(sjm)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transport Workers Union, Local 591. Robert Steven Mawhinney served. (Buche, John) (sjm).
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 PRO HAC APPROVED: Nicholas Paul Granath appearing for Petitioner Transport Workers Union, Local 591 (no document attached) (jrd)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11473879.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Granath, Nicholas)(jrd)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Referral Role reassigned to Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Per Related Case 18cv731-BTM-WVG. The new case number is 18cv1620-BTM-WVG.(no document attached) (sjm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transport Workers Union, Local 591. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Buche, John) (sjm).
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Transport Workers Union, Local 591 of case(s) 3:16-cv-02296-MMA-BLM; 3:18-cv-00731-BTM-WVG; 3:16-cv-02270-MMA-BLM . (Buche, John) (sjm).
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION To Confirm Arbitration Award against Robert Steven Mawhinney ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11455051.), filed by Transport Workers Union, Local 591. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Lee Seham, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1620-BTM. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is assigned to the case. (Buche, John)(lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transport Workers Union, Local 591 v. Mawhinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Transport Workers Union, Local 591
Represented By: John K. Buche
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Granath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Steven Mawhinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?