Staublein v. Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Staublein, Thomas Wood, Charles R. Stone, II and Benjamin Barglow
Defendant: Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Todd S. Young, Stephen R. Davis, Michael Yang, Srdjan Stankovic and Terrance Moore
Petitioner: David Harper, Howard E. Derdiger, Susan Derdiger, Siry Investments LP, Joseph Paolantonio, Mitchell Johnson, Marco Carnevale and Mark Madrack
Case Number: 3:2018cv01647
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #52 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint, #56 MOTION to Strike Document - Notice of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. This motion is suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the motion will be deemed submitted as of this date. (no document attached) (sc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Joint Motion to Modify the Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. No. #60 ). Motion Hearing continued to 11/14/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/23/2019. (jrm) (jao).
August 22, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Support re #52 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Terrance Moore, Srdjan Stankovic, Michael Yang, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji) (jrm).
August 14, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY - Other re #56 MOTION to Strike Document - Notice of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike -- Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion To Strike filed by Thomas Wood. (Pafiti, Jennifer)(jrm).
August 14, 2019 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Modify the Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike re 58 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, 53 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, by Thomas Wood. (Weinrib, Tamar)Attorney Tamar Weinrib added to party Thomas Wood(pty:pla) (jrm).
August 7, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Strike Document - Notice of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike filed by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Terrance Moore, Srdjan Stankovic, Michael Yang, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji) (jrm).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #56 MOTION to Strike Document - Notice of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike : Responses due by 8/7/2019; Replies due by 8/14/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 9/5/19 at 2:00 p.m. (no document attached) (sc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Wood re #55 Response in Opposition to Motion, #56 MOTION to Strike Document - Notice of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Pafiti, Jennifer) (acc).
July 23, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike Document - Notice of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Thomas Wood. (Attachments: #1 Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (acc).
July 23, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Thomas Wood. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (acc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 54 Briefing schedule (Doc. No. 53) is hereby vacated.(no document attached) (sc)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #52 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint : Responses due by 7/19/2019; Replies due by 7/26/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 9/5/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Terrance Moore, Srdjan Stankovic, Michael Yang, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of P. Adams, #4 Exhibit A & B, #5 Exhibit 1-10, #6 Exhibit 11-20, #7 Exhibit 21-30, #8 Exhibit 31-40, #9 Exhibit 41-50, #10 Exhibit 51-56, #11 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Modifying the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. #50 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/29/2019. (jdt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Terrance Moore, Srdjan Stankovic, Michael Yang, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji)Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Terrance Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Srdjan Stankovic(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Michael Yang(pty:dft) (jao).
April 16, 2019 Filing 49 Summons Issued re #48 Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)
April 15, 2019 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young, Srdjan Stankovic, Terrance Moore, Michael Yang, filed by Thomas Wood.New Summons Requested. (Pafiti, Jennifer)(acc).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Tamar A. Weinrib, re #43 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/4/2019. (mdc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Peter)(acc).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #44 Joint Motion for Order Setting Schedule for Filing and Responding to Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/7/2019. (acc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Order Setting Schedule for Filing and Responding to Consolidated Complaint by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Peter) (acc).
March 1, 2019 Filing 43 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12253868 Re: Doc. No. #42 )(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Weinrib, Tamar)(dsn)(jrd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 42 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12253868.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Weinrib, Tamar)(QC Mailer sent; missing signature.)(jrd)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Consolidation; Appointing Lead Plaintiff; and Appointing Lead Counsel. The Court ORDERS as follows:Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), Staublein v. Acadia Pharmaceuticals et al., 18-cv-1647-AJB-BGS, Stone v. Acadia Pharmaceuticals et al., 18-cv-1672-AJB-BGS, and Barglow v. Acadia Pharmaceuticals et al., 18-cv-1812-AJB-BGS, and all related actions are consolidated for all purposes (the Consolidated Action). This Order shall apply to the Consolidated Action and to each case that relates to the same subject matter that is subsequently filed in this District or is transferred to this District, and is consolidated with the Consolidated Action. A Master File is established for this proceeding. The Master File shall be Case No. 3:18-cv-01647-AJB-BGS. The Clerk shall file all pleadings in the Master File and note such filings on the Master Docket. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/26/2019. (acc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF RECENT AUTHORITY by Thomas Wood (Attachments: #1 Brady v. Top Ships, Inc., et al., Transcript)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (ag).
January 22, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Recent Authority by Siry Investments LP re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Camp v. Qualcomm Inc. Lead Plaintiff Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Myers, Danielle) (acc).
January 3, 2019 Filing 38 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Cases Consolidated per order 37 . All future docketing will be done in the lead case 18-cv-1647-AJB-BGS. (no document attached) (acc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2019. Granting [13-1] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:18-cv-01647-AJB-BGS; 3:18-cv-01672- AJB-BGS; and 3:18-cv-01812-AJB-BGS Submitting [13-2] MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by David Harper, Submitting [16-1] MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, Granting [16-2] MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Mitchell Johnson, Granting [18-1] MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Submitting [18-2] MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Joseph Paolantonio, Granting [19-1] MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Submitting [19-2] MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Siry Investments LP, Granting [20-1] Motion to Consolidate Cases, Submitting [20-2] MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Thomas Wood. Court will issue order.(Court Reporter/ECR Jeannette Hill). (Plaintiff Attorney Danielle S. Meyers, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Jordan L. Lurie, Roxanna Talaie). (no document attached) (ymm)
December 27, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Lurie on behalf of Thomas Wood (Lurie, Jordan)Attorney Jordan L. Lurie added to party Thomas Wood(pty:mov) (acc).
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Mark Madrack re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaplan, Stacey) (acc).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeremy A. Lieberman, re #33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/29/2018. (mdc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11834896.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lieberman, Jeremy) (mdc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Joseph Paolantonio. (Rosen, Laurence) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Siry Investments LP. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Myers, Danielle) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY - Other re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Further Support Of Motion Of Thomas Wood For Consolidation, Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel, And In Opposition To Competing Motions filed by Thomas Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (acc).
October 11, 2018 Filing 29 NON Opposition re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:18-cv-01647-AJB-BGS; 3:18-cv-01672- AJB-BGS; and 3:18-cv-01812-AJB-BGS MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel, #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mitchell Johnson. (Portnoy, Lesley) (acc).
October 11, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Marco Carnevale re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Selection Of Lead Counsel filed by Marco Carnevale . (Walker, Jacob) (acc).
October 10, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:18-cv-01647-AJB-BGS; 3:18-cv-01672- AJB-BGS; and 3:18-cv-01812-AJB-BGS MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel, #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Selection Of Lead Counsel, #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Siry Investments LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #13 Exhibit 12 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #14 Exhibit 13 to the Myers Opp. Decl., #15 Proof of Service)(Myers, Danielle) (acc).
October 10, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Selection Of Lead Counsel, #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:18-cv-01647-AJB-BGS; 3:18-cv-01672- AJB-BGS; and 3:18-cv-01812-AJB-BGS MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel, #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joseph Paolantonio. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #2 Exhibit 1 to Rosen Declaration)(Rosen, Laurence) (acc).
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Selection Of Lead Counsel, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Further Support Of Motion Of Thomas Wood For Consolidation, Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel, And In Opposition To Competing Motions filed by Thomas Wood. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (acc).
September 28, 2018 Filing 24 NON Opposition re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Selection Of Lead Counsel, #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel, #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David Harper. (McCall, Adam) (acc).
September 21, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Howard E. Derdiger, Susan Derdiger re #17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Abadou, Ramzi)(acc).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re Motions to Consolidate and Motions to Appoint Lead Counsel as to [doc. nos. 14, 13, 19, 20, 18, 15, 17, 16] : Responses due by 10/10/2018; Replies due by 10/24/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motions hearing scheduled for 1/3/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/18/2018. (acc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Approval Of Counsel by Thomas Wood. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Press Release, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Pafiti, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Thomas Wood(pty:mov) Modified on 1/3/2019 to correct event type (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Siry Investments LP. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Danielle S. Myers in Support, #3 Exhibit A to the Myers Decl., #4 Exhibit B to the Myers Decl., #5 Exhibit C to the Myers Decl., #6 Exhibit D to the Myers Decl., #7 Exhibit E to the Myers Decl., #8 Proof of Service)(Myers, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Suzanne Myers added to party Siry Investments LP(pty:mov) (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Joseph Paolantonio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Rosen, Laurence)Attorney Laurence M. Rosen added to party Joseph Paolantonio(pty:mov) (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #23 ***MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Howard E. Derdiger, Susan Derdiger. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ramzi Abadou, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Pendency, #6 Exhibit D - KSF Resume, #7 Proof of Service)(Abadou, Ramzi)Attorney Ramzi Abadou added to party Howard E. Derdiger(pty:mov), Attorney Ramzi Abadou added to party Susan Derdiger(pty:mov) (acc). Modified on 9/21/2018 (acc). Modified on 9/21/2018 (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mitchell Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Robert V. Prongay, #3 Exhibit A - Press Release, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume, #7 Proof of Service)(Prongay, Robert)Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Mitchell Johnson(pty:mov)(acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #28 ***MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment As Lead Plaintiff, And Selection Of Lead Counsel by Marco Carnevale. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Supplement Proposed Order)(Walker, Jacob)Attorney Jacob Allen Walker added to party Marco Carnevale(pty:mov)(acc). Modified on 10/11/2018 (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #35 ***MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mark Madrack. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Stacey M. Kaplan in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Pendency, #6 Exhibit D - KTMC Resume, #7 Proof of Service)(Kaplan, Stacey)Attorney Stacey Marie Kaplan added to party Mark Madrack(pty:mov)(acc). Modified on 12/21/2018 (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:18-cv-01647-AJB-BGS; 3:18-cv-01672- AJB-BGS; and 3:18-cv-01812-AJB-BGS, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by David Harper. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Adam C. McCall, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proof of Service)(McCall, Adam)Attorney Adam C. McCall added to party David Harper(pty:mov) (acc).
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Peter) (acc).
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Detch on behalf of Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Detch, Jeanne)Attorney Jeanne Detch added to party Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeanne Detch added to party Stephen R. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Jeanne Detch added to party Todd S. Young(pty:dft) (acc).
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Robert Cooper on behalf of Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cooper, Nathaniel)Attorney Nathaniel Robert Cooper added to party Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel Robert Cooper added to party Stephen R. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel Robert Cooper added to party Todd S. Young(pty:dft) (acc).
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M Adams on behalf of Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Adams, Peter)Attorney Peter M Adams added to party Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Adams added to party Stephen R. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Adams added to party Todd S. Young(pty:dft) (acc).
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Koji F Fukumura on behalf of Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fukumura, Koji)Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Stephen R. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Koji F Fukumura added to party Todd S. Young(pty:dft)(acc).
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1647 AJB (BGS).(no document attached) (jcj)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Staublein, as to Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Prongay, Robert) (acc).
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 18-cv-01647-AJB-MDD.(no document attached) (lrc)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Charles R. Stone, II of case(s) 18-cv-1672 . (Myers, Danielle). Modified on 7/24/2018 to reflect no PLO prepared, this case is the low numbered case. (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1647-JAH-MDD.(no document attached) (anh)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)(jrd)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc., Stephen R. Davis, Todd S. Young (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number: 0974-11465147), filed by James Staublein. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01647-BEN-MDD. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Prongay, Robert)(jrm)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staublein v. Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Represented By: Jeanne Detch
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Represented By: Nathaniel Robert Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd S. Young
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Represented By: Jeanne Detch
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Represented By: Nathaniel Robert Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Davis
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Represented By: Jeanne Detch
Represented By: Peter M Adams
Represented By: Nathaniel Robert Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yang
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srdjan Stankovic
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Moore
Represented By: Koji F Fukumura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Staublein
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wood
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Tamar Weinrib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Stone, II
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Barglow
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Harper
Represented By: Adam C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Howard E. Derdiger
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Susan Derdiger
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Siry Investments LP
Represented By: Danielle Suzanne Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Paolantonio
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mitchell Johnson
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Carnevale
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Madrack
Represented By: Stacey Marie Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?