Abbas Hossenini v. DHS ICE
Plaintiff: Abbas Hossenini
Defendant: DHS ICE
Case Number: 3:2018cv01771
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 Fee for Habeas Petition: Paid on 9/21/2018. Receipt Number: 104613. (no document attached) (jms) (jms).
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Abbas Hossenini. NUNC PRO TUNC 9/10/2018 (jpp)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: letter, from Plaintiff Abbas Hossenini. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L.Rule 83.9: Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge. Case Dismissed per Order dated 8/15/2018 (ECF No. 8). Nunc Pro Tunc 9/10/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/12/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (1) Denying #7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and (2) Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (jao).
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 18-cv-01771-JLS-BLM.(no document attached) (lrc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jpp)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-05851. Original file received electronically
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick transferring case to Southern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (See document for details.) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 8/1/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/1/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Abbas Hossenini. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/1/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbas Hossenini v. DHS ICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbas Hossenini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS ICE
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?