Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation v. Jemco Equipment Corp.
Plaintiff: Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Defendant: Jemco Equipment Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01817
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, Jemco Equipment Corp. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. The new case number is 18CV1817-WVG. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/28/2018.(sjt)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Settlement and Commencement of 45-day review period by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beaudin, Livia). QC Mail - Proposed order (consent decree) attached. Reminder to efile to chambers. Modified on 8/24/2018 (jdt).
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jemco Equipment Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11522933.), filed by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1817-L-WVG. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Beaudin, Livia)(tcf) (sjt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/7/2018) (jdt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation v. Jemco Equipment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemco Equipment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?