M.M.M et al v. SESSIONS et al
Plaintiff: M.M.M., L.C.O., I.A.T., G.C.H., P.A.P. and N.B.
Defendant: Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald Vitiello, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Scott Lloyd, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 3:2018cv01832
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 1/17/2020. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Nicole Murley). (For plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L - Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo, Stephen Kang. For Dora plaintiffs - Emily Bork). (HHS: Jean-Michel Voltaire, Victor Suh, Commander Jonathan White. for Steering Committee - Steven Herzog).(no document attached) (jak)
December 6, 2019 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 12/6/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Nicole Murley). (Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang and Emily Bork for plaintiffs in 18cv0428, Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Catherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
November 8, 2019 Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 11/8/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Nicole Murley). (Lee Gelernt, Anand Balakrishnan, Daniel Galindo, Sirine Shebaya for plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L., Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Cdr Jonathan White and Victor Suh for HHS, Catherine Weiss for legal service providers).(no document attached) (jak)
October 18, 2019 Filing 126 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 10/18/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt for plaintiffs in Ms L, Wilson Barmeyer for Dora plaintiffs). (Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Cdr Jonathan White, Victor Suh for HHS, Catherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
September 20, 2019 Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 9/20/2019. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang and Daniel Galindo for plaintiffs in Ms. L) (All telephonically: Sirine Shebaya for Dora plaintiffs, Cmdr Jonathan White HHS, Victor Suh HHS counsel, Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Catherine Weiss, Linda Dakin-Grimm).(no document attached) (jak)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting #70 Motion for Leave to as Attorney of Record. It is ORDERED that Briana Yuh is withdrawn from further representation of Defendants. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/19/2019. (aef)
August 16, 2019 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/16/2019. All appearances were telephonic. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt and Anan Balakrishnan for Ms. L plaintiffs, Wilson Barmeyer for Dora plaintiffs, Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Catherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
July 12, 2019 Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 7/12/2019. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best (telephonically). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart and Sarah Fabian (telephonically)). (Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan, Sirine Shebaya, Commander Jonathan White, Steven Herzog, Catherine Weiss, Linda Dakin Grimm).(no document attached) (jak)
June 7, 2019 Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 6/7/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (for plaintiffs is 18cv0428 (Ms. L) Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo, Wilson Barmeyer. Crd Jonathan White HHS, Steven Herzog of Steering Committee, Catherine Weiss for objectors.).(no document attached) (jak)
May 8, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 5/8/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 5/8/2019. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian). (Other appearances: for 18cv0428 Ms. L plaintiffs - Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo. For Dora plaintiffs - Wilson Barmeyer). (Steven Herzog for Steering Committee). (no document attached) (jak)
May 6, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/8/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (no document attached) (jak)
April 17, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 4/16/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 4/16/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (Lee Gelernt, Daniel Galindo for 18cv0428 Ms. L plaintiffs; Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer for Dora plaintiffs; Steven Herzog for Steering Committee; Catherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
March 28, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Conference) held on 3/28/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
March 28, 2019 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 3/28/2019. All parties appeared telephonicall. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (for 18cv0428 Ms. L plaintiffs - Lee Gelernt. For Dora plaintiffs - Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer, Emily Bork). For Steering Committee, Steven Herzog. For objectors, Catherine Weiss).(no document attached) (jak)
March 7, 2019 Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 3/7/2019. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (for 18cv0428 Ms. L plaintiffs: Lee Gelernt, Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer. Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Catherine Weiss for objectors).(no document attached) (jak)
February 25, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 2/21/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Conference Agreement for Class Members who have not submitted executed waiver forms. It is hereby ordered on or before February 28, 2019, defense counsel shall provide to Class Counsel the list of persons subject to removal. Counsel shall meet and confer on the best way to cull that list down to persons with expedited removal orders. Defense counsel shall advise Immigration and Customs Enforcement that class members subject to the settlement agreement in this case may not be removed without first providing them with notice of the settlement and an opportunity to decide whether they wish to take advantage of the settlement procedures or waive those procedures. Counsel shall provide the Court with an update on these issues in the next Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/22/2019.(aef)
February 21, 2019 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 2/21/2019, re motions in related case 18cv0428-DMS. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best(telephonically)). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (For plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L: Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang, Anan Balakrishnan(teleph), Dora plaintiffs: Sirine Shebaya(teleph), Wilson Barmeyer(teleph)).(no document attached) (jak)
February 11, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 2/8/2019 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER on Further Clarifications to Settlement Agreement of November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019.(aef)
February 8, 2019 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 2/8/2019. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (For plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L: Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan. For Dora Plaintiffs: Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer. For objectors: Catherine Weiss. For Steering Committee: Steven Herzog. (no document attached) (jak)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Stay. Case stayed until Congress has appropriated funds for the Department. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/27/2018. (sjm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines Due To Lapse in Appropriations by Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Fabian, Sarah) (sjm).
December 18, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 12/14/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/14/2018, with 18cv0428-DMS. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart Nicole Murley). (no document attached) (jak)
December 4, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 11/30/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 11/30/2018(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Scott Steward, Sarah Fabian). (Lee Gelernt, Anan Balakrishnan, Sirine Shebaya for Plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS Ms. L, Jennifer Levy for Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC, Steven Herzog for Steering Committee, Joshua Tull for objectors). (no document attached) (jak)
November 15, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Certifying the Settlement Classes and Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (ECF #95 ) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/15/2018. (aef)
November 14, 2018 Filing 97 REPLY - Other re #88 Objection, #83 Objection, #93 Objection Joint Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P.. (Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
November 13, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Class Member's Withdrawal of Objection to Proposed Settlement by K.R.M.C. (aef)
November 9, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 11/9/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
November 9, 2018 Filing 95 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
November 9, 2018 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 11/9/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt for plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L.).(no document attached) (jak)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Requesting Response. In anticipation of the hearing on final approval of the settlement in these cases, the Court requests written responses from the parties to the objections. The parties' responses shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/8/2018.(aef)
November 7, 2018 Filing 93 Notice of class member's objection to proposed settlement by Krismi Rosmari Mac Catun. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. (aef)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Notice of class member's objection to proposed settlement, from Objector Krismi Rosmari Mac Catun. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Date noticed for hearing not in compliance with rules/documents are not timely; per docket #75, paragraph 11. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/5/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/7/2018.(aef)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting #89 Joint Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants answer to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint shall be due on or before Tuesday, January 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/5/2018. (aef)
November 1, 2018 Filing 89 STATUS REPORT re: Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Robins, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/2/2018 QC mail re wrong event; motion added (aef).
October 23, 2018 Filing 88 OBJECTION to the October 5, 2018 Settlement Agreement by Egla Arely Velasquez Molina. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(aef)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER on #77 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Require Implementation of Settlement Agreement. The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion to require implementation of the parties' settlement agreement. Specifically, the Court orders Defendants to begin the asylum process provided for in the agreement to those class members that are in detention and have executed an election form. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/18/2018. (aef)
October 16, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 10/16/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
October 16, 2018 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 10/16/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt, Anand Balakrishnan, Sirine Shebays, Wilson Barmeyer for plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS Ms. L and Dora; Jennifer Levy and Beth Kraus for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS N.T.C.).(no document attached) (jak)
October 16, 2018 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION for Order Requiring Implementation of Settlement Agreement filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P.. (Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Catherine Weiss (Re: Doc. No. #80 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/15/2018.(jrd)
October 15, 2018 Filing 83 OBJECTION to the October 5, 2018 Settlement Agreement by Lesbi Martinez-Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(aef)
October 15, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION for Order Requiring Implementation of Settlement Agreement filed by Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah) (aef).
October 12, 2018 Filing 80 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11772796 - See 18cv428-DMS-MDD, # 262). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Weiss, Catherine) Modified text on 10/15/2018 to include filing fee info. (mdc)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Requesting Response. (Re ECF #77 ) The Court is in receipt of the emergency motion to require implementation of the settlement agreement filed by Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases. Defendants shall file a response to the motion on or before October 15, 2018. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court will take the matter under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/11/2018.(aef)
October 11, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Rose Glynn on behalf of Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York (Glynn, Katie) (aef).
October 10, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Order Requiring Implementation of Settlement Agreement by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
October 9, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 10/9/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2019. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting #73 Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement; Preliminarily Certifying the Settlement Classes; and Approving Class Notice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/9/2018. (aef)
October 9, 2018 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 10/9/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. Amended complaint to be filed in 18cv0428-DMS-MDD (Ms. L). The Court will enter the order granting preliminary approval following entry of the amended complaint. (Further Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw, Final Approval Hearing set for 11/15/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt for Plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L., Jennifer Levy for Plaintiffs in 18cv1626 N.T.C., Caroline Heller for Plaintiffs in 18cv1769 R.G.H., Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer and Carol McClarnos for Plaintiffs in Dora case.) (no document attached) (jak)
October 5, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Certification of Settlement Classes, and Approval of Class Notice by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Notice Proposed Class Notice)(Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting #71 Joint Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants answer to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint shall be due Tuesday, October 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/2/2018. (aef)
October 1, 2018 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT re: Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Robins, Jeffrey) (aef).
September 28, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ms. C., Ms. L., Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello. (Yuh, Briana) (aef).
September 21, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 9/21/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
September 21, 2018 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 9/21/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS Ms. L.: Anand Balakrishnan, Stephen Kang. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC: Jennifer Levy. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1769-DMS RGH: Rex Chen, Caroline Heller, Jack McBride. For Plaintiffs in Dora case: Sirine Shebaya, Wilson Barmeyer). (no document attached) (jak)
September 18, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 9/14/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
September 14, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE re: Rule 23(e) Requirements by Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York re #65 Notice (Other),, (Glynn, Katie)Attorney Katie Rose Glynn added to party Catholic Charities Community Services of the Archdiocese of New York(pty:ip) (aef).
September 12, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE LODGING AGREEMENT FOR COURTS APPROVAL by Alex Azar, Daniel A. Bible, L. Francis Cissna, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fabian, Sarah)(aef).
September 7, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 9/7/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Hearing held on 9/7/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart and Sarah Fabian). (Lee Gelernt for plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS, Jennifer Levy for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS).(no document attached) (jak)
August 31, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/31/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 31, 2018 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/31/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Justin Bernick, T. Weymouth). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L - Lee Gelernt). For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC - Jennifer Levy).(no document attached) (lrf)
August 31, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to Joint Status Report by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
August 27, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/24/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 24, 2018 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/24/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (For Plaintiffs in 18cv0428 Ms. L - Lee Gelernt, Stephen Kang. For Plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS NTC - Jennifer Levy, Harrison (Buzz) Frahn).(no document attached) (jak)
August 17, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/17/2018 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (akr)
August 17, 2018 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/17/2018. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Justin Bernick, Zachary Best). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart, August Flentje). (Lee Gelernt for plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS).. (no document attached) (jak)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. A status conference will be held on August 24, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/16/2018. (aef)
August 16, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Plan for Reunification of Separated Minors with Removed Parents by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Oliver J. Armas (Re: Doc. No. #49 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/13/2018.(jrd)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Haley K. Costello-Essig (Re: Doc. No. #48 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/13/2018.(jrd)
August 13, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 8/10/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
August 10, 2018 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 8/10/2018. All parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Sarah Fabian, Scott Stewart). (Lee Gelernt for plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS (Ms. L), Charles Reiter, Jennifer Levy and Gregory Copeland for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS (N.T.C.)). (no document attached) (jak)
August 10, 2018 Filing 49 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11548604.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Armas, Oliver) (mdc)
August 9, 2018 Filing 48 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11541200.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Costello-Essig, Haley) (mdc)
August 9, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira M. Feinberg on behalf of G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Feinberg, Ira) (aef).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Zachary W. H. Best (Re: Doc. No. #40 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Justin W. Bernick (Re: Doc. No. #37 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth (Re: Doc. No. #38 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Katherine A. Nelson (Re: Doc. No. #39 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
August 8, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Motion Hearing) held on 8/8/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2018. (Transcript filed in case numbers 3:18-cv-00428-DMS-MDD, 3:18-cv-01626-DMS-JLB, and 3:18-cv-01832-DMS-MDD.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
August 8, 2018 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2018 re MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by N.B., G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., P.A.P., M.M.M. All counsel appearing telephonically. Court to issue order.(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Best, Justin Bernick). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian). (Lee Gelernt for plaintiffs in 18cv0428-DMS (Ms. L) and Jennifer Levy and Charles Reiter for plaintiffs in 18cv1626-DMS (N.T.C.)).(no document attached) (jak)
August 8, 2018 Filing 40 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11535794.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Best, Zachary) (mdc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 39 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11534909 - See #35 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nelson, Katherine) Modified text on 8/8/2018 re filing fee info. (mdc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 38 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11534889 - See #34 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Weymouth, Theodore (T.)) Modified text on 8/8/2018 re filing fee info. (mdc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 37 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11535623.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bernick, Justin) (mdc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin W. Bernick on behalf of G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M., N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernick, Justin)Attorney Justin W. Bernick added to party G.C.H.(pty:pla), Attorney Justin W. Bernick added to party I.A.T.(pty:pla), Attorney Justin W. Bernick added to party L.C.O.(pty:pla), Attorney Justin W. Bernick added to party M.M.M.(pty:pla), Attorney Justin W. Bernick added to party N.B.(pty:pla), Attorney Justin W. Bernick added to party P.A.P.(pty:pla) Modified on 8/8/2018-Notified attorney re filing PHV application (aef).
August 7, 2018 Filing 35 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11534909.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Nelson, Katherine) Modified on 8/8/2018 - Atty to refile re missing signature. (mdc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 34 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11534889.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Weymouth, Theodore (T.)) Modified on 8/8/2018 - Atty to refile re missing signature. (mdc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by M.M.M. re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
August 7, 2018 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Ms. C., Ms. L. Ms. L. Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Reunification Forms. (Amdur, Spencer) (aef).
August 7, 2018 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by M.M.M. re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Maddigan, Michael) (aef).
August 7, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M. Maddigan on behalf of M.M.M. (Maddigan, Michael)Attorney Michael M. Maddigan added to party M.M.M.(pty:pla) (aef).
August 7, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Pursuant to related case 18CV0428-DMS-MDD, case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1832-DMS-MDD. Case association to 18cv428-DMS-MDD created.(no document attached) (sjt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Fabian on behalf of Alex Azar, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Vitiello (Fabian, Sarah)Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Alex Azar(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party DANIEL A. BIBLE(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party L. FRANCIS CISSNA(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Scott Lloyd(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party KIRSTJEN NIELSEN(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah B. Fabian added to party Ronald Vitiello(pty:dft) (aef).
August 6, 2018 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01759. Original file received electronically
August 3, 2018 Filing 27 Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal assigned to transfer case from District of Columbia. (no document attached) (sjt)
August 3, 2018 Filing 25 OPINION granting defendants' motion to transfer venue #19 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2018. (lcplf1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Case transferred as to Counts I, II, and III of the complaint to the USDC for the Southern District of California, pursuant to Court Order entered 08/03/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting defendants' motion to transfer venue #19 . Count IV of the complaint is severed from Counts I, II, and III, and this case with those three claims will be transferred immediately, without any waiting period, to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California to be assigned, with his consent, to the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2018. (lcplf1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary W. H. Best on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Best, Zachary) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue re Minute Order on Motion for Leave to File, Minute Order filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on July 31, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-46. Date of Issuance:August 2, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018.(pk) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response to defendants' supplemental brief in support of defendants' motion to transfer venue. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 2, 2018. (MA) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Yuh, Briana) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Faith Yuh on behalf of All Defendants (Yuh, Briana) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplement brief due 8/1/2018, by 5:00 pm. (gdf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing the transfer and venue issues raised at the hearing of July 31, 2018, by 5:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 1, 2018. (MA) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2018, re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Oral argument heard and order forthcoming via chambers. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (gdf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Scott) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TRO Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (gdf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Motion #12 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Zachary W. Best and Motion #13 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theodore Clark Weymouth. Counsel are advised to review Local Civil Rule 83.2, in particular 83.2(c)(2). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018.(MA) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motion #9 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine A. Nelson, Motion #10 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ira M. Feinberg, and Motion #11 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Oliver J. Armas, on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018. (MA) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a hearing on plaintiff' motion #6 for a temporary restraining order on Tuesday, July 31, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. The parties shall be prepared to argue the TRO motion. The parties shall also be prepared to discuss whether the relief sought is already covered by orders issued by Judge Sabraw in the class action pending in San Diego and, relatedly, whether this case should be transferred to Judge Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018. (MA) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robins, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Robins on behalf of All Defendants (Robins, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing fee received for Pro Hac Vice Motions for Theodore Clark Weymouth, Zachary W. Best, Oliver J. Armas, Ira M. Feinberg and Katherine A. Nelson: $ 500.00, receipt number: 4616093832. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616093831. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 SUMMONS (15) Issued as to ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO and U.S. Attorney (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- T. Clark Weymouth, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - (202) 637-8633. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- ZACHARY W. BEST, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - (202) 637-6473. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- OLIVER J. ARMAS, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 875 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 918-3020. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- IRA M. FEINBERG, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 875 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 918-3509. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- KATHERINE A. NELSON, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 1601 Wewatta Street, Suite 900, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 454-2539. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 65.1 by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - L.A.A. Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - I.A.T. Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - G.M.A. Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - D.B.G. Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - A.M.C. Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - J.M.A Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 - Manoj Govindaiah Affidavit-, #9 Exhibit 8 - Shalyn Fluharty Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction, #11 Text of Proposed Order TRO)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. Case related to Case No. 18-1458-PLF. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO filed by I.A.T., M.M.M, L.C.O., N.B., P.A.P., G.C.H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. re #1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Pseudonym filed by N.B., G.C.H., I.A.T., M.M.M, L.C.O., P.A.P. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Pseudonym. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 7/27/2018. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Pseudonym by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M.M et al v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.M.
Represented By: Michael M. Maddigan
Represented By: Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Zachary W.H. Best
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Haley K. Costello-Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.O.
Represented By: Michael M. Maddigan
Represented By: Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Zachary W.H. Best
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Haley K. Costello-Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.A.T.
Represented By: Michael M. Maddigan
Represented By: Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Zachary W.H. Best
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Haley K. Costello-Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.C.H.
Represented By: Michael M. Maddigan
Represented By: Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Zachary W.H. Best
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Haley K. Costello-Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A.P.
Represented By: Michael M. Maddigan
Represented By: Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Zachary W.H. Best
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Haley K. Costello-Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.B.
Represented By: Michael M. Maddigan
Represented By: Theodore (T.) Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Justin W. Bernick
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Zachary W.H. Best
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Haley K. Costello-Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Bible
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?