Oya et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Souichi Oya and Aki T. Oya
Defendant: Magnum Property Investments, LLC, Does 1 through 10, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Strategic Acquisitions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01999
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
0 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
1 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and File First Amended Complaint filed by Magnum Property Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Burns, Elkanah). (jah).
October 17, 2018 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and File First Amended Complaint (Spicker, Karen). Modified on 10/18/2018 - Edited text (jah).
October 16, 2018 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and File First Amended Complaint by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen S. Spicker, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Spicker, Karen). Modified on 10/17/2018 - No Proof of Service. QC Email sent to file Proof of Service. Edited entry (jah).
October 10, 2018 15 Featured Case Minute ORDER: The Court, pursuant to its discretion under Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), determines that the motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #12 ) filed on September 19, 2018 is fit for resolution without oral argument, submits the motion on the parties' papers, and vacates the hearing on the motion set for October 29, 2018. The briefing schedule remains the same. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/10/2018. (no document attached) (smy)
October 9, 2018 14 Featured Case Minute ORDER: The Court, pursuant to its discretion under Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), determines that the motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #10 ) filed on September 6, 2018 is fit for resolution without oral argument, submits the motion on the parties' papers, and vacates the hearing on the motion set for October 22, 2018. The briefing schedule remains the same. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/9/2018. (no document attached) (smy)
September 20, 2018 13 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Daller, John). Modified on 9/21/2018 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
September 19, 2018 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Daller, John). Attorney John James Daller added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John James Daller added to party Wells Fargo Bank N.A.(pty:dft). Modified on 9/20/2018 - Proof of Service has s/ staff. Double wording in text. QC Email sent to file Corrected Proof of Service (jah).
September 13, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER Striking Hearing Date re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. The hearing date on the Motion to Dismiss was not scheduled with Court. Court strikes the 12/6/2018 hearing date and schedules the hearing on the motion to dismiss for 10/22/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. In the future, the parties should call the Court in order to schedule hearing dates for matters on which a ruling is required, Local Rule 7.1.b.. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/13/2018. (jah)
September 6, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Magnum Property Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo Points and Authorites, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice)(Burns, Elkanah)(acc).
September 6, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elkanah Johnson Burns on behalf of Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Burns, Elkanah) (acc).
September 6, 2018 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Burns, Elkanah) (acc).
September 5, 2018 7 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE #8 ***MOTION to Dismiss by Magnum Property Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo Points and Authorites, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice)(Burns, Elkanah)Attorney Elkanah Johnson Burns added to party Magnum Property Investments, LLC(pty:dft) Modified on 9/6/2018-QC mailer sent re wrong s/; Atty not associated with case; withdraw and refile (aef). Modified on 9/7/2018 (acc).
August 30, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya, as to Strategic Acquisitions, Inc.. (Spicker, Karen). (jah).
August 30, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya, as to Magnum Property Investments, LLC. (Spicker, Karen). (jah).
August 30, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. served. (Spicker, Karen). (jah).
August 30, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. served. (Spicker, Karen). (jah).
August 28, 2018 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rmc)
August 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Magnum Property Investments, LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Strategic Acquisitions, Inc., Does 1 through 10 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-11607113), filed by Aki T. Oya, Souichi Oya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Coversheet, #2 Exhibit "A" through "L")The new case number is 3:18-cv-1999-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Spicker, Karen)(rmc) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oya et al v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Souichi Oya
Represented By: Karen S. Spicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aki T. Oya
Represented By: Karen S. Spicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnum Property Investments, LLC
Represented By: Elkanah Johnson Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: John James Daller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: John James Daller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Acquisitions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?