Hinrichsen v. MLD Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rodney L. Hinrichsen
Defendant: MLD Mortgage, Inc., Does 1-10, All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title,, Michele Sjolander, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02064
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
0 Judge: Ruben B Brooks
1 Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
2 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting #4 , #5 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendant Sjolander's motion to dismiss with prejudice, and grants Defendants BANA and MERS's motion to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/25/2018. (aef)
October 9, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (Re ECF #4 , #5 ) The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/9/2018.(aef)
October 5, 2018 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Campbell, J. Owen) (aef).
October 5, 2018 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michele Sjolander. (Campbell, J. Owen) (aef).
September 28, 2018 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rodney L. Hinrichsen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, John)(aef).
September 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Rodney L. Hinrichsen (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, John) (aef).
September 13, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:17-cv-00219-DMS-RBB. The new case number is 17cv2064-DMS-RBB. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/7/2018. Motions set before Ruben B. Brooks.(sjm)
September 12, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Campbell, J. Owen) Q.C. Mailer regarding Duplicate Entry(sjm).
September 12, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michele Sjolander. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Campbell, J. Owen) (sjm).
September 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Michele Sjolander . Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A., Michele Sjolander, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Campbell, J. Owen) (sjm). (jao).
September 5, 2018 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Michele Sjolander of case(s) 3:17-cv-00219-DMS-RBB / 3:18-cv-00526-DMS-RBB / 3:18-cv-01533-DMS-RBB . (Campbell, J. Owen) (sjm). (jao).
September 5, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00038752-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11636625.), filed by Michele Sjolander, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2064-JM-AGS. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinrichsen v. MLD Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLD Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Sjolander
Represented By: J. Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: J. Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: J. Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Hinrichsen
Represented By: John Kevin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?