Harper et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Katherine M. Harper and Jeffrey A. Harper
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv02110
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jan M Adler
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422rt
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Darmstadter, Henry)Attorney Henry C Darmstadter added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (aef).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Jan M. Adler, to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. All conferences or hearing dates previously set before Judge Adler will remain as scheduled and will be before Judge Lopez. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18cv2110-DMS-LL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/29/2018.(aef)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Harper, Katherine M. Harper. United States of America served. (Montenegro, Francesca) (aef).
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey A. Harper, Katherine M. Harper. United States of America (U.S. Attorney San Diego) served. (Montenegro, Francesca) Modified on 9/21/2018 to edit text, nef resent. (jpp).
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11660717.), filed by Jeffrey A. Harper, Katherine M. Harper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2110-DMS-JMA. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Montenegro, Francesca)(tcf) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine M. Harper
Represented By: Francesca Elizabeth Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Harper
Represented By: Francesca Elizabeth Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Henry C Darmstadter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?