Santos v. Office Depot, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Santos
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc. and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2018cv02130
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
0 Judge: Michael M Anello
1 Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. No. #2 ); and Order of Dismissal. Within 35 calendar days of the date this order is issued, Santos must either file an amended and complete IFP application, or pay the filing fee. She must also file an amended complaint that alleges facts showing Office Depot's citizenship. Her amended complaint must correct problems that the Court identified in the earlier case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (sjt).
October 17, 2018 5 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Motion to Report Change to Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Filed on 9/14/2018, by Sylvia Santos. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/17/2018) (jdt).
October 17, 2018 4 Featured Case Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Motion to Report Change to Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Filed on 9/14/2018, from Plaintiff Sylvia Santos. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, Civ L. Rule 5.2: Missing proof of service. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/12/2018. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
September 19, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. Judge Michael M. Anello no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-00506-LAB-MDD. The new case number is 18cv2130-LAB(MDD). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/19/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
September 14, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sylvia Santos. (jrm)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-100, Office Depot, Inc., IFP Filed, filed by Sylvia Santos. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 exhibits)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02130-MMA-MDD. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Sylvia Santos)(jrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?