Grider v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Gena Grider
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02141
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
0 Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
1 Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald)
October 22, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER Granting #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall have through and including 11/16/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/22/2018. (ajs)
October 19, 2018 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (ajs).
October 19, 2018 11 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #10 Answer to Complaint, . Identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Howell, Edwin) (ajs). (jao).
October 19, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Proof of Service)(Howell, Edwin)Attorney Edwin Arthur Howell added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: Notice of Interested Parties must be filed separately (ajs).
October 18, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association to Respond to Complaint. Wells Fargo's deadline to respond to the complaint in this action is extended 29 days, from 10/23/2018, to 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/18/2018. (ajs)
October 17, 2018 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association . Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Asfour, Kevin) (ajs). (jao).
October 17, 2018 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Asfour, Kevin)Attorney Kevin S. Asfour added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:dft) (ajs).
October 15, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Trans Union LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Trans Union LLC has up to and including 11/09/2018, to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/15/2018. (ajs)
October 12, 2018 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Trans Union, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald) (ajs). (jao).
October 12, 2018 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bradley, Donald)Attorney Donald E Bradley added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft) (ajs).
September 17, 2018 3 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
September 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11674662.), filed by Gena Grider. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2141-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Mondala, Gemma)(jrm) (jao). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/17/2018) (jrm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/17/2018) (jrm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grider v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kevin S. Asfour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Donald E Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Arthur Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Grider
Represented By: Gemma De Lemos Mondala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?