Sivilli v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victor Sivilli
Defendant: MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Group, N.V., Does 1-20, Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02162
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Granting #14 The parties' joint motion for oral argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (no document attached) (sc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss set for 11/15/2018 by MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela) (acc).
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela) (acc).
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela) (acc).
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Victor Sivilli. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cherisse Heidi A. Cleofe In Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Cleofe, Cherisse Heidi) (acc).
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. AND MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Victor Sivilli. (Cleofe, Cherisse Heidi) (acc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mayela C. Montenegro on behalf of MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela)Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro added to party MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro added to party Wright Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mayela C. Montenegro added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft)(acc).
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice to Clerk and Adverse Party (Montenegro, Mayela) (acc).
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Koncius on behalf of Victor Sivilli (Koncius, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey A Koncius added to party Victor Sivilli(pty:pla) (acc).
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Robert Kiesel on behalf of Victor Sivilli (Kiesel, Paul)Attorney Paul Robert Kiesel added to party Victor Sivilli(pty:pla) (acc).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #3 MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 10/9/2018; Replies due by 10/16/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 11/15/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Wright Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Janet L. Hickson, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to HIckson Decl., #4 Proof of Service)(Hickson, Janet) (acc).
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Hickson, Janet) (acc).
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (lrc) (jao).
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00038527-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11685034.), filed by MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1 Summons served on Wright Medical Technology, Inc., #3 Exhibit A-2 Complaint served on Wright Medical Technology, Inc., #4 Exhibit A-3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A-4 Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference, #6 Exhibit A-5 Notice of Eligibility to efile and Assignment to Imaging Department, #7 Exhibit A-6 Alternative Dispute Resolution Information, #8 Exhibit B-1 Summons served on Wright Medical Group, Inc., #9 Exhibit B-2 Complaint served on Wright Medical Group, #10 Exhibit B-3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #11 Exhibit B-4 Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference, #12 Exhibit B-5 Notice of Eligibility to eFile and Assignment to Imaging Deparment, #13 Exhibit B-6 Alternative Dispute Resolution Information, #14 Exhibit C - Proof of Service of Summons pertaining to MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc, #15 Declaration of Janet L. Hickson, # 16 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, #17 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2162-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(lrc) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivilli v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MicroPort Orthopedics, Inc.
Represented By: Janet L. Hickson
Represented By: Mayela C. Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Janet L. Hickson
Represented By: Mayela C. Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Janet L. Hickson
Represented By: Mayela C. Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Sivilli
Represented By: Cherisse Heidi Alcantara Cleofe
Represented By: Jeffrey A Koncius
Represented By: Paul Robert Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?