Singh v. Archambeault et al
Petitioner: Amarjit Singh
Respondent: Greg Archambeault, Ronald D. Vitiello, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, James Dobson, Kirstjen Nielsen and Fred Figueroa
Case Number: 3:2018cv02186
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Briefing Schedule re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents must file response to the petition by 11/26/2918. Petitioner may file an optional reply by 1/7/2019. Pursuant to Court's discretion under Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), Court determines this matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument and submits the petition on the papers. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/18/2018. (jah)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amarjit Singh re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Brooks, Carlo) (jms). Modified on 10/18/2018 - Edited text (jah).
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2186-H-NLS.(no document attached) (anh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amarjit Singh re #2 Notice of Appearance (Brooks, Carlo) (jms).
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlo Brooks on behalf of Amarjit Singh (Brooks, Carlo)Attorney Carlo Brooks added to party Amarjit Singh(pty:pet) QC mailer sent re missing cert of service (jms).
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Greg Archambeault, James Dobson, Fred Figueroa, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, filed by Amarjit Singh. (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0974-11702161.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2186-BEN-NLS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Berke, Robert)[Case in Screening] (jms) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Archambeault et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Dobson
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Figueroa
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amarjit Singh
Represented By: Carlo Brooks
Represented By: Robert Gordon Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?