United States of America v. Safi
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: M. Khalid Safi
Case Number: 3:2018cv02292
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5314
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America (Senra, Nithya) (anh).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER re #5 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 1:30 PM is rescheduled for 10:30 AM the same day and converted to a telephonic conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate the joint call to (619) 557-2993 at 10:30 AM on 12/12/2018 with counsel for both parties and Defendant already on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/21/2018.(no document attached) (rxa)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/9/2018.(anh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America, as to M. Khalid Safi. (Senra, Nithya) (anh).
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by M. Khalid Safi.(Hartsock, William)Attorney William David Hartsock added to party M. Khalid Safi(pty:dft) (anh).
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao).
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Khalid Safi, No Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2292-CAB-BGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Senra, Nithya)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Safi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Khalid Safi
Represented By: William David Hartsock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nithya Senra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?