Tom Hussey v. Unlimited Trading Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tom Hussey
Respondent: does 1 through 10 and Unlimited Trading Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02299
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-06928. Original file received electronically
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder,, ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder transferring case to Southern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: #1 CV22) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Change Venue to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by Defendant Unlimited Trading Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Dana) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018, at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (smo) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unlimited Trading Company, Inc., (Robinson, Dana) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 by Unlimited Trading Company, Inc. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unlimited Trading Company, Inc..(Attorney Dana B Robinson added to party Unlimited Trading Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Robinson, Dana) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tom Hussey, upon Defendant Unlimited Trading Company, Inc. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ana Valencia - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Unlimited Trading Company, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tom Hussey. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Tom Hussey. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tom Hussey. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tom Hussey, (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22245136 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tom Hussey. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Tom Hussey(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 10/4/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom Hussey v. Unlimited Trading Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unlimited Trading Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dana B Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Hussey
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doniger
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?