Reo v. Chicken of the Sea International
Plaintiff: Bryan Anthony Reo
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Tri-Union Seafoods LLC doing business as Chicken of the Sea International
Case Number: 3:2018cv02419
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01477. Original file received electronically. (jdt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Northern District of Ohio. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jdt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2670 Packaged Seafood Products Antitrust Litigation. Case transferred to the Southern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Janis L. Sammartino. (P,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 22, 2018 Filing 11 Opposition to #6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Bryan Anthony Reo. (Reo, Bryan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's Motion to stay (Related Doc #9 ) these proceedings pending a decision by the MDL panel. Judge John R. Adams on 7/17/18.(L,J) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant Chicken of the Sea International. (Butscha, Mark) Modified text on 7/16/2018 (O,K). Modified on 7/16/2018 (O,K). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 8 Opposition to #4 Motion to remand to State Court (and supporting brief) filed by Chicken of the Sea International. (Butscha, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 7, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to stay proceedings pending ruling on remand motion filed by Plaintiff Bryan Anthony Reo. (Reo, Bryan) (Related document #4 ) Modified text on 7/16/2018 (O,K). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Chicken of the Sea International. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Butscha, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge John R. Adams, as related, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/2/2018. (K,K) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to remand to State Court (and supporting brief) filed by Plaintiff Bryan Anthony Reo. (Reo, Bryan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.. (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Thai Union North America Inc. for Chicken of the Sea International filed by Chicken of the Sea International. (Butscha, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas of Lake County, case number 18-CV-000830 with jury demand. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8782153. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:18-cv-01415. Filed by Chicken of the Sea International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Butscha, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 10/22/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reo v. Chicken of the Sea International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC
Represented By: Thomas F. Zych
Represented By: Mark R. Butscha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC doing business as Chicken of the Sea International
Represented By: Thomas F. Zych
Represented By: Mark R. Butscha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Anthony Reo
Represented By: Bryan A. Reo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?