California Trucking Association et al v. Becerra et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom are seeking to prohibit Defendants from applying and enforcing California's new test for whether a worker is an employee or independent contractor, as interpreted by the California Supreme Court in Dynamex Operations West, Inc. v. Supreme Court and codified by the California Legislature through Assembly Bill 5 at Labor Code § 2750.3. Plaintiffs contend that the ABC test is preempted by the Federal Aviation Administration Authorization Act of 1994 and imposes an impermisible burden on interstate commerce in violation of the Commerce Clause of the U.S. Constitution.

Plaintiff: California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom and Ravinder Singh
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick Henning and Julie Su
Intervenor Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Amicus Curiae: Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney
Case Number: 3:2018cv02458
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting #86 Joint Motion. Plaintiffs shall file a single Opposition brief of no more than 35 pages to both Motions to Dismiss on or before January 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/14/2020. (mme)
January 14, 2020 Filing 86 Joint MOTION Amending Briefing Schedule and Permitting Single Opposition Brief to Motions to Dismiss re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
January 13, 2020 Filing 85 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Roger T. Benitez: Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2020. Submitting #54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Odom, California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh. Court to issue written Order. The temporary restraining order issued by this Court on 12/31/2019 shall remain in effect until further notice. (Court Reporter/ECR Amanda LeGore). (Plaintiff Attorneys Robert R. Roginson, Spencer C. Skeen, Alexander M. Chemers).(Defendant Attorneys Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda).(Intervenor Attorneys Andrew Kushner, Stacey M. Leyton). (no document attached) (gxr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Skeen, Spencer)Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party California Trucking Association(pty:pla), Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party Ravinder Singh(pty:pla) (mme).
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting #76 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs shall file their oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss by January 15, 2020. State Defendants and Intervenor shall file their replies by January 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/8/2020. (mme)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Denying #64 Motion for Leave to File; Denying #65 Motion for Leave to Appear; Denying #71 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/8/2020. (mme)
January 7, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion by International Brotherhood of Teamsters re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
January 6, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction /Plaintiffs' Opposition to Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney's Motion for Leave to Submit Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
January 6, 2020 Filing 79 RESPONSE re #74 Objection to Declarations of Dr. Michael Belzer and Dr. Steve Viscelli filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
January 6, 2020 Filing 78 RESPONSE re #73 Response in Support of Motion, Request for Judicial Notice (Dkt. 73-3) filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting #66 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and Denying #72 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/31/19. (dlg)
December 31, 2019 Filing 76 Joint MOTION re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint re Request to Amend Briefing Schedule by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Kushner, Andrew) (mme).
December 30, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh re #66 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
December 30, 2019 Filing 74 OBJECTION by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Declarations of Dr. Michael Belzer and Dr. Steve Viscelli. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
December 30, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Support re #54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Chemers, #2 Declaration of Shawn Yadon, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
December 30, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Amicus Brief Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney's Motion for Leave to Submit Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Declaration of Danielle L. Goldstein in Support of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney's Motion for Leave to Submit Brief of Amicus Curiae, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Danielle L. Goldstein, #4 Appendix Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney, #5 Appendix Attachment A to the Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney, #6 Appendix Attachment B to the Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney, #7 Appendix Attachment C to the Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney)(Goldstein, Danielle) (mme).
December 27, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney in Support of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss by Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney's Motion for Leave to Submit Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Appendix Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney In Support of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss, #3 Appendix Attachment A to the Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney In Support of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss, #4 Appendix Attachment B to the Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney In Support of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss, #5 Appendix Attachment C to the Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney In Support of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss)(Goldstein, Danielle) (mme).
December 27, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE re: Change of Hearing on #66 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing reset for 1/6/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE re #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, State Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick Henning, Andre Schoorl, Julie Su. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (mme).
December 26, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Hearing on #66 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey Leyton in Opposition to Request for a Temporary Restraining Order)(Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
December 24, 2019 Filing 66 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Of Robert R. Roginson)(Roginson, Robert) (mme).
December 23, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney's Motion to Participate in Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Goldstein, Danielle)
December 23, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of the Office of the Los Angeles City Attorneys Motion for Leave to Submit Brief of Amicus Curiae Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Appendix Attachment A to the Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Appendix Attachment B to the Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Appendix Attachment C to the Proposed Amicus Brief of the Office of the Los Angeles City Opposing Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Goldstein, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Luce Goldstein added to party Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney(pty:am)
December 20, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion)(Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
December 20, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick Henning, Andre Schoorl, Julie Su (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Supporting State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)Attorney Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Lilia Garcia-Brower(pty:dft), Attorney Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Patrick Henning(pty:dft) (ag).
December 20, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on #54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing reset for 1/13/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting #59 Joint Motion To Permit Plaintiffs To File Single Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/18/2019. (mme)
December 18, 2019 Filing 59 Joint MOTION Permitting Single Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
December 16, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Michael Belzer in Opposition to Motion, #2 Declaration of Dr. Steve Viscelli in Opposition to Motion, #3 Declaration of Eric Tate in Opposition to Motion, #4 Declaration of Andrew Kushner in Opposition to Motion)(Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
December 16, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Vissers on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters (Vissers, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth Vissers added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intvd) (mme).
December 16, 2019 Filing 56 OBJECTION by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick Henning, Andre Schoorl, Julie Su re #55 Response to Motion, State Defendant's Objections to Evidence Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (mme).
December 16, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction State Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick Henning, Andre Schoorl, Julie Su. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (mme).
December 2, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Greg P. Stefflre, #3 Declaration of Shawn Yadon, #4 Declaration of Thomas Odom, #5 Declaration of John E. Husing, Ph.D. (including Exhs. A-B))(Chemers, Alexander) (tcf).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Joint Motion for Extension. As requested by the parties and to maintain consistency, the deadline for the newly-named State Defendants to file a responsive pleading is also extended. Accordingly, all defendants shall file a responsive pleading on or before December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/22/2019. (mme)
November 22, 2019 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. Patrick Henning served. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
November 22, 2019 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. Lilia Garcia-Brower served. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
November 22, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION re #49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #47 Amended Complaint (Stipulated Extension) by Intervenor Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
November 22, 2019 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #47 Amended Complaint (Stipulated Extension) by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Leyton, Stacey) (mme).
November 13, 2019 Filing 48 Amended Summons Issued as to Second Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(mme)
November 12, 2019 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT /SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom.New Summons Requested. (Chemers, Alexander) (mme).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #28 Defendants' and #29 Intervenor-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted, and this action is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/24/2019. (rmc) (sjt).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #44 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 09/16/2019. (mme)
September 11, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION Request to Lift Stay of Proceedings by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (mme).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER STAYING CASE. Case stayed until pending appeal. The parties shall notify the Court within 7 days of a decision by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/5/2019.(jrm)(jao).
June 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by California Trucking Association re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
June 14, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
April 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' and Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
April 3, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE re #38 Notice (Other), #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint / Plaintiffs' Response to Intervenor's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
March 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by International Brotherhood of Teamsters re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Leyton, Stacey) (dlg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Leyton, Stacey) (anh).
March 25, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Reply Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (anh).
March 25, 2019 Filing 35 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 4/2/2019 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
March 11, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A - to Request for Judicial Notice)(Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #31 ] Responses due by 3/11/2019 Replies due by 3/25/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez.. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/25/2019. (anh)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation [Doc. #30 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/21/2019. (anh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Dismiss by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
February 20, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION Permitting Single Opposition Brief to Motions to Dismiss re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
February 7, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Intervenor-Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Leyton, Stacey) (anh).
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (anh).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying as Moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/1/2019. (anh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh (Roginson, Robert) QC Email: Document not signed by registered user(anh).
January 24, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. (Roginson, Robert) QC Email: Duplicate filing(anh).
January 24, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against All Plaintiffs, filed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. (Roginson, Robert) (anh).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Continue. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 2/19/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/18/2019. (sjt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue /Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Chemers, Alexander)Attorney Alexander Miller Chemers added to party California Trucking Association(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander Miller Chemers added to party Thomas Odom(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander Miller Chemers added to party Ravinder Singh(pty:pla) (sjm).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: (1) GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE, DOC #11 ; (2) DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE, DOC #18 ; and (3) DENYING AS MOOT EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME, DOC #19 . Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/14/2019. (sjm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #11 MOTION to Intervene . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 1/14/2019 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion for Leave to File, and to Participate in Hearing by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Motion for Leave to File, and to Participate in Hearing, #2 Declaration of Andrew Kushner In Support of Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Motion for Leave to File, and to Participate in Hearing)(Leyton, Stacey) (anh).
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Memo of Points and Authorities or, in the alternative, Amicus Brief in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and to Participate in Hearing by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to File and to Participate in Hearing, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities Or, in the Alternative, Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Leyton, Stacey) (anh).
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Intervene filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Leyton, Stacey) (anh).
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (anh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Intervene MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE by International Brotherhood of Teamsters filed by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service CM/ECF December 31, 2018)(Chemers, Alexander) (anh).
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to Intervene by Proposed Intervenor International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su re #11 MOTION to Intervene (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (rmc).
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 OBJECTION by California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom, Ravinder Singh re #12 Notice of Related Case (Chemers, Alexander) (sjm).
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su of case(s) 16-cv-1866 CAB MDD; 18-cv-01989 MCE KJN Defendants' Notice of Related Case (Civil L.R. 40.1). (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (anh).
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Bradley Raymond in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene)(Leyton, Stacey) QC Email: Proposed Order(anh).
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Monica Leyton on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters (Leyton, Stacey)Attorney Stacey Monica Leyton added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intv) (anh).
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Kushner on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters (Kushner, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Edward Kushner added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters(pty:intv) (anh).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. [Doc. #7 ] Answer by Respondent due 1/3/2019. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/3/2018. (anh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion Under Civil Local Rule 12.1 for Extension of Time for Responsive Pleading by Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel Supporting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion Under Civil Local Rule 12.1 for Extension of Time for Responsive Pleading)(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) (anh).
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)Attorney Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Andre Schoorl(pty:dft), Attorney Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Julie A. Su(pty:dft) (anh).
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. Julie A. Su served. (Luster, Julia) (anh).
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. Andre Schoorl served. (Luster, Julia) (anh).
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. All Defendants served. (Luster, Julia) (anh).
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11832541.), filed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2458-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Roginson, Robert)(tcf)(sjt).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Andre Schoorl, Julie A. Su ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11832541.), filed by California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh, Thomas Odom. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2458-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Roginson, Robert)(tcf)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Trucking Association et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Trucking Association
Represented By: Robert R. Roginson
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Odom
Represented By: Robert R. Roginson
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravinder Singh
Represented By: Robert R. Roginson
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Schoorl
Represented By: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Su
Represented By: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilia Garcia-Brower
Represented By: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Henning
Represented By: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Su
Represented By: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Andrew Edward Kushner
Represented By: Stacey Monica Leyton
Represented By: Elizabeth Vissers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?