Pfeiffer v. General Motors et al
Plaintiff: Marshall Pfeiffer
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, General Motors, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Ally Financial Inc., New Residential Investment Corp, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC., Magnum Property Investments LLC, Strategic Acquisitions Inc., Residential Credit Solutions Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, NewRez LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Ditech Financial LLC, Homecomings Financial LLC, GMAC Mortgage LLC, GMAC Bank/Ally Bank, NewRez LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, New Penn Financial LLC. via its Registered Agent: Corporation doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC and New Penn Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02551
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. Nunc pro tunc 6/11/19 (dlg)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Response and Objection to Allys Motion to Dismiss, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/11/19. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/14/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 89 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #82 Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies, #80 Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies. Mail sent to Marshall Pfeiffer. (dlg)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #87 MOTION to Dismiss: A hearing has been set for July 12, 2019 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 2D. Any opposition shall be filed on or before June 26, 2019. Any reply shall be filed on or before July 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/11/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by GMAC Bank/Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLY BANKS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, #2 Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLY BANKS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order, #14 Proof of Service)(Julian, Jason) (dlg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [DOCKET NO. 77], AND INTENT TO RE-FILE MOTION TO DISMISS by GMAC Bank/Ally Bank re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Julian, Jason) (dlg).
June 4, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Support re #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, New Residential Investment Corp, NewRez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel) (dlg).
May 31, 2019 Filing 83 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Marshall Pfeiffer. Nunc Pro tunc 5/30/19 (dlg)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Request for Judicial Notice, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/30/19. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/30/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition and Objection re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. Nunc pro tunc 5/30/19 (dlg)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Combined Response and Objection to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/30/19. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/30/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 84 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Second Amended Complaint by Marshall Pfeiffer. GMAC Bank/Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC served. (dlg)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #77 ) A hearing has been set for July 12, 2019 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Any opposition shall be filed on or before June 12, 2019. Any reply shall be filed on or before June 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
May 28, 2019 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. GMAC Bank/Ally Bank served. (tcf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 77 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 86 *** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by GMAC Bank/Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, #2 Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order)(Julian, Jason) QC Email: Proposed order on docket (anh). Modified on 5/31/2019 to alter docket text to show as filed by GMAC Bank/Ally Bank per call with filer, atty Jason Julian associated with party as counsel of record on docket (rmc). Modified on 6/11/2019 (dlg).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : A hearing for the above three motions has been set for July 12, 2019 in Courtroom 2D. Accordingly, any opposition shall be filed on or before May 31, 2019. Any reply shall be filed on or before June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/21/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Points and Authories, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judical Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibits, #4 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Harris, Seth) (dlg).
May 17, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, New Residential Investment Corp, NewRez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration System(pty:dft) (dlg).
May 15, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Magnum Property Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Burns, Elkanah) (dlg).
May 3, 2019 Filing 72 Summons Issued as to Second Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jdt)
May 3, 2019 Filing 71 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ditech Financial LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, GMAC Bank/Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial LLC, Magnum Property Investments LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, NewRez LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Residential Credit Solutions Inc, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Part 1 of 4), #2 Appendix (Part 2 of 4), #3 Appendix (Part 3 of 4), #4 Appendix (Part 4 of 4), #5 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (jdt)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Verified Action, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.2: Improper form/format; Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
May 3, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants General Motors, Ally Financial Inc., Strategic Acquisitions Inc. by Marshall Pfeiffer. Submitted as Notice of Defendant Removal. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/1/2019. Defendants General Motors, Ally Financial Inc., Strategic Acquisitions Inc. terminated. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Notice of Defendant Removal, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.2: Improper form/format; Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
April 12, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE Regarding Amended Brief Appendix by Marshall Pfeiffer. Nunc pro tunc 4/9/19 (dlg)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Brief Appendix, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format; Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/9/19. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/12/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting #36 , #37 , #38 , #40 , #42 Motions to Dismiss; Denying Ex Parte Motion to Set Aside Alleged Sale #13 . If Plaintiff seeks to avail himself of the opportunity to file a Second Amended Complaint, he must do so within 30 days of the entry of this order. Any such filing must address the deficiencies outlined in this Order. The motion hearing set for March 15, 2019 at 1:30 PM is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/11/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER in Support of New Penn Financial, LLC D/B/A Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing's Notice of Name Change. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC., New Residential Investment Corp, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation . Identifying Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corp. for New Penn Financial LLC.; Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel) (dlg). (jao).
February 20, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE OF DEFENDANT NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING by New Penn Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1)(Ekmekchyan, Pavel) qc email, for name to be changed on docket there needs to be an order (dlg).
February 13, 2019 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quality Loan Service Corporation Amended (Harris, Seth) (dlg).
February 13, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Harris, Seth) (dlg).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Continuing Hearing Date re #13 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Alleged Sale : The Court will continue the hearing set on Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer's Ex Parte Emergency Motion to Set Aside Alleged Sale, from February 1, 2019, to March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/25/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A)(Julian, Jason) (dlg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC., New Residential Investment Corp, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel) (dlg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction General Motors Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by General Motors. (Oxford, Gregory) (dlg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : A hearing on the matter is scheduled for March 15, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Any response from Plaintiff will be due February 6, 2019 any reply from Plaintiff will be due February 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/23/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 21, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Magnum Property Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Burns, Elkanah) (dlg).
January 18, 2019 Filing 53 Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 42 & 42-1 re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (sjm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document Nunc Pro Tunc 1/16/2019: Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 42 & 42-1, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 51 Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 40& 40-1 re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (sjm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document Nunc Pro Tunc 1/16/2019 : Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 40& 40-1, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 49 Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 38 & 38-1 re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (sjm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document Nunc Pro Tunc 1/16/2019 : Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 38 & 38-1, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 47 Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 37 & 37-1 re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (sjm) Modified on 1/21/2019 (sjm).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document Nunc Pro Tunc 1/16/2019 : Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 37 & 37-1, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper form and format. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 45 Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 36 & 36-1 re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (sjm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document Nunc Pro Tunc 1/16/2019: Response and Objections to Defendants Docs 36 & 36-1, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, OTHER: Civ. L. Rule 5.1 - Improper form and format. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : A hearing on the matter is scheduled for March 15, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Any response from Plaintiff will be due January 17, 2019; any reply from Plaintiff will be due January 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/8/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proof of Service)(Harris, Seth)Attorney Seth Harris added to party Quality Loan Service Corporation(pty:dft) (dlg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE by New Penn Financial LLC. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel) qc email, for name change on docket there needs to be an order (dlg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC., New Residential Investment Corp, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Ekmekchyan, Pavel) (dlg).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement, #37 MOTION to Dismiss : A hearing on the matter is scheduled for March 15, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Any response from Plaintiff will be due January 17, 2019; any reply from Plaintiff will be due January 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/4/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Ally Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Julian, Jason) (dlg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss by Magnum Property Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Burns, Elkanah)Attorney Elkanah Johnson Burns added to party Magnum Property Investments LLC (pty:dft) (dlg).
December 28, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by General Motors. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Oxford, Gregory) (aef).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Motion to Remove California State Case, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Improper procedure for attempted removal from state court a notice of removal cannot be filed within an existing federal case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/19/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2018: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
December 17, 2018 Filing 34 Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (dlg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 33 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marshall Pfeiffer.New Summons Requested. Nunc pro tunc 12/14/18 (dlg)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Verified Cause of Action and Demand for Declaration of Relief and Duties, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Supplemental documents require court order, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service; Civ.L. Rule 5.1.j.1 missing name, address, or phone number of individual appearing pro se. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/14/18. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/17/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 31 Answer and Objection to Defendant's Responses. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/3/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Answer and Objection to Defendants Response, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/10/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying #28 as Moot Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendants; Denying as Moot Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #21 , #23 , #24 ; Continuing the Hearing Set for Plaintiff's Ex Parte Emergency Motion to Set Aside Alleged Sale #13 . The motion hearing date set for Plaintiff's ex parte motion to set aside alleged sale is continued to February 1, 2019 (ECF No. #13 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/6/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Add Parties by Marshall Pfeiffer. Nunc pro tunc 11/29/18 (dlg)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Notice of Motion and Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Parties, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Improper format.. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/29/18. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/5/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marshall Pfeiffer re #13 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Alleged Sale (dlg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Rejection of Service regarding General Motors. (sjm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Ally Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Julian, Jason)Attorney Jason M Julian added to party Ally Financial Inc.(pty:dft) (sjm).
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Kitt, Timothy)Attorney Timothy P. Kitt added to party Quality Loan Service Corporation(pty:dft) (sjm).
November 29, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Alleged Sale filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC., New Residential Investment Corp, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Ekmekchyan, Pavel) (dlg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, New Penn Financial LLC., New Residential Investment Corp, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party New Penn Financial LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party New Residential Investment Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation(pty:dft) (dlg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Alleged Sale filed by General Motors. (Oxford, Gregory) (dlg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, General Motors Answer to Complaint by General Motors.(Oxford, Gregory)Attorney Gregory R Oxford added to party General Motors(pty:dft) (dlg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Rejection of Service and Re-Serve regarding General Motors (dlg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation served. (dlg)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #13 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Alleged Sale : The Court will set the below schedule for Plaintiffs motion: a hearing on the matter is scheduled for December 20, 2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Any response from defendants will be due November 29, 2018; any reply from Plaintiff will be due December 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) Modified on 11/29/2018 to re-send order to "General Motors Company" (ref ecf 18) (dlg).
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT: Additional copies of executed summons by Marshall Pfeiffer. NUNC PRO TUNC 11/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/16/2018 per dj chambers) (dlg).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Supplemental Documents, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), FRcvP 15 - Supplemental documents require court order. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Alleged Sale by Marshall Pfeiffer. NUNC PRO TUNC 11/13/2018. (jah)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Notice of Ex Parte Emergency Motion to Set Aside Alleged Sale, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying #4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/13/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. New Residential Investment Corp served. (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation served. (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. Ally Financial Inc. served. (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. General Motors served. (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. New Penn Financial LLC. served. (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Pfeiffer. Quality Loan Service Corporation served. (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Marshall Pfeiffer. Nunc pro tunc 11/9/18 (dlg)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, from Plaintiff Marshall Pfeiffer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/9/18. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/9/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (lrc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, General Motors, New Penn Financial LLC., New Residential Investment Corp, Quality Loan Service Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS106438.), filed by Marshall Pfeiffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verified Cause of Action, #3 Exhibits, #4 Receipt)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2551-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfeiffer v. General Motors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Timothy P. Kitt
Represented By: Seth Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Represented By: Gregory R Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Jason M Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Investment Corp
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial LLC.
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnum Property Investments LLC
Represented By: Elkanah Johnson Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Acquisitions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Bank/Ally Bank
Represented By: Jason M Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC formerly known as New Penn Financial, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial LLC. via its Registered Agent: Corporation doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing LLC
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial, LLC
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?