Gellman et al v. Hunsinger et al
Petitioner: Peter Gellman and Palmerston Group Indemnity Solutions, LLC
Respondent: Andrea Hunsinger Jolly, an Insurance Services Corporation and Andrea Hunsinger
Case Number: 3:2018cv02641
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0004
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (Re ECF 1 ) The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/8/2019.(aef)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION by Andrea Hunsinger Jolly, an Insurance Services Corporation, Andrea Hunsinger to the January 4, 2019, Supplemental Declaration of Petitioner Peter Gellman; Order Thereon. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Freni, John) (aef).
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Peter Gellman, Palmerston Group Indemnity Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Peter Gellman, #2 Declaration (Supplemental) of Yosef Peretz)(Peretz, Yosef) (aef).
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 OBJECTION by Andrea Hunsinger (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Respondents' Andrea Hunsinger and Andrea Hunsinger an insurance services corporation's points and authorities in opposition to petition to compel arbitration, #2 Declaration Declaration of J. Freni in Support of Respondents opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Respondent Andrea Hunsinger in Support of Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Dec. of A. Hunsinger, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Dec. of A. Hunsinger, #6 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Freni, John) (aef).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. (Re ECF 1 ) Respondents Andrea Hunsinger and Andrea Hunsinger Jolly, an Insurance Services Corporation shall file a response on or before December 28, 2018. Any reply shall be filed on or before January 4, 2019, at which time the matter shall be taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/28/2018.(aef)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Order to Compel Arbitration by Peter Gellman, Palmerston Group Indemnity Solutions, LLC. (no document attached) (cdw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Order to Compel Arbitration against Andrea Hunsinger Jolly, an Insurance Services Corporation, Andrea Hunsinger ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11913455), filed by Peter Gellman, Palmerston Group Indemnity Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Peter Gellman, #3 Declaration of Yosef Peretz, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02641-DMS-AGS. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Peretz, Yosef)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gellman et al v. Hunsinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea Hunsinger Jolly, an Insurance Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrea Hunsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Gellman
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Palmerston Group Indemnity Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?