United States of America v. $22,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $22,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Al Jerome Jackson
Case Number: 3:2018cv02697
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Al Jerome Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cindrich, Michael)Attorney Michael E Cindrich added to party Al Jerome Jackson(pty:clm) (aef).
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified by Al Jerome Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cindrich, Michael) (aef).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED (USM 285) as to $22,120.00 in U.S. Currency. (aef)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 IN REM WARRANT issued as to Plaintiff United States of America. (aef)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Appointing United States Marshal as Custodian and Depositing the Defendant Currency into the Seized Assets Deposit Account. (ECF #2 ) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2018. [cc:USM] (aef)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint The United States Marshal as Custodian by United States of America. (jrm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $22,120.00 in U.S. Currency, Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2697-DMS-NLS. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Smith, Bruce)(jrm) (Attachment 2 replaced with file stamped version on 11/29/2018) (jrm). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $22,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bruce C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Al Jerome Jackson
Represented By: Michael E Cindrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?