Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv02715
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (ECF No. #5 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/19/2018. (jdt)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support)(Bandlow, Lincoln) Modified on 12/7/2018 - Sent QC email reminder to use correct judge's initials in caption (jdt).
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2715-LAB-BLM.(no document attached) (anh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) Modified to correct file date on 12/4/2018 (jao).
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (jrm) (jao).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11957819.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Copyright Form)(Copyright Form Mailed) The new case number is 3:18-cv-2715-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #3 civil cover sheet) (jrm). (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?