Torosian et al v. Elite Show Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Karla Torosian and Tanya Torosian
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and Elite Show Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02758
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
0 Judge: Cynthia Bashant
1 Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference was held on 1/25/2019. Any motion to join other parties, to amend the pleadings, or to file additional pleadings shall be filed by 3/22/2019. All motions, other than motions to amend or join parties, or motions in limine shall be filed by 9/20/2019. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2019 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. All motions in limine are due by 2/3/2020. All responses to the motions in limine are due by 2/17/2020. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 3/9/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/31/2019. (jah)
January 28, 2019 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic, counsel-only Case Management Conference held on 1/25/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Eugene Feldman). (Defendant Attorney Carol Humiston). (Defendant Attorney Bradley J. Leimkuhler). (no document attached) (mjg)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: No later than tomorrow, 1/17/2019, at 12:00 PM, the parties shall lodge via e-mail at efile_Burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov a supplement to their Joint Discovery Plan that complies with items 3-5 and 8 listed in III.B. of Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules. (mjg)
January 15, 2019 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Feldman, Eugene). (jah).
January 7, 2019 11 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Elite Show Services, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Humiston, Carol) (ag). (jao).
January 7, 2019 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Elite Show Services, Inc..(Humiston, Carol)Attorney Carol Humiston added to party Elite Show Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (ag).
December 18, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Leimkuhler on behalf of Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Leimkuhler, Bradley). Attorney Bradley J. Leimkuhler added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft). (jah).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic, Counsel-Only Case Management Conference and In-Person Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic, Counsel-Only Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In-Person, Parties-Required Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/22/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed by 1/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed in CM/ECF as well lodged with Magistrate Judge Burkhardt by 1/15/2019. Each party shall provide Plaintiff's counsel with an executed copy of the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by 12/31/2018. If all parties have consented to the reference to a magistrate judge, Plaintiff shall file the consent form(s) in paper format at the Clerk's Office by 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/17/2018. (jah)
December 17, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Francis Hurley on behalf of Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Hurley, Gregory). Modified on 12/18/2018 - Appearance is for different atty, not filing atty. QC Email sent for Atty Leimkuhler to file own appearance per L.R. 83.3 and G.O. 550 (jah).
December 17, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (Hurley, Gregory). Modified on 12/18/2018 - Updated case to add Liberty Media Corporation as affiliate (shareholder) (jah).(jao).
December 17, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc..(Hurley, Gregory). Attorney Gregory Francis Hurley added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (pty:dft). (jah).
December 10, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. The new case number is 3:18-cv-02758-BAS-JLB.(no document attached) (jrm)
December 7, 2018 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
December 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Karla Torosian, Tanya Torosian. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mme)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10, inclusive, Elite Show Services, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11979106.), filed by Karla Torosian, Tanya Torosian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02758-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Feldman, Eugene)(mme)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torosian et al v. Elite Show Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Leimkuhler
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Show Services, Inc.
Represented By: Carol Humiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Torosian
Represented By: Eugene Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Torosian
Represented By: Eugene Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?