Evans Hotel, LLC et al v. Unite Here! Local 30 et al
Plaintiff: EHSW, LLC, BH Partnership LP and Evans Hotels, LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO and Tom Lemmon
Case Number: 3:2018cv02763
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
4 Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0187
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO (Johnson, Meredith) (sxa).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge William Q. Hayes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2763-TWR-AHG. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/23/2020.(ag)
June 30, 2020 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (tcf).
June 30, 2020 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul) (tcf).
June 30, 2020 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 Joint MOTION to Strike #76 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul) (tcf).
June 16, 2020 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Tom Lemmon and San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
June 16, 2020 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 Joint MOTION to Strike #76 Amended Complaint,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Special Motion to Strike filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
June 16, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Opposition to Unite Here Local 30 and Brigette Browning's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
May 19, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
May 19, 2020 Filing 80 Joint MOTION to Strike #76 Amended Complaint,,, by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike)(More, Paul) (ag).
May 19, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint)(More, Paul) (ag).
May 1, 2020 Filing 78 MINUTE ENTRY: The parties' Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Anti-SLAPP Motions (ECF No. #77 ) is granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due May 19, 2020. Plaintiffs' oppositions are due June 16, 2020. Defendants' replies are due June 30, 2020. There will be no oral argument unless requested by the Court. (no document attached) (ag)
April 30, 2020 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Anti-SLAPP Motions by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
April 21, 2020 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint for (1) Unlawful Secondary Boycott; (2) Attempted Monopolization in Violation of Section 2 of The Sherman Act; (3) Conspiracy to Monopolize in Violation of Section 2 of The Sherman Act; (4) Violation of the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act, 18 U.S.C. 1962(c); (5) Violation of the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act, 18 U.S.C. 1962(d), by Conspiring to Violate 18 U.S.C. 1962(c); (6) Interference with Prospective Economic Advantages; (7) Attempted Extortion; and (8) Unfair Competition (Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq.) against Brigette Browning, DOES 1-10, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30, filed by Evans Hotels, LLC, BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. #62 ) is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed SAC attached to the Motion for Leave to Amend (ECF No. 62-2) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. #61 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/20/2020. (ag)
March 23, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY to Building Trades' Opposition to Evans Hotels' #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
March 23, 2020 Filing 73 REPLY in Opposition to Evans Hotels' #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
March 23, 2020 Filing 72 REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs' #61 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
March 9, 2020 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
March 9, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend)(More, Paul) (ag).
March 9, 2020 Filing 69 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul) (ag).
February 18, 2020 Filing 68 MINUTE ENTRY: Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Extended Briefing Schedule (ECF No. #64 ) is denied. Defendants shall file any oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. #61 ) and Motion for Leave to Amend (ECF No. #62 ) by March 9, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file any replies by March 23, 2020. (no document attached) (ag)
February 14, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
February 14, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
February 13, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Intent to File Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Extended Briefing Schedule by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC re #64 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Leader, Susan) (jpp).
February 13, 2020 Filing 64 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey M. Leyton in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Extended Briefing Schedule)(Leyton, Stacey) (jpp).
February 7, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF ERRATA Re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 [CORRECTED] Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Leader, Susan) (ag).
February 6, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Second Amended Complaint, #3 Redline Comparison)(Leader, Susan) (ag).
February 4, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC re #60 Order (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Leader, Susan) (ag).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #29 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #31 ) and Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. #30 , #32 ) are denied as moot. No later than thirty days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiffs may request leave to amend pursuant to Local Civil Rules 7.1 and 15.1(c). If no motion is filed, the Clerk of Court shall close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/7/2020. (ag)
November 1, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE re #58 Supplemental Document, Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul) (ag).
October 29, 2019 Filing 58 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion, #38 Response in Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Authority ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Leader, Susan) (mme).
October 3, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel re Stephanie Priel by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC (Leader, Susan) (ag).
October 2, 2019 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Q. Hayes: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2019 re #32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in Amended Complaint, #31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #30 MOTION to Strike, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Court to issue written Order.(Court Reporter/ECR Melinda Setterman). (Plaintiff Attorney Susan Leader, Lawrence Levien, Rex Heinke). (Defendant Attorney Stacey Leyton, Paul More, Meredith Johnson). (no document attached) (kas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 55 Minute Entry: TIME CHANGE ONLY. The time of the oral argument on October 2, 2019, originally scheduled for 11:00 a.m., is now scheduled for 10:00 a.m. (no document attached) (tcf) (jao).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSFER ORDER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Karen S. Crawford to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H. Goddard for further proceedings. All conferences or hearing dates previously set before Judge Crawford will remain as scheduled and will be held before Judge Goddard. All dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18cv2763-WQH-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/20/2019. (jdt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion, #38 Response in Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Authority ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Leader, Susan) (tcf).
July 30, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the Parties' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #29 , #31 ) and motions to strike (ECF Nos. #30 , #32 ) on 10/2/ 2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B before Judge William Q. Hayes.(no document attached) (ajs)
July 22, 2019 Filing 51 Joint NOTICE of Availability for Hearing by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO re 50 Order on Motion to Continue, (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
July 18, 2019 Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument (ECF No. #47 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The oral argument scheduled for 8/1/2019 is VACATED. By 7/24/19, the parties shall indicate their availability for oral argument on 10/1/2019, 10/2/2019 and 10/8/2019. (no document attached) (ajs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Availability for Hearing by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO re 48 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, (Leyton, Stacey) (tcf).
July 11, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTE ENTRY: By 7/17/2019, the Parties shall provide the Court with dates in September 2019 acceptable to all parties for oral argument on the motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #29 , #31 ) and motions to strike (ECF Nos. #30 , #32 ).(no document attached) (ag)
July 10, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Continue to Reschedule Oral Argument by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
June 17, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Rex S Heinke on behalf of BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC (Heinke, Rex)Attorney Rex S Heinke added to party BH Partnership LP(pty:pla), Attorney Rex S Heinke added to party EHSW, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rex S Heinke added to party Evans Hotels, LLC(pty:pla) (jrm).
June 11, 2019 Filing 45 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court will hear oral argument on the Parties' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #29 , #31 ) and motions to strike (ECF Nos. #30 , #32 ) on 8/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14B before Judge William Q. Hayes. (no document attached) (ag)
June 7, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in Amended Complaint filed by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
June 7, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
June 7, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul) (ag).
June 7, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul)(ag).
June 7, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Strike filed by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (More, Paul) (ag).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Lawrence D. Levien, re #34 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/22/2019. (mdc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Opposition to Tom Lemmon and San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFI-CIO'S Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
May 17, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in Amended Complaint, #30 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Special Motions to Strike filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
May 17, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
May 17, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Opposition to Unite Here Local 30 and Brigette Browning's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan) (ag).
May 17, 2019 Filing 34 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12281098 - See #21 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Levien, Lawrence) Modified text on 5/17/2019 to include filing fee info. (mdc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A Girolamo on behalf of BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC (Girolamo, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca A Girolamo added to party BH Partnership LP(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca A Girolamo added to party EHSW, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca A Girolamo added to party Evans Hotels, LLC(pty:pla) (ag).
April 15, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in Amended Complaint by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
April 15, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Special Motion to Strike and Exhibit 1)(More, Paul) (ag).
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Exhibits 1-15 (Part 1 of 5), #3 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 2 of 5), #4 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 3 of 5), #5 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 4 of 5), #6 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 5 of 5))(More, Paul) (ag).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Joint Motion by All Parties for Extended Briefing and Hearing Schedule and Allowing Service of Document Preservation Subpoenas. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/29/2019. (acc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing and Hearing Schedule and Allowing Service of Document Preservation Subpoenas by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Leyton, Stacey) (ag).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this matter to another district judge. This case is randomly reassign to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this matter. The new case number is 18-cv-2763-WQH-KSC. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/18/2019. (no document attached) (smy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Todd Coopersmith on behalf of Tom Lemmon (Coopersmith, Steven). Attorney Steven Todd Coopersmith added to party Tom Lemmon (pty:dft). (jah).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' #15 Motion to Dismiss and #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Finding as moot #17 Motion to Strike and #18 Motion to Strike. Court vacates the hearing scheduled for 3/15/2019 10:30 AM. Court orders that Defendants may file a responsive pleading to #19 First Amended Complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/14/2019. (jah)
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT re Mootness of Pending Special Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #17 MOTION to Strike, #18 MOTION to Strike filed by Evans Hotels, LLC. (Leader, Susan). Modified on 3/11/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected text to match pleading (jah).
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Michael Weisel on behalf of BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC (Weisel, Jessica). Attorney Jessica Michael Weisel added to party BH Partnership LP(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Michael Weisel added to party EHSW, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Michael Weisel added to party Evans Hotels, LLC (pty:pla). (jah).
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12281098.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Levien, Lawrence) 3/8/2019 - Sent QC e-mail to refile re missing signature. (mdc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Peri Priel on behalf of BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotels, LLC (Priel, Stephanie). Attorney Stephanie Peri Priel added to party BH Partnership LP(pty:pla), Attorney Stephanie Peri Priel added to party EHSW, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Stephanie Peri Priel added to party Evans Hotels, LLC (pty:pla). (jah).
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Evans Hotels, LLC, EHSW, LLC. (Leader, Susan). Modified on 3/8/2019 - Added "First" to text (jah).
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike)(Leyton, Stacey) (jdt).
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Special Motion to Strike and Exhibit 1)(Barber, David). (jdt).
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Leyton, Stacey) (jdt).
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities of UNITE HERE Local 30 and Brigette Browning in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 1 of 5), #4 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 2 of 5), #5 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 3 of 5), #6 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 4 of 5), #7 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Part 5 of 5))(More, Paul) (jdt).
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Paul L. More by Paul L. More on behalf of Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30 (More, Paul)Attorney Paul L. More added to party Brigette Browning(pty:dft), Attorney Paul L. More added to party Unite Here! Local 30(pty:dft) (jdt).
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of David L. Barber by David L. Barber on behalf of Brigette Browning, Unite Here! Local 30 (Barber, David)Attorney David L. Barber added to party Brigette Browning(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Barber added to party Unite Here! Local 30(pty:dft) (jdt).
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Berzon on behalf of Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Berzon, Stephen). Attorney Stephen P. Berzon added to party Tom Lemmon(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen P. Berzon added to party San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO (pty:dft). Modified on 2/15/2019 - Removed extra added text (jah).
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith A. Johnson on behalf of Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Johnson, Meredith). Attorney Meredith A. Johnson added to party Tom Lemmon(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith A. Johnson added to party San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO (pty:dft). Modified on 2/15/2019 - Removed extra added text (jah).
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evans Hotels, LLC. Unite Here! Local 30 served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail, #2 Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence, #3 Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence, #4 Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence, #5 Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence)(Leader, Susan). (jah).
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evans Hotels, LLC. San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO served. (Leader, Susan). (jah).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, and Unite Here! Local 30 must file answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/26/2018. (jah)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evans Hotels, LLC. Tom Lemmon served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail)(Leader, Susan). (jah).
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evans Hotels, LLC. Brigette Browning served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail, #2 Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence)(Leader, Susan). (jah).
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Brigette Browning, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey M. Leyton)(Leyton, Stacey) QC mail sent re event, attorney not associated with party; modified on 12/26/2018 to correct event and associate counsel with defendants (rmc).
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotel, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate The William and Susan Evans Family Trust, Other Affiliate The Cherashore Family Trust, Other Affiliate The Gleason-Matys Family Trust for EHSW, LLC, Evans Hotel, LLC; Other Affiliate The William L. Evans separate property share of the William and Susan Evans Family Trust, Other Affiliate The Anne L. Evans Family Trust, Other Affiliate The Grace Evans Cherashore Trust for BH Partnership LP. (mme) (jao).
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brigette Browning, DOES 1-10, Tom Lemmon, San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Unite Here! Local 30 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11980602.), filed by Evans Hotel, LLC, BH Partnership LP, EHSW, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02763-H-KSC. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Leader, Susan)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans Hotel, LLC et al v. Unite Here! Local 30 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigette Browning
Represented By: David L. Barber
Represented By: Paul L. More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unite Here! Local 30
Represented By: David L. Barber
Represented By: Paul L. More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Stacey Monica Leyton
Represented By: Meredith A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Lemmon
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Stacey Monica Leyton
Represented By: Steven Todd Coopersmith
Represented By: Meredith A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EHSW, LLC
Represented By: Susan K. Leader
Represented By: Jessica Michael Weisel
Represented By: Susan Kay Leader
Represented By: Lawrence David Levien
Represented By: Rebecca A Girolamo
Represented By: Stephanie Peri Priel
Represented By: Rex S Heinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BH Partnership LP
Represented By: Susan K. Leader
Represented By: Jessica Michael Weisel
Represented By: Susan Kay Leader
Represented By: Lawrence David Levien
Represented By: Rebecca A Girolamo
Represented By: Stephanie Peri Priel
Represented By: Rex S Heinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evans Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Susan K. Leader
Represented By: Jessica Michael Weisel
Represented By: Susan Kay Leader
Represented By: Lawrence David Levien
Represented By: Rebecca A Girolamo
Represented By: Stephanie Peri Priel
Represented By: Rex S Heinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?