Weaver v. Davis

Petitioner: La Twon Weaver
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 3:2018cv02888
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254dp
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Scott Thomson on behalf of La Twon Weaver (Thomson, James)Attorney James Scott Thomson added to party La Twon Weaver(pty:pet) (sjm).
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to be Relieved From Special Appearances as Counsel by La Twon Weaver. (Nester, Kathryn) (sjm).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PETITIONERS REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; (2) GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; (3) APPOINTING COUNSEL PURSUANT TO SELECTION BOARD RECOMMENDATION; AND (4) GRANTING TEMPORARY STAY OF EXECUTION re ECF's #1 and #2 . Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/5/2019. (sjm) Modified on 2/6/2019 to confirm Certified Copies mailed on 6 Feb 2019 Per Order (sjm).
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance Solely on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Kathryn Neal Nester on behalf of La Twon Weaver (Nester, Kathryn)Attorney Kathryn Neal Nester added to party La Twon Weaver(pty:pet) (sjm).
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Virginia Acosta on behalf of Ronald Davis (Acosta, Allison)Attorney Allison Virginia Acosta added to party Ronald Davis(pty:res) (sjm).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by La Twon Weaver. (jms)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST by Prisoner for Appointment of Counsel in California Death Sentence Case and For Stay of Execution of Death Sentence filed by La Twon Weaver.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Notification to Chief Deputy re Death Penalty Case) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2888-BTM-LL. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Fife, James)[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Allison Virginia Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: La Twon Weaver
Represented By: James Fife
Represented By: Kathy Nestor
Represented By: Michael G Millman
Represented By: Kathryn Neal Nester
Represented By: James Scott Thomson
Represented By: Joseph Schlesinger
Represented By: Elisabeth A Semel
Represented By: Ty Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?