Emrit v. President Donald Trump et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture (USDA), President Donald Trump, United States Department of Commerce, Federal Trade Commission (FTC) and International Trade Commission (ITC)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00031
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
0 Judge: Larry Alan Burns
1 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 47:0201bt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. Emrit's Motion to Proceed IFP is denied without prejudice as moot. Dkt. #2 . Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/30/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (sjt).
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re conformed copies of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit. (jdt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit. (jdt)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Venue. By 1/25/2019, Emrit is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for improper venue. He may do so by filing a memorandum of points and authorities not longer than five pages, excluding any appended material. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (mme)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against International Trade Commission (ITC), President Donald Trump, United States Department of Agriculture (USDA), United States Department of Commerce, Federal Trade Commission (FTC), IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00031-LAB-AGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Ronald Satish Emrit)(mme)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. President Donald Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture (USDA)
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Donald Trump
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce, Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Trade Commission (ITC)
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?