Emrit v. Soros et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Federal Communications Commission, Securities Exchange Commission, George Soros and Federal Trade Commission
Case Number: 3:2019cv00039
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
0 Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
1 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Dismissal for Improper Venue. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/11/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh) (sjt).
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit. (anh)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Improper Venue. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/9/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (jrm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Federal Communications Commission, Federal Trade Commission, Securities Exchange Commission, George Soros, IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-39-CAB-AGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Ronald Satish Emrit)(jrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Soros et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Communications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securities Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?