Montoya et al v. City of San Diego et al Featured Case

A class action lawsuit challenging the failure of the City of San Diego and dockless private scooter companies, such as Lime and Razor, to maintain accessibility for people with disabilities to the City’s public sidewalks, curb ramps, crosswalks, and transit stops.

Plaintiff: Aaron Gresson, Philip Pressel, Alex Montoya and Rex Shirley
Defendant: Neutron Holdings, Inc., Razor USA LLC, DOES 1-100, City of San Diego and Bird Rides, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00054
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rex Shirley, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel, as to Razor USA LLC. (Souther, Matthew) (sjm).
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy Hua Gao on behalf of Neutron Holdings, Inc. (Gao, Kathy)Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party Neutron Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rex Shirley, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel, as to Neutron Holdings, Inc.. (Souther, Matthew) (sjm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rex Shirley, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel, as to Bird Rides, Inc.. (Souther, Matthew) (sjm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rex Shirley, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel, as to City of San Diego. (Souther, Matthew) (sjm).
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel, Rex Shirley re #1 Complaint, filed by Philip Pressel, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Rex Shirley . (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment)(Souther, Matthew) (sjm).
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL #4 *** NOTICE OF ERRATA by Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel, Rex Shirley re #1 Complaint, (Souther, Matthew) **Q.C. Mailer re: Wrong Event. Filer instructed to file an Notice of Withdrawal and submit correct document (sjm).
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bird Rides, Inc., City of San Diego, DOES 1-100, Neutron Holdings, Inc., Razor USA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12072847.), filed by Rex Shirley, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00054-JM-BGS. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Souther, Matthew)(mme) (jao).
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bird Rides, Inc., City of San Diego, DOES 1-100, Neutron Holdings, Inc., Razor USA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12072847.), filed by Rex Shirley, Aaron Gresson, Alex Montoya, Philip Pressel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00054-JM-BGS. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Souther, Matthew)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya et al v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Gresson
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN SOUTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Pressel
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN SOUTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Montoya
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN SOUTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Shirley
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN SOUTHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razor USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Rides, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?