Lopez et al v. National City et al

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Arevalo and Elizabeth Lopez
Defendant: Does 1-25, Jorge Guevara, State Farm Insurance, National City and Luis Sainz
Case Number: 3:2019cv00066
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
0 Judge: M James Lorenz
1 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446pd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Amended OBJECTION to #11 Declaration in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Amended Objection to Declaration in Opposition filed by State Farm Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GailAnn Y. Stargardter)(Stargardter, GailAnn) Modified to Correct Event on 2/26/2019 (sjt).
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #11 Declaration in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Objection to Declaration in Opposition filed by State Farm Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GailAnn Y. Stargardter)(Stargardter, GailAnn) Modified to correct event on 2/26/2019 (sjt).
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Arevalo, Elizabeth Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Aldana, Francisco) (QC mailer sent re: document which should have been an attachment) (sjt).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Rescheduling Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/8/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/24/2019. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/19/2019.(lrf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY - Other re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stargardter, GailAnn) Modified on 2/19/2019 (sjt).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/14/2019.(lrf)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by National City. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Daral)Attorney Daral B Mazzarella added to party National City(pty:dft) (sjt).
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Insurance.. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (sjt).
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by State Farm Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GailAnn Y. Stargardter)(Stargardter, GailAnn)Attorney GailAnn Yurkanin Stargardter added to party State Farm Insurance(pty:dft) (sjt).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Luis Sainz. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mazzarella, Daral) (sjt).
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING by Luis Sainz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Register of Actions, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket No. 1- Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2- State Court Docket No. 2- Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Nos. 3 and 4 Original Summons, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket Nos. 5 and 6 - Case Assignment and Civ Case Management Conf Ntc, #6 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket No. 7 - Case Initiation Documents, #7 Exhibit 6 - State Court Docket No. 8 - POS-Summons and Complaint - National City, #8 Exhibit 7 - State Court Docket No. 9 POS Summons and Complaint - Sainz, #9 Exhibit 8 - State Court Docket No. 10 - POS Summons and Complaint - Guevara, #10 Exhibit 9 - State Court Docket No. 11 - Ntc of Removal to Federal Court, #11 Exhibit 10 - State Court Docket No. 12 - POS - Ntc of Removal to Federal Court)(Mazzarella, Daral) (sjt).
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-00066-L-BGS.(no document attached) (sjm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02018-00056986-CU-OR-CTL. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-12079020), filed by Luis Sainz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit D - State Court Stipulation of Alternative Dispute Resolution, #7 Exhibit E - State Court Notice of E-Filing Eligibility, #8 Exhibit F - State Court POS of Summons/Complaint -Guevara, #9 Exhibit G - State Court POS of Summons/Complaint- National City, #10 Exhibit H - State Court POS of Summons/Complaint Sainz, #11 Proof of Service Proof of Mail Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-66-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(rmc)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. National City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance
Represented By: GailAnn Yurkanin Stargardter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City
Represented By: Daral B Mazzarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Sainz
Represented By: Daral B Mazzarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Arevalo
Represented By: Francisco J Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lopez
Represented By: Francisco J Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?