Favero v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence L. Favero
Defendant: State of California and United States of America
Petitioner: Stanley Dawidowiez, Deborah Dell Stevenson, Jeffrey F Knirk, Sr., Robin Rae Kelly, Melissa Jane Bazzy, Jessica Nicole Thompson, Cindy Colbert-Hock, Jeffrey A. Thorson, Peter M. Drea, Jacqueline A Schneider, Julie A. Drea, Tanya Thorson, Rhonda T. Favero, Rebecca S Pierson, Mark Argo, Kathy Spain, Karin Tang, Stanford D. Bauer, Gail F McLaughlin, Douglas Leigh Hughes, Cathleen L. Bauer, Patricia Y. Yost, Rochelle Y. Odell, William J. Sanford, Kristi Becker, Wendy Torres, Stephanie Lobignat, Pamela Molnar, Martha Spalding Mozingo, Douglas W McLaughlin, Ann Marie Silva, Kevin J Tank and Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Case Number: 3:2019cv00078
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983bv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Join by Martha Spalding Mozingo. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 7, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Join by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 7, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes.(Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 7, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons set forth at ECF No. 27, the Motions to Join (ECF Nos. #38 , #39 ) are DENIED. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ajs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons set forth at ECF No. #27 , the Motions to Join (ECF Nos. #35 , #36 , #37 ) are DENIED. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ajs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Join by Stanley Dawidowiez.(Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (sjm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION MOTION to Join by Karin Tang.(Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (sjm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Join by Cathleen L. Bauer. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 4, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Join by Stanford D. Bauer. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 4, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Join by Rochelle Y. Odell. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 4, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons set forth at ECF No. #27 , the Motion to Join (ECF No. #33 ) is DENIED. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (ajs)
March 1, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Join by Mark Argo. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
March 1, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons set forth at ECF No. #27 , the Motions to Join (ECF Nos. #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 ) are DENIED. [Plaintiff and Movants (for ECF Nos. 28,29,30,31) served via U.S. Mail Service](no document attached) (ajs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Join by Peter M. Drea. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Join by Julie A. Drea. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Join by Robin Rae Kelly. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Join by Pamela Molnar. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Motions #5 through #26 , Motions to Join. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/15/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm) (Main Document 27 replaced on 2/15/2019) (sjm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Join by Wendy Torres. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
February 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Join by Ann Marie Silva. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag)
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Join by Patricia Y. Yost. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ag).
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Join by Jessica Nicole Thompson. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Join by Melissa Jane Bazzy. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Join by Jacqueline A Schneider. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Join by Tanya Thorson. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Join by Jeffrey A. Thorson. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Join by Rebecca S Pierson. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Join by Kevin J Tank. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Join by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Join by Stephanie Lobignat. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Join by Kristi Becker. Nunc Pro Tunc 01/22/2019. Received from Western District of Washington 02/05/2019. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Join by Kathy Spain. Nunc Pro Tunc 01/22/2019. Received from Western District of Washington 02/05/2019. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Join by William J. Sanford. Nunc Pro Tunc 01/22/2019. Received from Western District of Washington 02/05/2019.(Filer served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs).
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Join by Deborah Dell Stevenson. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Join by Jeffrey F Knirk, Sr. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Join by Gail F McLaughlin. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Join by Douglas W McLaughlin. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Join by Cindy Colbert-Hock. (Filer served via U.S. Mail Service) (ajs).
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Join by Rhonda T. Favero. Nunc Pro Tunc 01/24/2019, per Order (ECF No. #4 ). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Motion to Join, from Movant Rhonda T. Favero. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: LR Cv 5.1(h) Filer not a party to the case. Nunc Pro Tunc 01/24/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/25/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence L. Favero. State of California served. (ajs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (mme)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State of California, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS108218.), filed by Lawrence L. Favero.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00078-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Lawrence L. Favero)(mme)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favero v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence L. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Dawidowiez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deborah Dell Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey F Knirk, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robin Rae Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa Jane Bazzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Nicole Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cindy Colbert-Hock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey A. Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter M. Drea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacqueline A Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie A. Drea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rebecca S Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Argo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathy Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karin Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanford D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail F McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Leigh Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cathleen L. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patricia Y. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rochelle Y. Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William J. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristi Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wendy Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephanie Lobignat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Molnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martha Spalding Mozingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas W McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ann Marie Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin J Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?