Dyer v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Robert Dyer
Defendant: Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00086
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will be held in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on April 25, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/11/19.(dlg)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America re #13 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #12 Answer to Complaint, #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hess, Robert) (dlg).
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.. (Hess, Robert) (dlg). (jao).
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Hess, Robert) (dlg). (jao).
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Hess, Robert) (dlg).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Joint Motion to Dismiss Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/6/19. (dlg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss -- Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan Without Prejudice by Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert) (dlg).
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Court's Order Reassigning Case to Judge Curiel by Robert Dyer (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Grabarsky, Susan) (dlg).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to March 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/1/19. (dlg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert)Attorney Robert Edward Hess added to party Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Edward Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (dlg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Dyer. Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan served. (Grabarsky, Susan) (dlg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Dyer. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served. (Grabarsky, Susan) (dlg).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-86-GPC-AGS.(no document attached) (lrc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Robert Dyer (lrc)(sjt) (lrc).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12084145.), filed by Robert Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-86-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Grabarsky, Susan)(lrc) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dyer
Represented By: Susan Borondia Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indus Technology, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?