Daum v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Laura Daum
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00097
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall now have until March 15, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/12/19. (dlg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert)Attorney Robert Edward Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (dlg).
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Daum. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served. (Meter, Susan) (dlg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan L Meter on behalf of Laura Daum (Meter, Susan)Attorney Susan L Meter added to party Laura Daum(pty:pla) (dlg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12088966.), filed by Laura Daum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-97-GPC-WVG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Kantor, Glenn)(lrc) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daum v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Daum
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Susan L Meter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?