McKenney v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Christl McKenney
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00103
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel) Identifying Connecticut General Corporation , Cigna Holdings, Inc, Cigna Holding Company , Cigna Corporation as corporate parents (anh). (jao).
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel) (anh).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint [Doc. No. #4 ]. Answer by Respondent due 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/1/2019. (anh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America to File Response to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel)Attorney Daniel W. Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (anh).
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christl McKenney. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Iler, Virgil)(anh).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (jao).
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12091580.), filed by Christl McKenney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-103-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Iler, Virgil)(lrc) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenney v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel W. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christl McKenney
Represented By: Virgil Adam Iler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?