Vega v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Victoria Vega
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10 and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00128
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
0 Judge: Karen S Crawford
1 Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance, and Notice of Telephonic Case Management Conference. On 2/25/2019, the Court convened an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in this action. The case did not settle. A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 3/29/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/1/2019.(ag)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 02/25/2019 at 02:30 p.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 01/30/2019.(ajs)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Midland Credit Management, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, . Identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Landers, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (lrc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court for the State of California, San Diego County, Central Division, case number 37-2018-00062443-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12107544.), filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Answer, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-128-WQH-KSC. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(lrc) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Vega
Represented By: Cory Michael Teed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?