Martinez-Rodiguez v. Flores et al
Petitioner: Paola Martinez-Rodiguez
Respondent: Walter Brinton, Greg Archambeault, Pete Flores, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Joseph Greene and Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paola Martinez-Rodiguez (Weiner, David) (jms).
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Petitioner's Release by Paola Martinez-Rodiguez (Weiner, David) (jms).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Petition should not be granted. Order to Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2018.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/23/2019. (cc: US Attorney, Docs 1 and 2). (jpp)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Greg Archambeault, Walter Brinton, Pete Flores, Joseph Greene, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker, filed by Paola Martinez-Rodiguez.(Filing fee $5 - receipt number: 0974-12109246) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Brittany Castle, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-130-JLS-LL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Weiner, David)[Case in Screening] (jms) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Rodiguez v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walter Brinton
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pete Flores
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Greene
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paola Martinez-Rodiguez
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?