San Luis Rey Indian Water Authority et al v. San Diego County Water Authority
Petitioner: Vista Irrigation District, City of Escondido and San Luis Rey Indian Water Authority
Respondent: San Diego County Water Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv00178
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: The award of the American Arbitration Association, dated December 14, 2018, and entitled "Reasoned Decision on Motion for Summary Judgment", a true, correct, and complete copy of which attached hereto as Exhibit 1, is hereby confirmed in all respects, and judgment is hereby entered in conformity with the said award in arbitration. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/20/2019.(ag)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 9, and no objection or opposition having been filed, the Court hereby grants the Application (ECF No. 1 ). Within ten days of the entry of this Order, Applicants shall email a proposed judgment to opposing counsel and the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/13/2019. (ag)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:69-cv-00217-WQH-KSC. The new case number is 19cv0178-WQH-KSC.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/5/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/1/2019.(anh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Rumsey Lincoln on behalf of City of Escondido (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lincoln, Donald)Attorney Donald Rumsey Lincoln added to party City of Escondido(pty:pet) (anh).
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NON Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel Application to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by San Diego County Water Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Hattam, Mark) (anh).
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Pendleton Carter, III on behalf of Vista Irrigation District (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Carter, John)Attorney John Pendleton Carter, III added to party Vista Irrigation District(pty:pet) (anh).
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance Jointly by Donald R. Lincoln and by Michael R McGuinness on behalf of City of Escondido (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McGuinness, Michael)Attorney Michael R McGuinness added to party City of Escondido(pty:pet) QC Email: Separate notice required for Donald R. Lincoln (anh).
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by San Luis Rey Indian Water Authority of case(s) 69-cv-0217, 72-cv-0271, 72-cv-0276 . (Bunce, (anh).
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel by San Luis Rey Indian Water Authority. (no document attached) (mme)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Luis Rey Indian Water Authority et al v. San Diego County Water Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vista Irrigation District
Represented By: John Pendleton Carter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Escondido
Represented By: Donald Rumsey Lincoln
Represented By: Michael R McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: San Luis Rey Indian Water Authority
Represented By: Art Bunce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: San Diego County Water Authority
Represented By: Mark John Hattam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?