Kay v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Anne M. Kay
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00209
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Upon due consideration, good cause appearing, the Court grants the joint motion. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 4/18/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/8/2019. (rmc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Jillian)Attorney Jillian Renee O'Brien added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft) (rmc).
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne M. Kay. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served. (Horner, Susan) (rmc).
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als)(jrd)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12141338.) Filed by Anne M. Kay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00209-MMA-BLM. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Horner, Susan)(als)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jillian Renee O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. Kay
Represented By: Susan L. Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?