i3 Brands, Inc. et al v. CDK Global, LLC et al
Plaintiff: i3 Brands, Inc. and PartProtection, LLC
Defendant: The Reynolds and Reynolds Company and CDK Global, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00252
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 23 Transfer Letter Received from Northern District of Illinois. Case number in other court is 1:19-cv-01412 (jpp)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Illinois*. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2817 CTO-3) (jdt) (sjt).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #19 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Final Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Upon due consideration, the Court grants the parties' joint motion. The case is stayed pending the JPML's final determination on whether this case should be transferred to MDL No. 2817. The stay will automatically lift upon the JPML's final order regarding transferring the matter to the Northern District of Illinois. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead within 30 days, or as otherwise ordered by the MDL Court, of the JPML's final order regarding transferring the matter to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/19/2019. (rmc)
February 18, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by i3 Brands, Inc., PartProtection, LLC, as to CDK Global, LLC. (Bloom, Michael) (rmc).
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by The Reynolds and Reynolds Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Naik, Amar) (rmc).
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Amar Shrinivas Naik on behalf of The Reynolds and Reynolds Company (Naik, Amar)Attorney Amar Shrinivas Naik added to party The Reynolds and Reynolds Company(pty:dft) QC mail sent re update of address (rmc).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kathleen Watson Moss, re #10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/12/2019. (mdc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of J. Erik Connolly, re #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/12/2019. (mdc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Nicole E. Wrigley, re #8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/12/2019. (mdc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael E. Bloom, re #7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/12/2019. (mdc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by i3 Brands, Inc., PartProtection, LLC. The Reynolds and Reynolds Company served. (Carlson, Whitney) (rmc).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #4 Ex Parte Motion to Seal Portions of Complaint and Certain Exhibits. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/8/2019. (aef)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12181174.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Moss, Kathleen) (mdc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12181133.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Connolly, Joel) (mdc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12179114.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wrigley, Nicole) (mdc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12176285.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bloom, Michael) (mdc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Miller on behalf of PartProtection, LLC, i3 Brands, Inc. (Miller, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Ann Miller added to party PartProtection, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Ann Miller added to party i3 Brands, Inc.(pty:pla) (rmc).
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #4 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Carlson, Whitney) (rmc). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Carlson, Whitney) (rmc).
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by PartProtection, LLC, i3 Brands, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent i3 Brands, Inc. for PartProtection, LLC. (Carlson, Whitney) (rmc). (jao).
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CDK Global, LLC, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12163223), filed by i3 Brands, Inc., PartProtection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00252-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Carlson, Whitney)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: i3 Brands, Inc. et al v. CDK Global, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reynolds and Reynolds Company
Represented By: Amar Shrinivas Naik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDK Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: i3 Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney Marie Carlson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Represented By: Nicole E. Wrigley
Represented By: Kathleen Watson Moss
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Michael Elliot Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PartProtection, LLC
Represented By: Whitney Marie Carlson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Represented By: Nicole E. Wrigley
Represented By: Kathleen Watson Moss
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Michael Elliot Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?