Beriones v. IMH Asset Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Babette Beriones
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Anthony Peter Vasilas, Indenture Trustee, Bank of America, Raymond Joseph Vasilas, MERS, Impac Funding Corporation, IMH Asset Corp., MTC Financial Inc., Does 2 thru 100, Wilmington Trust Company as Trustee for Securitized Trust IMP AC CMB, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Jessie Menzel, James Lowell Anthony, LLC and MTC Financial Inc. doing business as Trustee Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00301
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by MTC Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Appendix, #3 Proof of Service)(Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (anh).
April 4, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Babette Beriones (anh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Babette Beriones (anh)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss [Doc. No. #22 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/2/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 28 Corrected REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Babette Beriones (anh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 27 Corrected RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Babette Beriones. (anh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Babette Beriones (anh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (anh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Babette Beriones. (anh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Babette Beriones. (anh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (State Court Proof of Service of Summons) by Babette Beriones. Nunc Pro Tunc 3/18/2019 (anh)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo Accepting Document: State Court Proof of Service of Summons, from Plaintiff Babette Beriones. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Incorrect Case Number; Unclear what document has been served.. Nunc Pro Tunc 3/18/2019. Signed by chambers of Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/20/20219.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Lowell Anthony, LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tira, Patrick) (anh).
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMH Asset Corp., Impac Funding Corporation Identifying Impac Mortgage Holdings, Inc as corporate parent. (Schiffer, Eric) Modified on 3/11/2019 (anh).(jao).
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by IMH Asset Corp., Impac Funding Corporation re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schiffer, Eric) (anh). (jao).
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by IMH Asset Corp., Impac Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Schiffer, Eric)Attorney Eric Martin Schiffer added to party IMH Asset Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Martin Schiffer added to party Impac Funding Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by James Lowell Anthony, LLC . Identifying Decision One Mortgage Company. LLC . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tira, Patrick) (anh). (jao).
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Lowell Anthony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Tira, Patrick)Attorney Patrick Robert Tira added to party James Lowell Anthony, LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jessie Menzel, Anthony Peter Vasilas. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Bradley, Kaila)Attorney Kaila M. Bradley added to party Jessie Menzel(pty:dft), Attorney Kaila M. Bradley added to party Anthony Peter Vasilas (pty:dft) (anh).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond [Doc. No. #10 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IMH Asset Corp., Indenture Trustee, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Wilmington Trust Company as Trustee for Securitized Trust IMP AC CMB identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Britt, Stephen) (anh).Modified to add additional info on 3/4/2019 (jao).
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond by Babette Beriones. (anh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IMH Asset Corp., Indenture Trustee, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Wilmington Trust Company as Trustee for Securitized Trust IMP AC CMB identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Britt, Stephen) (anh). (jao).
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Bank of America, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, IMH Asset Corp., Indenture Trustee, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Wilmington Trust Company as Trustee for Securitized Trust IMP AC CMB. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Proof of Service)(Britt, Stephen)Attorney Stephen D. Britt added to party Bank of America(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Britt added to party Deutsche Bank National Trust Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Britt added to party IMH Asset Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Britt added to party Indenture Trustee(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Britt added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration System(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Britt added to party Wilmington Trust Company as Trustee for Securitized Trust IMP AC CMB(pty:dft) (anh).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0301-CAB-JLB(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by MTC Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (anh).
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MTC Financial Inc. of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (anh).
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Reynolds on behalf of MTC Financial Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reynolds, Richard)Attorney Richard J Reynolds added to party MTC Financial Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by MTC Financial Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps for MTC Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (anh). (jao).
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MTC Financial Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (anh). (jao).
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02018-00063881-CU-OR-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12190852.), filed by MTC Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-301-CAB-NLS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beriones v. IMH Asset Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Peter Vasilas
Represented By: Kaila M. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indenture Trustee
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Joseph Vasilas
Represented By: Kaila M. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impac Funding Corporation
Represented By: Eric Martin Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMH Asset Corp.
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Represented By: Eric Martin Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Ramon Garcia-Salgado
Represented By: Richard J Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 thru 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Company as Trustee for Securitized Trust IMP AC CMB
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Stephen D. Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Menzel
Represented By: Kaila M. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lowell Anthony, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Robert Tira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc. doing business as Trustee Corp.
Represented By: Rafael Ramon Garcia-Salgado
Represented By: Richard J Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babette Beriones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?