Dane et al v. Boston Scientific Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Boyd, Donna Stoker, Jennifer West, Nancy Coursey, Elaine Talbot, Louise M. Spitzer, Julia Poe, Deborah Young, Lynn Shipman, Misty Hansen, Angel Phelps, Gabriela Bravo, Cecilia Boyle, Carrie Aguirre, Cora Gates-Stokes, Deborah Ruffini, Angel Peters, Verda Ann Perkins, Mary Anna Smith, Roberta Ortiz, Leslie Dane, Donna S. Zitur, Wanda Paul, Rose Belcher, Deborah Griffith, Karrie Propst and Wendy Woodall
Defendant: DOES 1- 100, Boston Scientific Corp. and Boston Scientific Corp. doing business as Mansfield Scientific, Inc. doing business as Microvasive Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00339
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corp. re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion (Mannoia Weiler, Eva) (sjm).
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Boston Scientific Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mannoia Weiler, Eva) (sjm).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Nicholas R. Farnolo, re #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/9/2019. (mdc)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Carrie Aguirre, Rose Belcher, Deborah Boyd, Cecilia Boyle, Gabriela Bravo, Nancy Coursey, Leslie Dane, Cora Gates-Stokes, Deborah Griffith, Misty Hansen, Roberta Ortiz, Wanda Paul, Verda Ann Perkins, Angel Peters, Angel Phelps, Julia Poe, Karrie Propst, Deborah Ruffini, Lynn Shipman, Mary Anna Smith, Louise M. Spitzer, Donna Stoker, Elaine Talbot, Jennifer West, Wendy Woodall, Deborah Young, Donna S. Zitur. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Liakos, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Carrie Aguirre(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Rose Belcher(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Deborah Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Cecilia Boyle(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Gabriela Bravo(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Nancy Coursey(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Leslie Dane(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Cora Gates-Stokes(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Deborah Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Misty Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Roberta Ortiz(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Wanda Paul(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Verda Ann Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Angel Peters(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Angel Phelps(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Julia Poe(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Karrie Propst(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Deborah Ruffini(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Lynn Shipman(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Mary Anna Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Louise M. Spitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Donna Stoker(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Elaine Talbot(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Jennifer West(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Wendy Woodall(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Deborah Young(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer R. Liakos added to party Donna S. Zitur(pty:pla) (sjm).
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12370297.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Farnolo, Nicholas) (mdc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REMOVING LETTER FROM FILE re #9 Ex Parte Letter, filed by Leslie Dane. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/2/2019.(sjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2019: #1 Stricken Document) (sjm).
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte Letter by Leslie Dane re #7 Notice (Other), #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 8 Minute Order. (Liakos, Jennifer). Modified on 4/2/2019 - Wrong event. Pdf is Ex Parte Letter to Judge. QC Email sent re L.R. 83.9. Edited text to match pleading (jah). (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/2/2019) (sjm).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, is taken under submission pursuant to L.R. 7.1.d.1. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is vacated. Written order to follow. (no document attached) (gac)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Boston Scientific Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Out-Of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Boston Scientific Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mannoia Weiler, Eva)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, to Clerk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mannoia Weiler, Eva) (sjm).
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, to Adverse Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mannoia Weiler, Eva) (sjm).
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Boston Scientific Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Mannoia Weiler, Eva) (sjm).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0339-JM-LL.(no document attached) (anh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Boston Scientific Corp.. Identifying Other Affiliate FMR LLC/Abigail P. Johnson for Boston Scientific Corp.. (mme)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2018-00061282-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12208529.), filed by Boston Scientific Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-339-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(mme) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dane et al v. Boston Scientific Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Boyd
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Stoker
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer West
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Coursey
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Talbot
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise M. Spitzer
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Poe
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Young
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Shipman
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Hansen
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Phelps
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Bravo
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Boyle
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Aguirre
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Gates-Stokes
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ruffini
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Peters
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verda Ann Perkins
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anna Smith
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Ortiz
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Dane
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna S. Zitur
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Paul
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Belcher
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Griffith
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karrie Propst
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Woodall
Represented By: Melissa A. Agnetti
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1- 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corp.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corp. doing business as Mansfield Scientific, Inc. doing business as Microvasive Inc.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?