Gonzalez et al v. Veros Credit, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Senovio Gonzlaez, Ann Montano and Senovio Gonzalez
Defendant: Cyrus Bozorgi, DOES 1-10 and Veros Credit, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00343
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Senovio Gonzalez, Ann Montano (Hussin, Tammy) (sjt).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT AND SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 1/30/2020. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 1/30/2020, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. ( Settlement Disposition Conference set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 12/2/2019.(sjm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement by Senovio Gonzalez, Ann Montano (Hussin, Tammy) (sjm).
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex A. Wade on behalf of Veros Credit, LLC (Wade, Alex)Attorney Alex A. Wade added to party Veros Credit, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Alex A. Wade added to party Veros Credit, LLC(pty:dft) (sjm).
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Kaminski on behalf of Veros Credit, LLC (Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Veros Credit, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Veros Credit, LLC(pty:dft) (sjm).
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: (T)Case Management Conference was held on 9/27/2019. No order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Tammy G. Hussin). (Defendant Attorney Raymond J. Naples). (no document attached) (dxm)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC ATTORNEYS-ONLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court RESETS the telephonic attorneys-only Case Management Conference set for September 24, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., for September 27, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Plaintiffs counsel is to arrange and initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/3/2019.(sjm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #14 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/28/2019. (sjm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Veros Credit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Naples, Raymond) (sjm).
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Senovio Gonzalez, Ann Montano of CYRUS BOZORGI (Hussin, Tammy) (sjm).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRE-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS: A telephonic attorneys-only Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Plaintiffs counsel is to arrange and initiate the conference call; Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/9/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 6/5/2019.(sjm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 6/4/2019. The case did not settle. Case Management Conference was held on 6/4/2019. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin). (Defendant Attorney Raymond Naples). (no document attached) (dxm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Veros Credit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Naples, Raymond) (sjm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Cross-Defendants ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Senovio Gonzalez, Ann Montano.(Hussin, Tammy) (sjm).
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Senovio Gonzalez, Ann Montano. Cyrus Bozorgi served. (Hussin, Tammy) (sjm).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 4/26/2019.(sjm)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Veros Credit, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Naples, Raymond) (sjm).
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Veros Credit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Retail Installment Sale Contract, #2 Proof of Service)(Naples, Raymond)Attorney Raymond J Naples, Jr added to party Veros Credit, LLC(pty:dft) (sjm).
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Senovio Gonzlaez, Ann Montano. Veros Credit, LLC served. (Hussin, Tammy) (sjm).
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv343-JM-MSB.(no document attached) (anh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cyrus Bozorgi, DOES 1-10, Veros Credit, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12216011.), filed by Senovio Gonzlaez, Ann Montano.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00343-BEN-MSB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Hussin, Tammy)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Veros Credit, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Bozorgi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veros Credit, LLC
Represented By: Raymond J Naples, Jr.
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Represented By: Alex A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senovio Gonzlaez
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Montano
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senovio Gonzalez
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?