Ochoa v. Lintig et al
Plaintiff: Barry Ernest Ochoa
Defendant: Federika Von Lintig, L. Carnichael, DO, John Doe #2 and John Doe #1
Case Number: 3:2019cv00346
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by the Chambers of Judge Michael M. Anello Rejecting Document: Letter to the Clerk of Court, from Plaintiff Barry Ernest Ochoa. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Case Closed per Order dated 2/20/2019 (ECF No. #4 ). Ex parte communication prohibited. The document is not to be filed. But instead rejected, and it is ordered that the Clerk serve a copy of this order on all parties. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Plaintiff a blank Complaint under the Civil Rights Act pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, a blank Motion and Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and an Information re Prisoner Pro Se Documents form. To re-open the case, Plaintiff must re-submit the Complaint and all other initial case filings by mailing them to the Clerk at the address provided at the top of the information sheet. Plaintiff must include the case number of this action, 19cv346-MMA-JLB, on all documents. Rejected document was returned to the filer. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)(Blank 1983 Complaint, IFP Motion and Prisoner Pro Se info sheet mailed with order) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (rmc).
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barry Ernest Ochoa (jms)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barry Ernest Ochoa (jms)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Barry Ernest Ochoa. (jms)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Michael M. Anello Rejecting, from Plaintiff Barry Ernest Ochoa. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) exceed the page limitations set by S.D. Cal. CivLR 8.2(a) and S.D. Cal. General Order 653A, and are notaccompanied by a properly supported Motion to Exceed page limitations or Motion for EmergencyRelief from General Order 653A. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties, Original Document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/20/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 **Document Striken** MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Barry Ernest Ochoa. (jms)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 **Document Striken** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barry Ernest Ochoa. (jms)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 **Document Striken** COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against L. Carnichael, DO, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Federika Von Lintig, filed by Barry Ernest Ochoa.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-346-MMA-JLB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. Lintig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Ernest Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federika Von Lintig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Carnichael, DO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?