McKevitz v. Capital Alliance Group et al

Case Number: 3:2019cv00540
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0605 Unlawful Reception Broadcast Signal i.e., Satellite - Theft of Satellite Communications

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 39 Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of Tennessee. (no document attached) (jpp)
March 22, 2019 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00131. Original file received electronically
March 22, 2019 Case transferred to District of Southern District of California. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Transfer to the Southern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/22/19. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set forth in following order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/22/19. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF AMENDMENT by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza re #23 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Other Amended Motion to Change Venue)(Restis, William) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (ADA). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address by William R Restis (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Restis, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/25/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/20/18. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton: Scheduling Conference held on 7/17/2018. Jury Trial set for 6/25/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton.(Court Reporter ECRO) (MDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 10, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton. (MDG) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/06/2018. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Andrew McKevitz (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza (Restis, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Restis, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
June 23, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza. (Restis, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Andrew McKevitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrew McKevitz)(Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 6/6/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 6/6/2018 to note c/m to William R Restis The Restis Law Firm, PC 550 West C Street Suite 1760 San Diego, CA 92101 , along with ECF info ) (ADA). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Restis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3687154.) filed by Narin Charanvattanakit, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Mark Mendoza, Capital Alliance Group. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William R. Restis)(Morton, Cathy) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Restis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3687154.) by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza. (Morton, Cathy) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza. (Morton, Cathy) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/21/2018. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, Mark Mendoza.(Morton, Cathy) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION of extension of time for Defendants to answer complaint by Andrew McKevitz. (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Mark Mendoza by Andrew McKevitz. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Narin Charanvattanakit by Andrew McKevitz. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Capital Alliance Partners, LLC by Andrew McKevitz. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Capital Alliance Group by Andrew McKevitz. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 12 Administrative Notice to Counsel Stephen Byrd re: #11 Application for Clerk's Default : Requirements due by 5/2/2018. see http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/default-judgment-instructions-and-forms for instructions for applying for default judgments. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 11 [FILED INCORRECTLY; TO BE REFILED PER THE COURT'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT GUIDELINES] APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to All Defendants by Andrew McKevitz. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Byrd, Stephen) Modified on 4/27/2018 (ABF). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew McKevitz. (Byrd, Stephen) Modified on 4/25/2018 to refer to doc #7 as duplicate filing (ADA). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew McKevitz. Capital Alliance Partners, LLC served on 4/3/2018. (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew McKevitz. Capital Alliance Group served on 4/3/2018. (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew McKevitz. Mark Mendoza served on 4/2/2018. (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew McKevitz. Narin Charanvattanakit served on 4/2/2018. (Byrd, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J. Ronnie Greer on 3/27/18. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J. Ronnie Greer on 3/27/18. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J. Ronnie Greer on 3/27/18. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital Alliance Group, Capital Alliance Partners, LLC, Narin Charanvattanakit, and Mark Mendoza. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 27, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3635612.), filed by Andrew McKevitz.(Byrd, Stephen) Modified on 3/27/2018 to note that summons forms and civil cover sheet are attached (ADA). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKevitz v. Capital Alliance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?