Meyer v. Volkswagen Group et al
Plaintiff: Jodi Meyer
Defendant: Volkwagen Group of America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, DOES 1 through 100 and Volkswagen Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv00584
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446ml
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Continuance in Lieu of Stay. The Court grants a continuance of all dates in this matter until the related criminal proceedings against Renz have been completed. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc. re #6 Notice (Other), filed by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig). Modified on 4/17/2019 - Removed extra added text (jah).
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Civil Action Pending Completion of Criminal Proceedings by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig). (jah).
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 *** WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #8 *** NOTICE: Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Action Pending Completion of Criminal Proceedings by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc. (Winterman, Craig). Modified on 4/15/2019 - Pdf not a Notice, but is duplicate of Joint Motion #7 and includes Proposed Order, . QC Email sent re ECF Proposed Order policy and to withdraw entry (jah). Modified on 4/17/2019 - Edited to reflect as withdrawn (jah).
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/17/2019 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan to be filed in CM/ECF by 5/7/2019. Signed by Linda Lopez on 4/8/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand re #1 Notice of removal by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc..(Winterman, Craig). Modified on 4/8/2019 - Added link to case initiating document (jah).
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Volkwagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig). Modified on 4/2/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected text and added link to Removal (jah).
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkwagen Group of America, Inc.(mme)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2019-00001054-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12355724.), filed by Volkwagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court First Amended Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00584-H-LL. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(mme)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Volkswagen Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkwagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Lee Winterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Meyer
Represented By: Taylor Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?